Rivera-Cruz v. Municipality of Guayama, et.al.,
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Rivera-Cruz
Defendant: Municipality of Guayama, Carmelo Martinez, John Doe, Jose Torres-Suarez, Hon Eduardo E. Cintron-Suarez, William Martinez-Gomez and Richard Roe
Case Number: 3:2020cv01448
Filed: August 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: #12 "Motion for Attorney Disqualification for Conflict of Interest." Attorney Vera shall respond by November 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/26/2020. (ebb)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #11 "Motion Resting Extension of Time to File Response/Reply." Response due November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/26/2020. (ebb)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/2020 to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William Martinez-Gomez, Municipality of Guayama, Carmelo Martinez, Jose Torres-Suarez, Eduardo E. Cintron-Suarez filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez on behalf of Eduardo E. Cintron-Suarez, Carmelo Martinez, William Martinez-Gomez, Municipality of Guayama, Jose Torres-Suarez Responses due by 11/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vera-Ramirez, Eduardo)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noting and Granting #7 "Notice of Appearance and Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead." Defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 11/2/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/2/2020. (ebb)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noting and Granting #6 "Special Notice of Appearance and Request For Extension of Time." The appearing codefendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 11/2/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/2/2020. (ebb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time until 11/02/2020 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez on behalf of Eduardo E. Cintron-Suarez, Carmelo Martinez, William Martinez-Gomez, Municipality of Guayama, Jose Torres-Suarez Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vera-Ramirez, Eduardo)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2, 2020 to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, filed by Miguel A. Rivera-Cruz filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Eduardo E. Cintron-Suarez, Carmelo Martinez, William Martinez-Gomez, Jose Torres-Suarez Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Eduardo E. Cintron-Suarez, Carmelo Martinez, William Martinez-Gomez, Municipality of Guayama, Jose Torres-Suarez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (arg)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Miguel A. Rivera-Cruz. Service due by 11/30/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/1/2020. (arg)
August 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7000199.), filed by MIGUEL ANGEL RIVERA-CRUZ. Service due by 11/30/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I Administrative Investigation)(Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Cruz v. Municipality of Guayama, et.al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Guayama
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmelo Martinez
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Torres-Suarez
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Eduardo E. Cintron-Suarez
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Martinez-Gomez
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Rivera-Cruz
Represented By: Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?