Palmer v. Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Palmer
Defendant: Universidad del Sagrado Corazon and Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv01087
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00341. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED that the Universitys motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and failure to state a claim for relief or alternatively transfer venue [Dkt. 22] is GRANTED IN PART and the case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico in its entirety with the two pending motions [Dkt. 21; 33]. Ordered that Ms Palmer's #31 Motion to change venue to the Sherman Division is denied. Ordered that the University's #35 motion for a hearing is moot and the hearing #37 is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/21/2020. (bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 16, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 36, notice to the court. Proposed orders are not filed as a separate document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions Hearing set for 1/22/2020 03:00 PM in Ctrm 1 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (fal, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Hearing. Court ORDERED that the parties appear before this Court on January 22,2020, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom #1, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont,Texas, for a hearing on whether the Court has personal jurisdiction over the University, whethervenue is proper, and where the Universitys corporate representative should be deposed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery and all pre-trial deadlines are stayed until after the hearing. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/15/20. (fal, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 36 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) Modified on 1/16/2020 (bjc, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Hearing by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Urgent Motion Requesting Oral Argument on Several Pending Matters)(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of non-appearance to deposition by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Protective Order by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2020: #3 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Change Venue to Sherman Division filed by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Change Venue to Sherman Division by Samantha Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 13, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 30, motion to transfer venue. No certificate of conference. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney will re-file.*** (bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 30 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Change Venue to Sherman Division by Samantha Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaffer, Shawn) Modified on 1/13/2020 (bjc, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Stay re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or to Transfer Venue (with memorandum of law) (Reply to Docket No 27) filed by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon. (Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) MOTION to Change Venue (Reply to Docket No 26) filed by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon. (Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Stay re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or to Transfer Venue (with memorandum of law) filed by Samantha Palmer. (Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Stay re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or to Transfer Venue (with memorandum of law), #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) MOTION to Change Venue filed by Samantha Palmer. (Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Motion to dismiss and/or transfer venue (dkt# 22) and motion for protection order/stay (dkt# 21) by December 2, 2019. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/15/2019. (bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to #21 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Stay and/or to Transfer Venue (with memorandum of law), #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) MOTION to Change Venue by Samantha Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaffer, Shawn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2019: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/3/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/6/2019. (bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Management Conference held on 11/6/2019. Attorneys present - Pltf: Andrew Gertz; Deft: Anthony Hernandea (via phone), Kevin Acevedo-Carlson. Court will enter scheduling order. (jmv, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction), MOTION to Change Venue by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
November 4, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #20, Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue. Attorney will re-file, selecting both motions types as instructed by the Clerk. (tkd, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Stay re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or to Transfer Venue (with memorandum of law) by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or to Transfer Venue by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unsworn Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) Modified on 11/5/2019 (tkd, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Paul Gertz on behalf of Samantha Palmer (Gertz, Andrew) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon re #15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, (Notice Regarding Counsel Anthony Hernandez and Filing of JSR)) (Attachments: #1 Letter by Secretary of Mr. Anthony Hernandez)(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report Under Rule 26(f)) by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon. (Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to show cause. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/18/2019. (bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 and #14 Motions for Extension of Time to File the Rule 26(f) joint report by October 21, 2019. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/17/2019. (bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
October 17, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference RESET for 11/6/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (jmv, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint status Report by Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc. (Hernandez, Anthony) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Samantha Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jaffer, Shawn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (bjc, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon. (Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (bjc, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon.(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTIONS FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before September 30, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on October 22, 2019, at 11 a.m., in Suite 221, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/12/19. (ljw, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
September 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc.(Hernandez, Anthony) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Universidad del Sagrado Corazon to 9/26/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Universidad del Sagrado Corazon.( Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Michael Acevedo-Carlson on behalf of Universidad del Sagrado Corazon (Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc to 9/13/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Idalia Llorens Collections Agency Inc.( Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Universidad del Sagrado Corazon served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) Modified on 8/12/2019 (bjc, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Universidad del Sagrado Corazon served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) ***FILED IN ERROR. SUMMONS NOT FLATTENED.*** [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 6, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc, Universidad del Sagrado Corazon and emailed to plaintiff's atty for service. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Samantha Palmer. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7380210.), filed by Samantha Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universidad del Sagrado Corazon
Represented By: Kevin Michael Acevedo-Carlson
Represented By: Anthony W Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc
Represented By: Anthony W Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Palmer
Represented By: Andrew Paul Gertz
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?