ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC v. Fernandez-Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC
Defendant: Ruben Gilberto Fernandez-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Carus and Monica Carus-Gonzalez
Case Number: 3:2020cv01379
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dismissing Plaintiff's case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/20/2021. (ERC)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) Modified on 2/3/2021 remove italics (gav).
November 10, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #4 Summons Returned Executed.***FILE IN ERROR Incorrect Filing*** Summons Returned Executed with different execution dates should be filed separate, noting corresponding dates accordingly as per the Summons Returned Executed Event on CM ECF. Counsel to refile. (mg)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 ***FILE IN ERROR Incorrect Filing*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC upon All Defendants. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) Modified on 11/10/2020 (mg).
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monica Carus-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Carus, Ruben Gilberto Fernandez-Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6970019.), filed by ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC. Service due by 11/2/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Modification Deed, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Title, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Sheet, #7 Summons)(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC v. Fernandez-Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Gilberto Fernandez-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Carus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Carus-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC
Represented By: Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?