Doctor's Associates, LLC. v. Pena-Fernandez et al
Petitioner: Doctor's Associates, LLC.
Respondent: Felix Pena-Fernandez and Magda C. Rodriguez-Rodriguez
Case Number: 3:2020cv01095
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/13/2020. (DMA)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doctor's Associates, LLC. upon Felix Pena-Fernandez served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Torrens-Davila, Jaime)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Felix Pena-Fernandez, Magda C. Rodriguez-Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0104-6802078) (arg)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award re #1 Complaint, filed by Doctor's Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreement #18256, #2 Exhibit 2 - Franchise Agreement #66058, #3 Exhibit 3 - Franchise Agreement #21043, #4 Exhibit 4 - Award of Arbitrator) (Torrens-Davila, Jaime)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Restrict Document Exhibits in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (Docket No. 1) filed by Jaime A. Torrens-Davila on behalf of Doctor's Associates, LLC. Responses due by 3/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torrens-Davila, Jaime) Modified on 2/21/2020 change italics (gav).
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) against Felix Pena-Fernandez, Magda C. Rodriguez-Rodriguez, filed by Doctor's Associates, LLC.. Service due by 5/20/2020, (Attachments: #1 Summons - Felix Pena-Fernandez, #2 Summons - Magda Rodriguez-Rodriguez, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Torrens-Davila, Jaime) Modified on 2/21/2020 change italics (gav).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doctor's Associates, LLC. v. Pena-Fernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Doctor's Associates, LLC.
Represented By: Jaime A. Torrens-Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Felix Pena-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Magda C. Rodriguez-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?