Banco Santander Puerto Rico v. Puerto Rico Hospital Supply, Inc. et al
Interested Party: US Trustee
Appellee: Customed, Inc. and Puerto Rico Hospital Supply, Inc.
Appellant: Banco Santander Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2020cv01187
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for extension of time until 7/31/20 to File Appelant's Brief and Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Banco Santander Puerto Rico, Customed, Inc., Puerto Rico Hospital Supply, Inc. Responses due by 7/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for extension of time; granting #9 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 06/02/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for extension of time until 07/03/2020 to File Appellant's Brief filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Banco Santander Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/15/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of Additional Document from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Banco Santander Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Doc dkt 56, #2 Certified Docket)(babk)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for extension of time until 6/18/20 to File Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Banco Santander Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
May 20, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/18/2020 to file Opposition to Motion to Strike. ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number. To be re-filed.*** (rom)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number*** Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/18/2020 to file Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Banco Santander Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel) Modified on 5/22/2020 (rom).
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of Additional Documents from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Banco Santander Puerto Rico, Customed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Motion to Strike Document, #2 Appellant's Motion to inform Intent to Respond to Motion to Strike, #3 Certified Docket)(babk) Modified on 5/19/2020 (babk).
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Banco Santander Puerto Rico. Appellant Brief due by 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Items, #2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I, #3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II, #4 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part III_Part1, #5 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part III_Part2, #6 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part III_Part3, #7 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part IV, #8 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part V_Part1, #9 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part V_Part2, #10 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part VI, #11 Certified Docket)(babk)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT. Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. (gr)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) Modified on 4/24/2020 to note filed in error (gr).
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Banco Santander Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 36, #3 Judgment dkt 38, #4 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banco Santander Puerto Rico v. Puerto Rico Hospital Supply, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Customed, Inc.
Represented By: Alexis Fuentes-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Puerto Rico Hospital Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Alexis Fuentes-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Banco Santander Puerto Rico
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Alexis Fuentes-Hernandez
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez-Barrera
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?