DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS MEMBER CASE - LEAD CASE IS NOW 20-1302 (DRD)
Petitioner: Aspen American Insurance Company and Pure Adventure, Corp.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01346
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER noted #2 Motion for Bond. All filings related to this case shall be filed in Lead Case No. 20-1302 (DRD) hereinafter. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/24/2020. (EA)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COPY OF ORDER (Lead Case 20-1302) Case number 20-cv-1346 shall be consolidated with the instant case. Judge Daniel R. Dominguez shall preside over both cases. The Hon. Francisco A. Besosa has consented to said consolidation. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/21/2020. (EA) (gav) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian P. Carvajal-Zarabozo on behalf of Aspen American Insurance Company, Pure Adventure, Corp. (Carvajal-Zarabozo, Ian)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Motion submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/20/2020. (brc)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Complaint. Subject to his consent, this matter is transferred to the docket of Judge Dominguez, who is handling the damages action related to this case, Civil Action No. 20-1302 (DRD). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/17/2020. (brc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Submitting Letter of Undertaking filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of Aspen American Insurance Company, Pure Adventure, Corp. Responses due by 7/31/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) Modified on 7/20/2020 to replace capital letters (ab).
July 17, 2020 DEPOSIT of Funds in the amount of $ 1,000.00, receipt number PRX100071532. (Re: DKT 2) To be deposited on the next working day in an interest bearing account in compliance with L.Cv.R. 67. **FUNDS WILL BE AVAILABLE FOR DISBURSEMENT AFTER 7 WORKING DAYS** (rim)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Bond under Local Rule F(1) filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of Aspen American Insurance Company, Pure Adventure, Corp. Responses due by 7/31/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Check)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) Modified on 7/20/2020 to replace capital letters (ab).
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against All defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6951937.), filed by Pure Adventure, Corp., Aspen American Insurance Company. Service due by 10/14/2020, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) Modified on 7/20/2020 to replace capital letters and edit docket text (ab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS MEMBER CASE - LEAD CASE IS NOW 20-1302 (DRD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aspen American Insurance Company
Represented By: Fernando Sabater-Clavell
Represented By: Ian P. Carvajal-Zarabozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pure Adventure, Corp.
Represented By: Fernando Sabater-Clavell
Represented By: Ian P. Carvajal-Zarabozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?