International Food Service Purchasing Group, Inc. v. Beavers et al
Plaintiff: International Food Service Purchasing Group, Inc.
Defendant: Mr. Brandon Beavers, Best Chicago Meat Company, LLC and Chicago Premium Steaks, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01162
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: GRANTED. Plaintiff International Food Service Purchasing Group is allowed 14 days, until June 5, 2020, to retain new counsel for this case. Until new counsel is retained, its bankruptcy counsel, Alexandra Bigas-Valedon, will represent International Food Service in this case. She will make an appearance no later than May 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/22/2020. (brc)
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw Legal Representation as to Ferraiuoli LLC, Attorney as to Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes and Attorney as to Jaime A. Torrens-Davila, MOTION for extension of time until June 19, 2020 to Announce New Counsel for Plaintiff, MOTION to Hold in Abeyance the Term to Respond to the Dispositive Motion Until New Counsel Appears for Plaintiff re #14 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in Support as to All Plaintiffs filed by Best Chicago Meat Company, LLC, Brandon Beavers, Chicago Premium Steaks, LLC filed by Jaime A. Torrens-Davila on behalf of International Food Service Purchasing Group, Inc. Responses due by 6/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Torrens-Davila, Jaime)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in Support as to All Plaintiffs filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Motion Submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/07/2020. (brc)
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: 9 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order, #3 Exhibit Letters/Notifications, #4 Exhibit Newspaper/Edicts, #5 Exhibit Affidavits)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #5 Motion in Compliance: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/31/2020. (brc)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #3 Motion in Compliance: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/31/2020. (brc)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents: GRANTED. Certified English translations due April 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/31/2020. (brc)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. Pursuant to the Order of Recusal (Docket No. 7) entered by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, this case has been randomly reassigned, within the Case Assignment System, to Judge Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2020.(gr)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby disqualifies himself from this case, which the Clerk shall, within the Case Assignment System, proceed to randomly reassign to another U.S. district judge. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/30/2020. (gr)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 Motion In Compliance with Local Civ. R. 3(A) filed by Luis Cotto-Roman on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotto-Roman, Luis)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). (arg)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Motion In Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1446 (d) filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents attached to Notice of Removal filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, San Juan Part, case number SJ2019CV13275. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6845927), filed by Chicago Premium Steaks, LLC, Best Chicago Meat Company, LLC, Brandon Beavers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order, #3 Exhibit Letters/Notifications by Certified Mail, #4 Exhibit Edict, #5 Affidavits)(Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Food Service Purchasing Group, Inc. v. Beavers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Brandon Beavers
Represented By: Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez
Represented By: Luis Cotto-Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Chicago Meat Company, LLC
Represented By: Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez
Represented By: Luis Cotto-Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Premium Steaks, LLC
Represented By: Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez
Represented By: Luis Cotto-Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Food Service Purchasing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Represented By: Jaime A. Torrens-Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?