Rodriguez-Figueroa v. Tory Burch, LLC
Plaintiff: Sheila Rodriguez-Figueroa
Defendant: Corporation X, Tory Burch, LLC and ABC Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01217
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting as requested #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/1/2020. (CRH)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Sheila Rodriguez-Figueroa filed by Nelson N. Cordova-Morales on behalf of Tory Burch, LLC Responses due by 6/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Cordova-Morales, Nelson)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson N. Cordova-Morales on behalf of Tory Burch, LLC (Cordova-Morales, Nelson)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Tory Burch, LLC by Sheila Rodriguez-Figueroa upon Tory Burch, LLC served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Suro-Ballester, Jorge)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tory Burch, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/8/2020 to correct signature date in pdf) (mcm).
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel A. Suro-Carrasco on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Suro-Carrasco, Miguel)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tory Burch, LLC, ABC Insurance Company, Corporation X ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6877297.), filed by Sheila Rodriguez-Figueroa. Service due by 8/5/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Appearance of Counsel, #4 Summons)(Suro-Ballester, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Figueroa v. Tory Burch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tory Burch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Rodriguez-Figueroa
Represented By: Miguel A. Suro-Carrasco
Represented By: Jorge M. Suro-Ballester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?