Thompson v. CCHPR Hospitality, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chonte S. Thompson
Defendant: John Doe A-Z, Entity X, Insurance Company A and CCHPR Hospitality, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01016
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed for CCHPR Hospitality, LLC d/b/a Sheraton Puerto Rico and Casino Hotel by All Plaintiffs upon CCHPR Hospitality, LLC served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (Hernandez-Oharriz, Edgardo) Modified on 2/24/2020 to replace all caps text. (mg).
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CCHPR Hospitality, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory.(Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0104-6738751) (arg)
January 16, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing. ***FILED IN ERROR- Wrong Entry*** (mr)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR- Wrong Entry*** NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1 CCHPR Hospitality, LLC. COMPLAINT, filed by Chonte S. Thompson, re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 1/17/2020. (arg) Modified on 1/16/2020 (mr).
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Chonte S. Thompson. Service due by 4/14/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Hernandez-Oharriz, Edgardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. CCHPR Hospitality, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entity X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCHPR Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chonte S. Thompson
Represented By: Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?