Banco Popular de Puerto Rico v. Puerto Rico Tourism Development Fund
Appellant: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico
Interested Party: US Trustee
Appellee: Puerto Rico Tourism Development Fund
Case Number: 3:2020cv01410
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 Appellant's BRIEF by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. Appellee Brief due by 10/19/2020. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #12 "Banco Popular de Puerto Rico's Motion for 2-Day Extension of Time to File Appellate Brief." Appellate brief due on October 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/7/2020. (ebb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 8, 2020 to file Appellate Brief filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico Responses due by 10/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noting #10 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/6/2020. (ebb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rocio Del Mar Valentin-Colon on behalf of Puerto Rico Tourism Development Fund (Valentin-Colon, Rocio)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #8 "Banco Popular De Puerto Rico's Motion For Brief Extension of Time of 4 Business Days to File Appellate Brief." Appellate brief due by 10/6/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/25/2020. (ebb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 6, 2020 to file File Appellate Brief, MOTION for extension of time until October 6, 2020 to File Appellate Brief filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico Responses due by 10/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. Appellant Brief due by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation and Statement of Isues, #2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I, #3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II_Part1, #4 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II_Part2, #5 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II_Part3, #6 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II_Part4, #7 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II_Part5, #8 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II_Part6, #9 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part III, #10 Appellee's Designation of Additional Items, #11 Appellee's Record on Appeal, #12 Certified Docket)(babk)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 "Motion to Withdraw from Legal Representation and For Thirty days for TDF to Appear with Counsel." Attorney Giselle Lopez-Soler is granted leave to withdraw. The Puerto Rico Tourism Development Fund shall announce new legal representation not later than 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 09/03/2020. (LMR)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Giselle Lopez-Soler filed by Giselle Lopez-Soler on behalf of Puerto Rico Tourism Development Fund Responses due by 9/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #3 "Banco Popular de Puerto Rico's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellate Brief." Brief due on September 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/28/2020. (ebb)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time until September 29, 2020 to file Appellate Brief filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico Responses due by 9/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 434, #3 Order dkt 461, #4 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico v. Puerto Rico Tourism Development Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Sergio Criado-Mangual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Puerto Rico Tourism Development Fund
Represented By: Giselle Lopez-Soler
Represented By: Rocio Del Mar Valentin-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?