Banco Popular de Puerto Rico v. Santiago-Salicrup
Appellant: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico
Interested Party: US Trustee and Chapter 13 Trustee
Appellee: Wanda I Santiago Salicrup and Wanda I. Santiago-Salicrup
Case Number: 3:2020cv01361
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Motion for extension of time. Granted. Appellants brief due by September 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/1/2020. (wm) Modified link on 9/2/2020 (idg).
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time until September 28, 2020 to File Appellant's Brief filed by Juan C. Salichs-Pou on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico Responses due by 9/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Salichs-Pou, Juan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Brief due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(acbk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 68, #3 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico v. Santiago-Salicrup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Juan C. Salichs-Pou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Chapter 13 Trustee
Represented By: Alejandro Oliveras-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wanda I Santiago Salicrup
Represented By: Rosana Moreno-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wanda I. Santiago-Salicrup
Represented By: Rosana Moreno-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?