Conair Corporation v. Next G, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Conair Corporation
Defendant: Does 1-10, Next G, Corp. d/b/a Farmacia Savia and Next G, Corp.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01093
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of newly appointed U.S. District Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 03/11/2020. (gr)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Conair Corporation upon Next G, Corp. served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Dunlap, Thomas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Next G, Corp. d/b/a Farmacia Savia (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, filed by Conair Corporation (Dunlap, Thomas)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 2/21/2020. (arg)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement byConair Corporation. (Dunlap, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by Conair Corporation.(Dunlap, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, Next G, Corp. d/b/a Farmacia Savia ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6798928.), filed by Conair Corporation. Service due by 5/19/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Dunlap, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conair Corporation v. Next G, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next G, Corp. d/b/a Farmacia Savia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next G, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conair Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?