Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Liberty Cablevision of Puerto Rico LLC et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Liberty Cablevision of Puerto Rico LLC and Liberty Communications of Puerto Rico LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01423
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to dismiss / Joint Motion for Dismissal as to Liberty Cablevision of Puerto Rico LLC and to Amend The Complaints Caption Accordingly as to Liberty Cablevision of Puerto Rico LLC filed by Maristella Collazo-Soto on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Responses due by 10/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Evidence of the merger and change of the entitys name)(Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until November 9, 2020 to File Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Karla G. Venegas-Bigas on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Venegas-Bigas, Karla)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to allow Julie B. Albert to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100072977) filed by Karla G. Venegas-Bigas on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV PAYMENT RECEIPT, #2 Supplement NEW YORK BAR GOOD STANDING CERTIFICATE)(Venegas-Bigas, Karla)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to allow Paul J. Reilly to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100072978) filed by Karla G. Venegas-Bigas on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV PAYMENT RECEIPT, #2 Supplement TEXAS BAR GOOD STANDING CERTIFICATE)(Venegas-Bigas, Karla)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for extension of time until October 9, 2020 filed by Karla G. Venegas-Bigas on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Venegas-Bigas, Karla)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #4 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents MOTION for Extension of Time until and including September 3rd, 2020 to file Certified Translations filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company filed by Maristella Collazo-Soto on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Responses due by 9/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Screen Capture from Defendants Web Page (Translated), #2 Exhibit C - Liberty Smart Protect Mark Application in PRTO (Translated))(Related document(s) #4 ) (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company upon Liberty Communications of Puerto Rico LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company upon Liberty Cablevision of Puerto Rico LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Vidal-Font, Jean)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Liberty Cablevision of Puerto Rico LLC, Liberty Communications of Puerto Rico LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until and including September 3rd, 2020 to file Certified Translations filed by Maristella Collazo-Soto on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Responses due by 8/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement byLiberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.. (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Cablevision of Puerto Rico LLC, Liberty Communications of Puerto Rico LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6983188.), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Service due by 11/12/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reg. Nos. 2734195 and 1405249, #2 Exhibit B - Screen Capture from Defendants web page, #3 Exhibit C - Liberty Protect Mark Application in PRTO, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Summons as to Liberty Cablevision of Puerto Rico LLC, #7 Summons as to Liberty Communications of Puerto Rico LLC)(Collazo-Soto, Maristella)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Liberty Cablevision of Puerto Rico LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Cablevision of Puerto Rico LLC
Represented By: Karla G. Venegas-Bigas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Communications of Puerto Rico LLC
Represented By: Karla G. Venegas-Bigas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Maristella Collazo-Soto
Represented By: Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?