USA v. One (1) 1980 Dusky Marine 233 Vessel, with One (1) 2005 Yamaha F250TRD-4 Stroke Series Motor
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: One (1) 1980 Dusky Marine 233 Vessel, with One (1) 2005 Yamaha F250TRD-4 Stroke Series Motor
Case Number: 3:2020cv01109
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 Warrant of Arrest in Rem Issued to arrest property as to One (1) 1980 Dusky Marine 233 Vessel, with One (1) 2005 Yamaha F250TRD-4 Stroke Series Motor. (Attachments: #1 Warrant in Rem) (vdm)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/27/2020. (EES)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Restrict Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/27/2020. (EES)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young. (rim)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 3/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) Modified on 2/27/2020 change italics (gav).
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 3/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 ***EX-PARTE***AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Restrict Document - Unsworn Declaration in Support of Civil Forfeiture Complaint by USA. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) Modified on 2/27/2020 change italics (gav).
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Restrict Document - Unsworn Declaration in Support of Civil Forfeiture Complaint filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 3/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) Modified on 2/27/2020 change italics (gav).
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against One (1) 1980 Dusky Marine 233 Vessel, with One (1) 2005 Yamaha F250TRD-4 Stroke Series Motor, filed by USA. Service due by 5/26/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) Modified on 2/27/2020 change italics (gav).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. One (1) 1980 Dusky Marine 233 Vessel, with One (1) 2005 Yamaha F250TRD-4 Stroke Series Motor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) 1980 Dusky Marine 233 Vessel, with One (1) 2005 Yamaha F250TRD-4 Stroke Series Motor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?