Caldwell v. Allied Universal Security Services LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Emmett Caldwell
Defendant: AIG American International Group, Allied Universal Security Services LLC, Ramon Adjuster, Retailer Value Inc., M. Montanez, Home Depot P.R. Inc. and Retail Value Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01461
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Leave to File; granting #116 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #116 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to D.E. 112 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #113 MOTION to Compel filed by Emmett Caldwell, #114 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Emmett Caldwell, #112 Response to Motion filed by Emmett Caldwell. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 12/02/2022. (lir)
November 29, 2022 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to D.E. 112, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #113 MOTION to Compel filed by Emmett Caldwell, #114 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Emmett Caldwell, #112 Response to Motion filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC, Home Depot P.R. Inc. Responses due by 12/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #113 , #114 , #112 ) (Lopez, Jeannette)
November 15, 2022 Filing 115 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Emmett Caldwell, Po se. Responses due by 11/29/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav)
November 15, 2022 Filing 114 MOTION to Amend Complaint and Mediation Addendum filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 11/29/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav)
November 15, 2022 Filing 113 MOTION to Compel Service of Motion to Dismiss & Discovery Ect. Served on Pro Bono filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 11/29/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav)
November 15, 2022 Filing 112 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se, Re: #54 MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(gav)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Leave to File; granting #109 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/2/2022. (ABO)
November 2, 2022 Filing 110 REPLY to Motion filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC, Home Depot P.R. Inc. Re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution as to Emmett Caldwell filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC, Home Depot P.R. Inc. filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC, Home Depot P.R. Inc.. (Lopez, Jeannette)
October 25, 2022 Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to File Document , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #107 Response to Motion, filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC, Home Depot P.R. Inc. Responses due by 11/8/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #107 ) (Lopez, Jeannette)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER vacating 106 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/19/2022. (ABO)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the #101 Motion to Dismiss should not be deemed unopposed. Plaintiff Emmett Caldwell shall show cause on or before 11/3/2022. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/19/2022. (ABO)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying #104 Motion for Reconsideration on 99 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Neither the Local Rules nor the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure allow parties to file motions for reconsideration on orders denying reconsideration. Further, the Court will not allow rehashing of arguments that it has denied. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/19/2022. (ABO)
October 18, 2022 Filing 107 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se, Re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution as to Emmett Caldwell filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC, Home Depot P.R. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(gav)
October 18, 2022 Filing 104 MOTION for Reconsideration re 99 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 95 Order filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 11/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(Related document(s) 99 , 95 ) (gav)
October 18, 2022 Filing 103 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 11/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav)
October 13, 2022 Filing 102 MANDATE of USCA as to #81 Notice of Appeal filed by Emmett Caldwell; DISMISSED. RE: #100 USCA JUDGMENT. (mcm)
October 4, 2022 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution as to Emmett Caldwell filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Home Depot P.R. Inc., Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 10/18/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette)
September 21, 2022 Filing 100 USCA JUDGMENT as to #81 Notice of Appeal filed by Emmett Caldwell; Plaintiff-appellant Emmett W. Caldwell has appealed from a district court order allowing his attorney to withdraw from representation, which left Caldwell proceeding pro se. The appeal being interlocutory in nature, and seemingly not coming within any exception to the final-judgment rule, this court issued an order to show cause (April 21, 2022). Caldwell has not responded to the show-cause order, and the time for doing so has long since expired. Hence, no basis for this court's appellate jurisdiction has been presented. For this reason, the appeal is DISMISSED. (mcm)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying #98 MOTION for Reconsideration re 95 Order. The Court sees no reason to depart from its ruling at Docket No. 95 denying without prejudice certain motions for lack of jurisdiction while Plaintiff's appeal was before the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/30/2022. (ERC)
August 29, 2022 Filing 98 MOTION for Reconsideration Adjudicate all Motions Dismissed Filed while Case on Appeal re 95 Order filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 9/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) 95 ) (gav)
August 15, 2022 Filing 97 MANDATE of USCA as to #87 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Emmett Caldwell; DISMISSED. RE: #96 USCA JUDGMENT. (mcm)
July 22, 2022 Filing 96 USCA JUDGMENT as to #87 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Emmett Caldwell; By order entered June 17, 2022, appellant was directed to show cause in writing as to why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. by July 1, 2022 would lead to dismissal for lack of diligent prosecution. Appellant having failed to file a timely response, it is hereby ordered that the above-captioned appeal be DISMISSED in accordance with Local Rule 3.0(b). (mcm)
July 13, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #93 Amended Complaint. ***STRICKEN AS PER ORDER AT D.E. #95*** (gav)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. As Plaintiff has filed an appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Docket Nos. 81, 87, the Court lacks jurisdiction to adjudicate motions currently pending in the case docket. As such, the Court hereby DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the following motions: #46 MOTION for Default Entry as to AIG American International Group; #54 MOTION to Quash Service of Process; #78 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Retailer Value Inc. and MOTION for extension of time to Serve Unserved Defendants; #86 MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #1 Complaint; #82 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Retail Value Inc.; and #92 MOTION for Leave to File Document. The Clerk of Court shall strike the 'Amended Complaint' filed at Docket No. 93. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/12/2022. (ERC)
July 5, 2022 Filing 94 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se, Re: #37 MOTION requesting Order filed by Retail Value Inc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav)
July 5, 2022 Filing 93 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav)
July 5, 2022 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File Document - Amended Complaint- filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 7/19/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav)
May 23, 2022 Filing 91 USCA Case Number 22-1400 for #87 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Emmett Caldwell. (mcm)
May 18, 2022 Filing 90 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #87 Amended Notice of Appeal [Docket Entries 73 & 87] s/c: Emmett Caldwell P.O. Box 16309 San Juan, PR 00908 (mcm)
May 6, 2022 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se, Re: #72 MOTION to Strike. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit, #5 Envelope)(gav)
May 5, 2022 Filing 89 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE PLEADING. The document appeals an order issued on 2/28/2022, but case no. 20-cv-1461 does not have any orders issued on said date. (Notice sent to filer by regular mail.) (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal, #2 Envelope) (gav)
May 5, 2022 Filing 87 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 73 Order by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav) (Main Document 87 replaced on 5/6/2022) (gav).
May 5, 2022 Filing 86 MOTION to Amend Re: #1 Complaint filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 5/19/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #1 ) (gav)
May 5, 2022 Filing 85 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect event.*** NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 73 Order by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. (gav) Modified on 5/6/2022 (gav).
May 5, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #85 Notice of Appeal. ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect event.*** (gav)
April 4, 2022 Filing 84 USCA Case Number 22-1238 for #81 Notice of Appeal filed by Emmett Caldwell. (mcm)
March 31, 2022 Filing 83 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #81 Notice of Appeal [Docket Entries 79 & 81] s/c: Emmett Caldwell, P.O. Box 16309 San Juan, PR 00908 (mcm)
March 18, 2022 Filing 82 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Until Pro Bono Attorney Represents Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Retail Value Inc. filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 4/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav)
March 17, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 79 Order by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. (gav) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2022: #1 Envelope) (gav).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying #77 Motion requesting Order. To the extent that an order is requested, it is denied due to lack of clarity as to Plaintiff's request. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/24/2022. (ERC)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #75 MOTION to Restrict Document ; and granting #74 MOTION requesting Order. Counsel Reinaldo Calderon Jimenez is terminated from the case. Plaintiff Emmet Caldwell shall proceed pro se. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/24/2022. (ERC)
February 24, 2022 Filing 78 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Retail Value Inc., MOTION for extension of time to Serve Unserved Defendants filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 3/10/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav)
February 10, 2022 Filing 77 MOTION requesting Order for Copy of Documents filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 2/24/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav)
February 5, 2022 Filing 75 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Reinaldo Calderon-Jimenez on behalf of Emmett Caldwell Responses due by 2/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Calderon-Jimenez, Reinaldo)
February 5, 2022 Filing 74 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION requesting Order filed by Reinaldo Calderon-Jimenez on behalf of Emmett Caldwell Responses due by 2/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Calderon-Jimenez, Reinaldo)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 MOTION to Strike Re: #70 Amended Complaint; and finding as moot #71 MOTION for Recusal MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for extension of time until Extension of time to Serve Summons in this case in light of the Court's Order appointing new counsel. As Plaintiff is represented by counsel, he should file any requests through counsel. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/4/2022. (ERC)
February 3, 2022 Filing 72 MOTION to Strike Re: #70 Amended Complaint, filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 2/17/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #70 ) (Lopez, Jeannette)
February 2, 2022 Filing 71 Emergency MOTION for Recusal, MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for extension of time to Serve Summons in this case, MOTION requesting Order to translate Summons and Complaint for publication of Service as to M. Montanez filed by Emmett Caldwell, pro se. Responses due by 2/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (ecc)
February 2, 2022 Filing 70 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AIG American International Group, Allied Universal Security Services LLC, Home Depot P.R. Inc., Retailer Value Inc., filed by Emmett Caldwell, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ecc) Modified on 2/3/2022 to edit typo (ecc).
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PRO BONO. Counsel Reinaldo Calderon-Jimenez to represent Emmett Caldwell re 68 Order. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Spanish Language)(ecc)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Xaymara Colon-Gonzalez terminated from the case. The Court hereby appoints new pro bono counsel for Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Assigned attorney shall meet with Plaintiff to review the status of the case. Appearing attorney shall also propose new deadlines for filing responses to pending motions and for refiling of any motions filed pro se Plaintiff. Motion in Compliance due by 2/18/2022. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/20/2022. (ERC)
January 19, 2022 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney filed by Xaymara Colon-Gonzalez on behalf of Emmett Caldwell. Responses due by 2/2/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Gonzalez, Xaymara) Modified on 1/20/2022 to edit text (gav).
January 13, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appointment of Counsel Xaymara Colon-Gonzalez to represent Emmett Caldwell re 65 Order. Signed by Clerk on 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notification in the Spanish lanague)(gav)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER noted #60 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding advisory; granting #60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; granting #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; noted #62 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Emmett Caldwell; holding in abeyance #59 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago pending appearance of new counsel; denying without prejudice #64 MOTION for Service and Publication. The Court hereby appoints new pro bono counsel for Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Assigned attorney shall meet with Plaintiff to review the status of the case. Appearing attorney shall also propose new deadlines for filing responses to pending motions and for refiling of any motions filed pro se Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 12/30/2021. (ERC)
December 14, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION for Service and by Publication as to M. Montanez filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 12/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav)
December 10, 2021 Filing 63 ***EX-PARTE*** INFORMATIVE Motion regarding cConfidential Attorney Communication filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 12/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(gav)
November 29, 2021 Filing 62 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 12/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit includes medical information #2 Envelope). (mg)
November 16, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Failure to File Pro se Submissions by Emmett Caldwell, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rim)
November 16, 2021 Filing 60 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** INFORMATIVE Motion regarding advisory, MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION requesting remove attorney Roque filed by Emmett Caldwell, pro se. Responses due by 11/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope #2 Exhibit)(rim) Modified to add restricted attachment on 11/18/2021 (rim).
November 15, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney filed by Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Lago, Roque) Modified on 11/16/2021 to edit text (gav).
October 27, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Lago, Roque)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER holding in abeyance #54 Motion to Quash pending Plaintiff's response. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Quash by 10/27/2021. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/22/2021. (ERC)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera is terminated from the case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/22/2021. (ERC)
October 12, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION to Withdraw & Appear Attorney filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Home Depot P.R. Inc. Responses due by 10/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette) Modified on 10/13/2021 to edit text (gav).
September 27, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 10/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette) Modified on 9/28/2021 to remove italics (gav).
September 27, 2021 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC Re: #46 MOTION for Default Entry as to AIG American International Group filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC. (Lopez, Jeannette)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER noted and denied without prejudice #50 Motion for extension of time. As Plaintiff is represented by counsel, he should file any requests through counsel. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/14/2021. (ERC)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #47 MOTION for Leave to Appear; granting #48 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2021 to File Answer re: #25 Amended Complaint; and granting #49 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 27, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #46 MOTION for Default Entry. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/14/2021. (ERC)
September 13, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION for extension of time to Service of Process filed by Emmett Caldwell, pro se. Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(idg)
September 13, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 27, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #46 MOTION for Default Entry as to AIG American International Group filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Lopez, Jeannette)
September 13, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2021 to File Answer re: #25 Amended Complaint filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Lopez, Jeannette)
September 13, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette)
September 9, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Default Entry as to AIG American International Group filed by Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Lago, Roque)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER noted and denied as unsupported Plaintiff's #44 INFORMATIVE motion. Plaintiff shall provide legal and factual support for the relief requested at Docket No. 44 regarding dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and the entering of a default. Also, before moving for entry of Default Judgment, there must first be an entry of default. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/9/2021. (ERC)
August 4, 2021 Filing 44 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Lago, Roque)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why (i) the claims against co-Defendants AIG American Internal Group, Ramon Adjuster, and M. Montanez shall not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m); and (ii) the Clerk of Court shall not enter default against co-Defendant Allied Universal Security Services LLC for failure file a responsive pleading. Show Cause Response is due by 8/4/2021. Plaintiff's #42 INFORMATIVE motion is NOTED. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/28/2021. (ERC)
July 27, 2021 Filing 42 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago on behalf of Emmett Caldwell Responses due by 8/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Lago, Roque)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution, considering that there has been no activity from Plaintiff since 2/19/2021. Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2021. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/23/2021. (ERC)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER noted #39 MOTION Submitting as Unopposed re: #37 MOTION requesting Order filed by Retailer Value Inc.; and granting #37 Motion to Vacate Summons and Serving of Summons. [O]nce challenged, plaintiffs have the burden of proving proper service, Rivera-Lopez v. Municipality of Dorado, 979 F.2d 885, 887 (1st Cir. 1992). As Co-Defendant Retailer Value Inc.'s motion is unopposed, the Court hereby grants its motion to vacate summons and service of summons. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/11/2021. (ERC)
June 3, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION Submitting as Unopposed re: #37 MOTION requesting Order filed by Retailer Value Inc. filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Retailer Value Inc. Responses due by 6/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #37 ) (Vivas, Jose) Modified on 6/3/2021 to remove italics (gav).
April 21, 2021 Filing 38 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Defendant Home Depot P.R. Inc..(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
April 16, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION Requesting Order to Vacate Summons and Serving of Summons filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Retailer Value Inc. Responses due by 4/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vivas, Jose) Modified on 4/19/2021 to change event (gav).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2021 to File Answe re: #25 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/31/2021. (ERC)
March 16, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2021 to File Answer re: #25 Amended Complaint filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Retailer Value Inc. Responses due by 3/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Vivas, Jose)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 22, 2021 to File Answer and Appearance re: #25 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/15/2021. (ERC)
March 10, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 22, 2021 to File Answer and Appearance re: #25 Amended Complaint filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Home Depot P.R. Inc. Responses due by 3/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) Modified on 3/11/2021 remove italics (gav).
March 5, 2021 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff upon AIG American International Group served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021; Allied Universal Security Services LLC served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021; Home Depot P.R. Inc. served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021; M. Montanez served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021; Retailer Value Inc. served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 usm 285 Allied Universal Security Services LLC, #2 usm 285 Retailer Value Inc., #3 Summons Retailer Value Inc., #4 usm 285 Home Depot P.R. Inc., #5 Summons Home Depot P.R. Inc., #6 Summons AIG American International Group, #7 usm 285 AIG American International Group, #8 Summons M. Montanez, #9 usm 285 M. Montanez) (gav)
February 22, 2021 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to AIG American International Group, Allied Universal Security Services LLC, Home Depot P.R. Inc., M. Montanez, Retailer Value Inc. through the US Marshals with copy of Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285 (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
February 19, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Summons Montaez, #2 Summons Retail Value, #3 Summons AIG, #4 Summons Home Depot, #5 Summons Allied) (Rivera-Lago, Roque)
February 19, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Rivera-Lago, Roque)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U.S. Marshals shall serve process upon defendants accordingly. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/17/2021. (ERC)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER noted #22 Motion In Compliance; and noted #24 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/17/2021. (ERC)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Valerie M. Blay-Soler is terminated from the case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/17/2021. (ERC)
February 16, 2021 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Emmett Caldwell.(Rivera-Lago, Roque)
February 10, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #23 Amended Complaint. ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (gav)
February 9, 2021 Filing 24 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Amended Complaint filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro se. Responses due by 2/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gav)
February 4, 2021 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Emmett Caldwell.(Rivera-Lago, Roque)
February 4, 2021 Filing 22 Motion In Compliance filed by Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Lago, Roque)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why Plaintiff's counsel did not comply with the Court's Order at Docket No. 19. Show Cause Response and Motion in Compliance due by 2/4/2021. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/1/2021. (ERC)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER noted and denied #18 Motion requesting Order. The document filed on 11/24/2020 was deemed to be a defective filing, as such there is no Amended Complaint currently filed to the docket. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/22/2021. (ERC)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Plaintiff's newly appointed counsel, Counsel Roque U. Rivera-Lago, shall (i) inform the Court whether they have met with Plaintiff as Ordered at Docket No. 16; and (ii) propose a new deadline for filing an amended complaint. Motion in Compliance due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/22/2021. (ERC)
December 11, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION requesting Order filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 12/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rim)
December 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPOINMENT OF COUNSEL. Attorney Roque Rivera appointed as Pro Bono counsel to represent petitioner Emmett Caldwell Signed by Clerk on 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice in the Spanish Language)(gmm)Sent via regular mail to petitioner Emmett Caldwell and Atty. Roque Rivera.
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER appointing pro bono counsel for Plaintiff in view of the representations made by their current attorney at Docket No. #13 . The assigned attorney shall meet with Plaintiff to review the legal requirements of the claims filed before this Court, and provide an initial assessment of the viability of these claims and the pro se motions filed by Plaintiff. Upon appearance, the assigned attorney shall propose a deadline for filing an amended complaint, which shall specify the basis for jurisdiction. The #13 Motion to Withdraw Attorney will be held in abeyance pending the appearance of Plaintiff's new attorney. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Plaintiff's #14 MOTION to Restrict Document is granted. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 12/2/2020.(ERC)
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Lacks proper signature. Documents presented to the court in paper require a handwritten signature. L.Civ.R. 11. Signature by Pro Se Litigant (Only) & filed by Pro Se, or if filed by Counsel, electronic signature must be noted, & documents are to be filed by Counsel through CMECF using proper login credentials. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope). (mg)
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Emmett Caldwell Responses due by 12/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie)
November 24, 2020 Filing 13 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Valerie M. Blay-Soler filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Emmett Caldwell Responses due by 12/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PRO BONO. Counsel Valerie M. Blay-Soler appointed to represent Plaintiff: Emmett Caldwell(Pro-se) re D.E. 11 Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2020. Manual Notification sent via regular mail to Plaintiff: Emmett Caldwell & Counsel: Valerie M. Blay-Soler, re: 11 OrderSigned by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice in Spanish)(mg)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. (i) Appointing Pro Bono Counsel. Counsel shall meet with Plaintiff to review the legal requirements of the claims filed before this Court, and provide an initial assessment of the viability of these claims and the pro se motions filed by Plaintiff. Counsel shall file an amended complaint by 11/30/2020, and shall specify the basis for jurisdiction. (ii) Denying without prejudice as premature Plaintiff's: #3 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to AIG American International Group; #5 MOTION requesting Order; #6 MOTION requesting Order; #7 MOTION to Expedite; and #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Federal litigation follows certain procedures, and generally, discovery does not commence until after an answer or responsive pleadings have been filed. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1). Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/21/2020. (ERC)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** NOTICE of filing Letter by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). (mg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 10/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). (mg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Emmett Caldwell Pro Se, re: l Legal Description, Sales Receipt and Transfer of Ownership. (mg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Trial filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION requesting Restraining Order/s filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(mg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION requesting Subpoena to Produce Surveillance videos filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (mg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope). (mg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to AIG American International Group filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit).(mg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AIG American International Group, filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Service due by 12/3/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 ExhibiB A, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet).(mg) Modified on 9/8/2020 to add text as to pro se. (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2020: #5 Summons) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Allied Universal Security Services LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Caldwell
Represented By: Valerie M. Blay-Soler
Represented By: Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago
Represented By: Xaymara Colon-Gonzalez
Represented By: Reinaldo Calderon-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG American International Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Universal Security Services LLC
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Adjuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retailer Value Inc.
Represented By: Jose H. Vivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot P.R. Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Value Inc.
Represented By: Jose H. Vivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?