Erazo-Santana v. Aponte-Colon
Plaintiff: Carlos Erazo-Santana
Defendant: Jose Bolivar Aponte-Colon
Case Number: 3:2020cv01030
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro se. Responses due by 3/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #3 Account Statement, #4 Envelope)(gav) Modified on 2/21/2020 typo (gav).
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel "Denied without prejudice to its renewal supported by an affidavit of indigency." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/27/2020. (EES)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/27/2020. (EES)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro se. Responses due by 2/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(gav) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2020: #2 Information regarding prisoner account) (gav).
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro se. Responses due by 2/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose Bolivar Aponte-Colon, filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro se. Service due by 4/21/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 USM 285, #5 Envelope)(gav)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erazo-Santana v. Aponte-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Erazo-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Bolivar Aponte-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?