Bonnet v. Haciendo Central, Inc.
Plaintiff: PEDRO L BONNET and Pedro L. Bonnet
Defendant: HACIENDA CENTRAL, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01172
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for extension of time. Responsive pleading due by 6/10/2020. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 6/4/2020. (EA)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time filed by Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin on behalf of Hacienda Central, Inc. Responses due by 6/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Responsive pleading due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 5/5/2020. (EA)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Pedro L. Bonnet filed by Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin on behalf of Hacienda Central, Inc. Responses due by 5/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hacienda Central, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a patent or Trademark by Pedro L. Bonnet. (Cacho, Alejandro) Modified on 4/13/2020 edit text (gav).
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hacienda Central, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6854811.), filed by Pedro L. Bonnet. Service due by 7/8/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates, #2 Exhibit Certificates, #3 Exhibit USPTO Office Actions, #4 Exhibit New Release, #5 Category Sheet Category sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet, #7 Summons summons)(Cacho, Alejandro) Modified on 4/13/2020 edit text. (gav).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonnet v. Haciendo Central, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO L BONNET
Represented By: Alejandro J. Cacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro L. Bonnet
Represented By: Alejandro J. Cacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HACIENDA CENTRAL, INC.
Represented By: Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?