Santander Securities LLC v. Vega-Ortiz
Plaintiff: Santander Securities LLC
Defendant: Joel Vega-Ortiz
Case Number: 3:2020cv01159
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 JUDGMENT is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/8/2020.(MET)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Santander Securities LLC (Bayouth-Montes, Alberto)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noted #10 Informative Motion regarding Waiver of Service and FINRA Proceedings. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/6/2020. (CRH)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Waiver of Service and FINRA Proceedings filed by Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes on behalf of Santander Securities LLC Responses due by 4/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bayouth-Montes, Alberto)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noted and Denied #4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support Thereof; Noted and Denied #3 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. The request for injunctive relief is denied without prejudice as improvidently sought. Plaintiff does not provide any date in which said arbitration is set to take place. The Court very much doubts it will take place at least before March 30, 2020, given the current coronavirus measures taken by the Governor of Puerto Rico. Most likely, even beyond then. More so, during the present pandemic, it is impracticable to expect summons to be served in this case. The Court directs Plaintiffs counsel to 1) as soon as possible notify the opposing party (via his counsel) and the arbitrator(s) of the instant action, telephonically or electronically; 2) provide them all with a copy of all pleadings in this case (which, unless waived, will not constitute service of process); 3) determine if the opposing party waives service of process, and 4) confer with the opposing party and arbitrators as to when they realistically expect the arbitration to commence, and whether the arbitrators and opposing party are willing to have the matter of the court-imposed stay be attended in a fast-track manner. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3.20/2020. (MET) Modified on 3/23/2020 to edit title (gmm).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noted #2 Motion for Disclosure. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/20.200. (MET)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Joel Vega-Ortiz (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support Thereof filed by Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes on behalf of Santander Securities LLC Responses due by 4/1/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Statement of Claim), #2 Exhibit B (Amended Complaint), #3 Text of Proposed Order Porposed Order)(Bayouth-Montes, Alberto) Modified on 3/23/2020 to edit title (gmm).
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief filed by Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes on behalf of Santander Securities LLC Responses due by 4/1/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bayouth-Montes, Alberto)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Fed. R. Civ. P. filed by Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes on behalf of Santander Securities LLC Responses due by 4/1/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bayouth-Montes, Alberto)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Prayer for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Joel Vega-Ortiz ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6839369.), filed by Santander Securities LLC. Service due by 6/16/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Statement of Claim), #2 Exhibit B (Amended Complaint), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #5 Summons Summons)(Bayouth-Montes, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santander Securities LLC v. Vega-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Vega-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santander Securities LLC
Represented By: Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?