Rosado-Arroyo et al v. Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edwin S. Ramos-Perez, Jaime A. Ferrer-Irizarry, Jose A. Rosado-Arroyo, Ramon Perez-Alvarez, Ruperto Rosario-Montalvo, Jose A. Ramos-Cruz, Julio Gonzalez-Diaz, Juan C. Perez-Vargas and Wilfredo Rivera-Colon
Defendant: Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01454
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Document - Reply, MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Juan C. Perez-Vargas, Ramon Perez-Alvarez, Edwin S. Ramos-Perez, Wilfredo Rivera-Colon, Jaime A. Ferrer-Irizarry, Ruperto Rosario-Montalvo, Julio Gonzalez-Diaz, Jose A. Rosado-Arroyo, Jose A. Ramos-Cruz filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 11/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion "Opposition to Motion to Dismiss" filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rivera-Rios, Alexandra) Modified on 10/15/2020 to edit docket title. (mg).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER noted #12 Motion submitting documents filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/13/2020. (lir)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER noted #9 Motion submitting Translations. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/13/2020. (lir)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER noted #8 Motion submitting documents filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/13/2020. (lir)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.) Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/13/2020. (lir)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER noted #2 Motion submitting documents. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/13/2020. (lir)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION Submitting Documents filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 10/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Translation of Motion for Case to be Heard through the Ordinary Civil Procedure, #2 Appendix Translation of motion to the Judicial File, #3 Appendix July 23, 2020 Order, #4 Appendix Translation of July 23, 2020 Order)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 10/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court/Opposition to removal filed by Juan C. Perez-Vargas, Ramon Perez-Alvarez, Edwin S. Ramos-Perez, Wilfredo Rivera-Colon, Jaime A. Ferrer-Irizarry, Ruperto Rosario-Montalvo, Julio Gonzalez-Diaz, Jose A. Rosado-Arroyo, Jose A. Ramos-Cruz filed by Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION Submitting Translations re: #8 MOTION Submitting Documents filed by Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 10/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Original Complaint, #2 Notice of Summons Issued, #3 Issued Summons, #4 Motion Submitting Served Summons, #5 Served Summons, #6 Answer to the Complaint, #7 June 10, 2020 Order, #8 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #9 June 17, 2020 Order, #10 Motion to Join Legal Representation, #11 Motion to Allow Complaint to Proceed through Ordinary Civil Procedure, #12 July 14, 2020 Order, #13 Second July 14, 2020 Order, #14 Plaintiffs' Informative Motion, #15 Goya's Motion Paying Filing Fee, #16 Goya's Motion for the Court Record, #17 Plaintiffs' Motion Paying Filing Fee, #18 Motion Requesting Additional Brief Term, #19 August 3, 2020 Order, #20 Amended Complaint, #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #22 Partial Judgment)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Documents filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 10/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index to Filings, #2 Appendix Filings made in the Puerto Rico Court)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court/Opposition to removal filed by Juan C. Perez-Vargas, Ramon Perez-Alvarez, Edwin S. Ramos-Perez, Wilfredo Rivera-Colon, Jaime A. Ferrer-Irizarry, Ruperto Rosario-Montalvo, Julio Gonzalez-Diaz, Jose A. Rosado-Arroyo, Jose A. Ramos-Cruz filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 10/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court/Opposition to removal filed by Alexandra Rivera-Rios on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Rios, Alexandra)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Rivera-Rios on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rivera-Rios, Alexandra)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. (vdm)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2020 to file Translations, MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2020 to File Answer filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Submitting Documents re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, case number BY2020CV01141. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-7002054), filed by Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit Served Sunnons)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosado-Arroyo et al v. Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin S. Ramos-Perez
Represented By: Alexandra Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime A. Ferrer-Irizarry
Represented By: Alexandra Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Rosado-Arroyo
Represented By: Alexandra Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Perez-Alvarez
Represented By: Alexandra Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruperto Rosario-Montalvo
Represented By: Alexandra Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Ramos-Cruz
Represented By: Alexandra Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Gonzalez-Diaz
Represented By: Alexandra Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Perez-Vargas
Represented By: Alexandra Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Rivera-Colon
Represented By: Alexandra Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?