Oriental Financial Services Corp. v. Betancourt-Figueroa et al
Defendant: Mariano Betancourt Figueroa and Cristina Quiles Santos
Petitioner: Oriental Financial Services Corp.
Respondent: Cristina Quiles-Santos and Mariano Betancourt-Figueroa
Case Number: 3:2020cv01191
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss at Docket No. 7 filed by Oriental Financial Services Corp. Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Mariano Betancourt-Figueroa, Cristina Quiles-Santos filed by Oriental Financial Services Corp.. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Mariano Betancourt-Figueroa, Cristina Quiles-Santos filed by Winston Vidal-Gambaro on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AWARD)(Vidal-Gambaro, Winston)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Winston Vidal-Gambaro on behalf of All Defendants (Vidal-Gambaro, Winston)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices, Orders, Pleadings and Documents by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Financial Services Corp. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mariano Betancourt Figueroa, Cristina Quiles Santos (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6865764.), filed by Oriental Financial Services Corp.. Service due by 7/22/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit E(cont.), #8 Category Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Hernandez-Freire, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oriental Financial Services Corp. v. Betancourt-Figueroa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariano Betancourt Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristina Quiles Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oriental Financial Services Corp.
Represented By: Pedro Hernandez-Freire
Represented By: Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cristina Quiles-Santos
Represented By: Winston Vidal-Gambaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mariano Betancourt-Figueroa
Represented By: Winston Vidal-Gambaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?