DLJ Mortagage Capital, Inc. v. Hernandez-Santos et al
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortagage Capital, Inc.
Defendant: Jose Antonio Hernandez-Santos, Margarita Vargas-Gonzalez and Conjugal partnership Hernandez-Vargas
Case Number: 3:2020cv01402
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION filing Affidavit filed by Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin on behalf of DLJ Mortagage Capital, Inc. Responses due by 10/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto) Modified event and title on 9/30/2020 (idg).
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLJ Mortagage Capital, Inc. upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION requesting Order filed by Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin on behalf of DLJ Mortagage Capital, Inc. Responses due by 9/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit inspection, #2 Exhibit deed of mortgage)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal partnership Hernandez-Vargas, Jose Antonio Hernandez-Santos, Margarita Vargas-Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6978075.), filed by DLJ Mortagage Capital, Inc.. Service due by 11/9/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note and allonge, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortagage Capital, Inc. v. Hernandez-Santos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortagage Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Antonio Hernandez-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margarita Vargas-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal partnership Hernandez-Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?