Erazo-Santana v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Erazo-Santana
Defendant: Departamento de Justicia de Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion and Institucion Adulto Ponce 1000
Case Number: 3:2020cv01381
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #31 Motion for Joinder: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/11/2020. (brc)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re #30 Motion for Joinder: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/11/2020. (brc)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re #29 Motion for Joinder: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/11/2020. (brc)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #28 Motion for Joinder: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/11/2020. (brc)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #27 Motion for Joinder: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/11/2020. (brc)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #26 Motion for Joinder: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/11/2020. (brc)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #25 Motion for Joinder: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/11/2020. (brc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Manuel Rodriguez-Cruz, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
September 11, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Jorge Lugo-Caraballo, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
September 11, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Hector Roman Ortiz, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
September 11, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by William Boria-Gonzalez, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
September 11, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Hector Rios-Pagan, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
September 11, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Pedro Juan Serrano Casanova, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Amador Rodriguez-Colon, Pro se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ***FILED IN ERROR. Filed in wrong case*** ORDER re #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: NOTED. Once petitioner David Diaz-Castro submits a properly executed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, the Court may assign counsel for him. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/04/2020. (brc) Modified on 9/8/2020 (ab).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #19 Motion for Joinder; re #20 Motion for Joinder; re #21 Motion for Joinder; and re #22 Motion for Joinder: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/04/2020. (brc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Daniel Mendez-Rivera, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Edwin Rodriguez-Laboy, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Angel M. Alicea-Hernandez, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Tomas Torres-Rivera, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 Motion for Joinder: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/31/2020. (brc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Manuel Reyes Rivera, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 Motion for Joinder: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/27/2020. (brc)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Joinder Re: #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Juan Cruz-Rodriguez, Pro se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief: DENIED. Each inmate must file his own petition. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/25/2020. (brc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Joinder re #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Luis Roque Agosto, Pro Se in the Spanish language. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #5 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; #9 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; and re #10 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief: DENIED. The inmate must file his own case. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/21/2020. (brc)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel, and re #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Carlos Erazo-Santana: GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent defendant Erazo-Santana. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/21/2020. (brc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Joinder re #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Jose Delgado-Carrion, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Joinder re #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Kermit M. Rodriguez, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Account Statement by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. (ab)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ab)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #3 Affidavit in Support) (ab).
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Joinder re #1 Mandamus filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana filed by Roberto L. Barbosa-Lopez, Pro Se in the Spanish language. Responses due by 9/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ) (ab)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. re: #1 Complaint. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/27/2020. (ab)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 **SELECTED PARTY** Inmate Statement by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. (ab)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. Responses due by 8/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ab)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Mandamus against All Defendants, filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. Service due by 11/2/2020, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2020: #2 NPV PSLC PSLC Transmittal Memorandum) (ab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erazo-Santana v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Departamento de Justicia de Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institucion Adulto Ponce 1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Erazo-Santana
Represented By: Eric A. Vos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?