Rosado-Mejas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Israel Eli Rosado-Mejias
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv01438
Filed: August 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Referring Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 4 ), this case has been assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment, as per 28 USC sec 636. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 20-1438 (BJM). Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 08/25/2020. (ft)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff consents to proceed before a USMJ in the Complaint. Accordingly, this case is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/24/2020. (CRH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
August 22, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT for Review of Disability Decision against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6992434.), filed by Israel E Rosado-Mejas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney Gen, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Social Security)(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosado-Mejas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Eli Rosado-Mejias
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?