Bakhsh et al v. The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company of PR, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mrs. Jill Bakhsh, Community Property Conjugal Partnership, Mr. Kharune Bakhsh and Bakhsh Community Property Conjugal Partnership
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., The Ritz-Carlton Hotels Company, LLC, AIG Insurance Puerto Rico, DBR Hotel Owner, LLC, Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico, Inc., The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company of Puerto Rico, Inc. d/b/a Dorado Beach - Ritz-Carlton Reserve Hotel, The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Security Companies D, E and F, Insurance Companies A, B & C, Operations Companies G, H & I, Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico, LLC and The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company of Puerto Rico, Inc. doing business as Dorado Beach - Ritz Carlton Reserve Hotel
Case Number: 3:2020cv01345
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc on behalf of Defendants AIG Insurance Puerto Rico, DBR Hotel Owner, LLC, Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico, LLC.(DeMier-LeBlanc, Charles)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/12/2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. Answer now due by 9/12/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/10/2020. (ERC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/12/2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jill Bakhsh, Kharune Bakhsh filed by Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc on behalf of AIG Insurance Puerto Rico Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (DeMier-LeBlanc, Charles)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss without prejudice as to The Ritz Carlton Hotels Company, LLC and as to Marriott International, Inc. filed by Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear; #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer deadline due by 9/4/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/14/2020. (ERC)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear and Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc on behalf of AIG Insurance Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (DeMier-LeBlanc, Charles)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon DBR Hotel Owner, LLC served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico, LLC served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon AIG Insurance Puerto Rico served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company of Puerto Rico, Inc. served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AIG Insurance Puerto Rico, DBR Hotel Owner, LLC, Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company of Puerto Rico, Inc. d/b/a Dorado Beach - Ritz-Carlton Reserve Hotel, The Ritz-Carlton Hotels Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6951585.), filed by Kharune Bakhsh, Bakhsh Community Property Conjugal Partnership, Jill Bakhsh. Service due by 10/14/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan) Modified on 7/17/2020 to edit docket text (vso).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakhsh et al v. The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company of PR, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ritz-Carlton Hotels Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Insurance Puerto Rico
Represented By: Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBR Hotel Owner, LLC
Represented By: Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company of Puerto Rico, Inc. d/b/a Dorado Beach - Ritz-Carlton Reserve Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Companies D, E and F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies A, B & C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Operations Companies G, H & I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By: Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company of Puerto Rico, Inc. doing business as Dorado Beach - Ritz Carlton Reserve Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Jill Bakhsh
Represented By: Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Property Conjugal Partnership
Represented By: Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Kharune Bakhsh
Represented By: Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakhsh Community Property Conjugal Partnership
Represented By: Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?