Garcia-Castro et al v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Garcia-Castro and Anixa Santiago-Rivera
Defendant: The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, Thomas Rivera-Schatz, Maite Oronoz-Rodriguez, Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Carlos J. Mendez-Nunez
Case Number: 3:2020cv01065
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 MOTION for Extension of Time. Responsive pleadings to #1 Complaint are now due by 4/2/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/9/2020. (ERC)
March 2, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/2/2020 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Anixa Santiago-Rivera, Manuel Garcia-Castro filed by Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 3/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bayouth-Montes, Alberto)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 MOTION for Extension of Time. Responsive pleadings to #1 Complaint are now due by 03/30/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/28/2020. (ERC)
February 28, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 30, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Anixa Santiago-Rivera, Manuel Garcia-Castro filed by Rosa M. Cruz-Niemiec on behalf of Maite Oronoz-Rodriguez Responses due by 3/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Cruz-Niemiec, Rosa)
February 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosa M. Cruz-Niemiec on behalf of Maite Oronoz-Rodriguez (Cruz-Niemiec, Rosa)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 MOTION for Extension of Time. Responsive pleadings to #1 Complaint are now due by 03/30/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/28/2020. (ERC)
February 28, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 Mar 2020 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Anixa Santiago-Rivera, Manuel Garcia-Castro filed by Veronica Ferraiuoli-Hornedo on behalf of Carlos J. Mendez-Nunez Responses due by 3/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica)
February 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Veronica Ferraiuoli-Hornedo on behalf of Carlos J. Mendez-Nunez (Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Extension of Time. Responsive pleadings to #1 Complaint are now due by 03/30/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/26/2020. (ERC)
February 26, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Anixa Santiago-Rivera, Manuel Garcia-Castro filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Wanda Vazquez-Garced Responses due by 3/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time. Responsive pleadings to #1 Complaint are now due by 03/30/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/25/2020. (ERC)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 30, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Anixa Santiago-Rivera, Manuel Garcia-Castro filed by David R. Rodriguez-Burns on behalf of Thomas Rivera-Schatz Responses due by 3/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rodriguez-Burns, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Rodriguez-Burns on behalf of Thomas Rivera-Schatz (Rodriguez-Burns, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila J. Torres-Delgado on behalf of Thomas Rivera-Schatz (Torres-Delgado, Sheila)
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudio Aliff-Ortiz on behalf of Thomas Rivera-Schatz (Aliff-Ortiz, Claudio)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz on behalf of Thomas Rivera-Schatz (Aldarondo-Ortiz, Eliezer)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Velez-Colon, Jose)
February 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Maite Oronoz-Rodriguez served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Velez-Colon, Jose)
February 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Thomas Rivera-Schatz served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Velez-Colon, Jose)
February 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Carlos J. Mendez-Nunez served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Velez-Colon, Jose)
February 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Wanda Vazquez-Garced served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Velez-Colon, Jose)
February 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Commonwealth of Puerto Rico served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Velez-Colon, Jose)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Carlos J. Mendez-Nunez, Maite Oronoz-Rodriguez, Thomas Rivera-Schatz, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, Wanda Vazquez-Garced (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Carlos J. Mendez-Nunez, Maite Oronoz-Rodriguez, Thomas Rivera-Schatz, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, Wanda Vazquez-Garced ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6778709.), filed by Anixa Santiago-Rivera, Manuel Garcia-Castro. Service due by 5/5/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, #4 Summons as to The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, #5 Summons as to The Honorable Carlos J. Mndez Nez, in his official capacity as President of the Puerto Rico House of Representatives, #6 Summons as to The Honorable Maite Oronoz Rodrguez, in her official capacity as Chief Justice of the Puerto Rico Supreme Court, #7 Summons as to The Honorable Thomas Rivera Schatz, in his official capacity as President of the Puerto Rico Senate, #8 Summons as to The Honorable Wanda Vzquez Garced, in her official capacity as Governor of Puerto Rico)(Velez-Colon, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia-Castro et al v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Represented By: Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Rivera-Schatz
Represented By: David R. Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Sheila J. Torres-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maite Oronoz-Rodriguez
Represented By: Rosa M. Cruz-Niemiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos J. Mendez-Nunez
Represented By: Veronica Ferraiuoli-Hornedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Garcia-Castro
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anixa Santiago-Rivera
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?