Fazio v. James River Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael Fazio
Defendant: Insurance Company X, Insurance Company Y, Naihomi Figueroa-Fontanez, Insurance Company Z, Dr. John Doe, Isaias Soto-Reyes, Lt. Richard Roe, Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company and James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01074
Filed: February 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time filed by Ramon Coto-Ojeda on behalf of James River Insurance Company Responses due by 4/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Coto-Ojeda, Ramon)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time by Ramon Coto-Ojeda on behalf of James River Insurance Company (Coto-Ojeda, Ramon) Modified event and title on 3/26/2020 (idg).
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for extension of time. Answer deadline due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/17/2020. (wm)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon James River Insurance Company served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (Acosta, Benjamin)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time until 4/13/2020 filed by Giancarlo Font-Garcia on behalf of Naihomi Figueroa-Fontanez, Isaias Soto-Reyes Responses due by 3/26/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Font-Garcia, Giancarlo)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Fazio upon Naihomi Figueroa-Fontanez served on 2/22/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020; Isaias Soto-Reyes served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Acosta, Benjamin)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Fernandez-Esteves on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fernandez-Esteves, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Naihomi Figueroa-Fontanez, James River Insurance Company, Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, Isaias Soto-Reyes (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
February 10, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (ad)
February 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6783466.) against All Defendants filed by Michael Fazio. Service due by 5/11/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Isaias Soto Reyes, #4 Summons James River Ins Co, #5 Summons Metropolitan Casualty Ins Co, #6 Summons Naihomi Figueroa Fontanez)(Acosta, Benjamin) Modified on 2/10/2020 change italics (gav).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fazio v. James River Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company Y
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naihomi Figueroa-Fontanez
Represented By: Giancarlo Font-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaias Soto-Reyes
Represented By: Giancarlo Font-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Ramon Coto-Ojeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fazio
Represented By: Benjamin Acosta, Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandez-Esteves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?