Nova-Matos v. Medicare Appeals Council
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Nova-Matos
Defendant: Medicare Appeals Council
Case Number: 3:2020cv01081
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Medicare Appeals Council. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by Miguel A. Nova-Matos, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rom)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medicare Appeals Council, filed by Miguel A. Nova-Matos, pro se. Service due by 5/13/2020. (Receipt #PRX100069712). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit)(mr) Modified on 2/20/2020 to add receipt number. (mr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nova-Matos v. Medicare Appeals Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicare Appeals Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Nova-Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?