Rivera-Molina v. Oliveras
Appellee: Chapter 13 Trustee Alejandro Oliveras and Alejandro Oliveras
Interested Party: US Trustee, Enrique M Blanco Casasnova, Sandra Martinez Arroyo, Enrique M. Blanco-Casasnova and Sandra Martinez-Arroyo
Appellant: Carlos Rivera Molina and Carlos Rivera-Molina
Case Number: 3:2020cv01295
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. It may be reopened by any party upon the conclusion of the matters pending before the Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/31/2020. (MPL)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 "Motion to Stay the Instant Appeal Until The Bankruptcy Court Rules On Two Other Pending Motions to Dismiss." This case is stayed and ordered administratively closed. It may be reopened by any party upon the conclusion of the matters pending before the Bankruptcy Court. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/31/2020. (MPL)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay re: #4 Bankruptcy Complete Record on Appeal filed by Carlos Rivera-Molina filed by Luis A. Melendez-Albizu on behalf of Carlos Rivera-Molina Responses due by 8/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Firstbank Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - BPPR Motion to Dismiss)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Melendez-Albizu, Luis)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Supplemental Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Carlos Rivera-Molina. Appellant Brief due by 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transcript, #2 Certified Docket)(babk)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Carlos Rivera-Molina. Appellant Brief due by 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation and Statement of Issues, #2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 1, #3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 2-Related Case 15-1445, #4 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3-Related Case 16-2057, #5 Certified Docket)(babk)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Carlos Rivera Molina. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order docket 96, #3 Order docket 97, #4 Order docket 127, #5 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Molina v. Oliveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chapter 13 Trustee Alejandro Oliveras
Represented By: Miriam D. Salwen-Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alejandro Oliveras
Represented By: Miriam D. Salwen-Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Enrique M Blanco Casasnova
Represented By: Luis D. Flores-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sandra Martinez Arroyo
Represented By: Luis D. Flores-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Enrique M. Blanco-Casasnova
Represented By: Luis D. Flores-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sandra Martinez-Arroyo
Represented By: Luis D. Flores-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carlos Rivera Molina
Represented By: Luis A. Melendez-Albizu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carlos Rivera-Molina
Represented By: Luis A. Melendez-Albizu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?