Gonzalez-Droz et al v. Organic Med Growers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yessennia Candelaria, Efrain Gonzalez Droz and Conjugal Community Property Partnership composed by Efrain Gonzalez Droz and Yessennia Candelaria
Defendant: Organic Med Growers, Inc. and Elmer Roman, in his capacity as Secretary of State of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2020cv01258
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Noting #24 "Motion Submitting Certified English Translations of Exhibits." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/8/2020. (ebb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations of Exhibits filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Organic Med Growers, Inc. Responses due by 7/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, Shareholder's Agreement (Eng. Translation), #2 Exhibit E, Notices (Eng. Translation))(Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
July 2, 2020 Filing 23 Second MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Gerardo Gonzalez-Roman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Roman, Gerardo)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Noting #20 "Motion Submitting the Certified English Translation of the Exhibit B of the Sur-Reply." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/23/2020. (ebb)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Noting #18 "Motion Submitting the Certified English Translation of the Exhibit A of the Sur-Reply and Informing the Erroneous Filing of Exhibit B." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/23/2020. (ebb)
June 23, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #19 MOTION Submitting Correction to re: #14 SURReply to Reply to Opposition, filed by Efrain Gonzalez-Droz, Conjugal Community Property Partnership composed by Efrain Gonzalez Droz and Yessennia Candelaria, Yessennia Candelaria. ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case.*** (rom)
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #19 MOTION Submitting Correction to re: #14 SURReply to Reply to Opposition, filed by Efrain Gonzalez-Droz, Conjugal Community Property Partnership composed by Efrain Gonzalez Droz and Yessennia Candelaria, Yessennia Candelaria filed by Efrain Gonzalez-Droz, Conjugal Community Property Partnership composed by Efrain Gonzalez Droz and Yessennia Candelaria, Yessennia Candelaria filed by Gerardo Gonzalez-Roman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OMG Motion to State Court)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Gonzalez-Roman, Gerardo)
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case*** MOTION Submitting Correction to re: #14 SURReply to Reply to Opposition, filed by Efrain Gonzalez-Droz, Conjugal Community Property Partnership composed by Efrain Gonzalez Droz and Yessennia Candelaria, Yessennia Candelaria filed by Gerardo Gonzalez-Roman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Gonzalez-Roman, Gerardo) Modified on 6/23/2020 (rom).
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 First INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Gerardo Gonzalez-Roman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summon, #2 Exhibit OMG motion at state court)(Gonzalez-Roman, Gerardo)
June 19, 2020 Filing 17 OMG's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Yessennia Candelaria, Conjugal Community Property Partnership composed by Efrain Gonzalez Droz and Yessennia Candelaria, Efrain Gonzalez-Droz filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Plaintiffs Yessennia Candelaria, Conjugal Community Property Partnership composed by Efrain Gonzalez Droz and Yessennia Candelaria, Efrain Gonzalez-Droz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Registry, #2 Exhibit B Shareholders Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Certificate of Cancellation, #4 Exhibit D Letter, #5 Exhibit E Notification of fines, #6 Exhibit F Written Consent)(Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting #13 "Motion For Leave to File Documents in Spanish and For Extension of Time to Submit Certified Translations." Certified translations due by 7/8/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/19/2020. (ebb)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Noting #12 "Motion Submitting Certified English Translations." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/19/2020. (ebb)
June 18, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #10 Motion In Compliance OMG's Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim as to #8 Order. ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Event. Counsel to re-file using the correct event under "Initial Pleadings and Service" and "Answers to Complaints".*** (rom)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 SURREPLY to #9 Reply to Opposition by Defandant OMG re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summos served on register agent, #2 Exhibit OMG motion in compliance at state court)(Gonzalez-Roman, Gerardo) Modified on 6/22/2020 to add docket relation (rom).
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Organic Med Growers, Inc. Responses due by 7/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations of Exhibits re: 7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents, filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Organic Med Growers, Inc. Responses due by 7/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-2 Order, #3 Exhibit 1-3 Subpoena, #4 Exhibit 1-4 Notification, #5 Exhibit 1-5 Motion, #6 Exhibit 1-6 Motion, #7 Exhibit 1-7 Notification, #8 Exhibit 1-8 Notification, #9 Exhibit 1-9 Summons, #10 Exhibit 1-10 Motion, #11 Exhibit 1-11 Motion)(Related document(s) 7 ) (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 Opposition to #1 Request for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Organic Med Growers, Inc. (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany) Modified on 6/19/2020 to edit docket title(rom).
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 *** FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Event*** MOTION in Compliance OMG's Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim as to #8 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Organic Med Growers, Inc. Responses due by 7/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Registry, #2 Exhibit Shareholders Agreement, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Cancellation, #4 Exhibit Cancellation letter, #5 Exhibit Notification of fines, #6 Exhibit Written Consent)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 Reply to Plaintiffs Motion at Dkt. #5 In Compliance with Order at Dkt. 8, filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Organic Med Growers, Inc. Responses due by 6/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany) Modified on 6/12/2020 to edit docket title (rom).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: #1 "Notice of Removal" and #5 "Urgent Opposition to Notice of Removal." See attached. Reply due by 6/11/2020. Surreply due by 6/18/2020. Defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 6/18/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 06/04/2020.(LMR)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting in part #3 "Motion for Leave to File Documents in Spanish and for Extension of Time to Submit Certified Translations." Certified translations due by June 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 06/04/2020. (LMR)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noting #2 "Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Sec 1446(d)." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 06/4/2020. (LMR)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion of Notice of Removal filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Organic Med Growers, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gonzalez-Roman, Gerardo)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Organic Med Growers, Inc. Responses due by 6/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Motion In Compliance filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of Organic Med Growers, Inc. Responses due by 6/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service on Counsel of Record in State Action, #2 Exhibit Informative Motion filed before State Court)(Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, Ponce Superior Part, case number PO2020CV00726. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6904146), filed by Organic Med Growers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit Certificate of Registry, #13 Exhibit Stadler Declaration, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Category Sheet)(Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Droz et al v. Organic Med Growers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yessennia Candelaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Gonzalez Droz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Community Property Partnership composed by Efrain Gonzalez Droz and Yessennia Candelaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic Med Growers, Inc.
Represented By: Leany Prieto-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmer Roman, in his capacity as Secretary of State of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?