Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc. et al v. Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: J. Pica y Cia, Inc. D/B/A Capri, Antonio Bayon D/B/A Tienda Junelba, Valija Gitana, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Elba Casiano D/B/A Tienda Junelba, Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc. doing business as Capri, Elba Casiano doing business as Tienda Junelba, Antonio Bayon doing business as Tienda Junelba and Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc.
Defendant: Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Costco Wholesale Corporation and Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01464
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 REPLY to Motion at ECF No. 321 filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Re: #322 MOTION for Leave to File Document Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of Informative Motion filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #284 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #285 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., #287 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2022 12:00 PM AST (11:00 EST) before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be held by video. A zoom meeting invite will be sent to counsel or record prior to the hearing.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022.(jg)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER finding as moot #117 Motion to Compel; finding as moot #117 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (jg)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER finding as moot #105 MOTION to Strike. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (jg)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER finding as moot #95 Motion to Compel Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statements filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (jg)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER noted #316 INFORMATIVE motion regarding Recent Judgment of the Puerto Rico Court of Appeals Supporting Costco's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Laura Elena Diaz-Gonzalez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (jg)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER noted #183 Motion submitting Related document: #183 MOTION Submitting Leave to File Surreply filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Humberto Vidal, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Elba Casiano, Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc.. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/16/2022. (EES)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER noted #166 Motion submitting Related document: #166 Joint MOTION Submitting /Supplementing Exhibits re: #159 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness' Report on Class Certification Re: #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (EES)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER noted #320 INFORMATIVE motion Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (EES)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER noted #317 INFORMATIVE motion Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (EES)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #304 Motion submitting Related document: #304 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc.. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (EES)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting #286 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents; finding as moot #286 Motion for extension of time Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (EES)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #262 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gerardo Jose Cruz terminated Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (EES)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #262 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gerardo Jose Cruz terminated. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (jg)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER finding as moot #240 Motion for extension of time until December 10, 2021 to to oppose Motion for Restated Remand filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (jg)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER re #319 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. The Court appreciates being informed of Supplemental Authority but needs no additional argument. A prompt hearing will be held on the motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022.(EES)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting #318 Motion for Joinder Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (EES)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #322 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/15/2022. (EES)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MOTION for Leave to File Document Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of Informative Motion filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 8/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Reply)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Informative Motion filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Re: #316 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Recent Judgment of the Puerto Rico Court of Appeals Supporting Costco's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1- Excerpt of majority opinion: Dominguez Castro v. E.L.A, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2- R&R: Tropical Chill Corp., et. al. v. Pierluisi Urrutia, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3-Opinion and Order: Tropical Chill Corp., et. al. v. Pierluisi Urrutia)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Supplemental INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Laura Elena Diaz-Gonzalez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Responses due by 8/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Diaz-Gonzalez, Laura)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Oppose to Informative Motion filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation Re: #317 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Plaintiffs' Intent to File an Opposition to Costco's Informative Motion at Docket 316 filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Diaz-Gonzalez, Laura)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MOTION for Joinder Re: #316 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Recent Judgment of the Puerto Rico Court of Appeals Supporting Costco's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 8/19/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #316 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Plaintiffs' Intent to File an Opposition to Costco's Informative Motion at Docket 316 filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Responses due by 8/17/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Recent Judgment of the Puerto Rico Court of Appeals Supporting Costco's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Laura Elena Diaz-Gonzalez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Responses due by 8/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Diaz-Gonzalez, Laura)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER denying #305 Motion to Strike #305 MOTION to Strike Defendants Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. and Costco Wholesale Corporation and move pursuant to Federal Rule 56(c)(2) to strike the inadmissible parts of the accountants statements that Plaintiffs have submitted with their Statement The motion is denied. Data before the Court which does not meet the required evidentiary standard will not be considered. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/14/2022. (EES)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting #310 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/14/2022. (EES)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike at Docket 305 filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Re: #305 MOTION to Strike Defendants Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. and Costco Wholesale Corporation and move pursuant to Federal Rule 56(c)(2) to strike the inadmissible parts of the accountants statements that Plaintiffs have submitted with their Statement filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1- Goas' second unsworn statement as to Kerss entities, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2- Goas' second unsworn statement as to JMJ, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3-Humberto Vidal's deposition transcripts excerpts, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4- Torres' second unsworn statement as to Humberto VIdal, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5-Valija Gitana's audited financial statement, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6- Scola's second unsworn statement as to Valija Gitana)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation Re: #310 MOTION for Leave to File Document Omnibus Surreply Memorandum to Defendants' Reply In Support of their Respective Motions for Summary Judgment filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Diaz-Gonzalez, Laura)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Surreply Memorandum filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Re: #310 MOTION for Leave to File Document Omnibus Surreply Memorandum to Defendants' Reply In Support of their Respective Motions for Summary Judgment filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MOTION for Leave to File Document Omnibus Surreply Memorandum to Defendants' Reply In Support of their Respective Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Responses due by 6/17/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Omnibus Surreply Memorandum to Defendants' Reply In Support of their Respective Motions for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 REPLY to Motion Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation Re: #287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answers to Plaintiffs' Additional Uncontested Facts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Diaz-Gonzalez, Laura)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 REPLY to Motion in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Walmart at Docket 295 filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Re: #285 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to Walmart's Statement of Additional Uncontested Facts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Commonwealth of PR v. Walgreens, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2- Wal-Mart's Response to Plaintiffs Second Requests)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 REPLY to Motion in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Costco at Docket 300 filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Re: #285 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to Costco's Statement of Additional Uncontested Facts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Aguadilla v. Esoo)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 REPLY to Motion Defendant Wal-Mart Puerto Rico Inc.s Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Re: #284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answers to Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Material Facts)(Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MOTION to Strike Defendants Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. and Costco Wholesale Corporation and move pursuant to Federal Rule 56(c)(2) to strike the inadmissible parts of the accountants statements that Plaintiffs have submitted with their Statement of Additional Material Uncontested Facts at ECF No. #298 -2. filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 6/10/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie) Modified on 5/31/2022 to edit docket text as to ECF No. (mg).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Responses due by 6/8/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 20 of ECF No. 298)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting #288 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/19/2022. (EES)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting #299 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents; granting #299 Motion for extension of time Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/19/2022. (EES)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MANDATE of USCCA as to #225 Notice of Appeal, #260 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc.; DISMISSED. RE: #293 USCA JUDGMENT (mcm)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 RESPONSE to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation Re: #285 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposing Statements of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Diaz-Gonzalez, Laura)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and MOTION for extension of time filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Responses due by 5/27/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen). modified on 5/16/2022 to add motion (mg).
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 RESPONSE to Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendants filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Re: #284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., #287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts, #2 Plaintiffs' Additional Material Uncontested Facts, #3 Ex. 1- Kress entities' deposition excerpts, #4 Ex. 2- Humberto Vidal deposition excerpts, #5 Ex. 3- Valija Gitana's deposition excerpts, #6 Ex. 4- J.M.J's Deposition excerpts, #7 Ex. 5- Scola's unsworn statement, #8 Ex. 6- Goas' unsworn statement as to Kress, #9 Ex. 7- Goas' statement as to J.M.J, #10 Ex. 8- Patrick Bergeron's deposition excerpts, #11 Ex. 9- Plaintiffs' letter to Costco, #12 Ex. 10- Plaintiffs' letter to Walmart, #13 Ex. 11- Luis Vidal's Unsworn Statement, #14 Ex. 12- Lisandra Torres' unsworn statement, #15 Ex. 13- Almacenes Kress' Unsworn statement, #16 Ex. 14 -Almacenes Kress de Cayey Answer to Walgreens RPD, #17 Ex. 15- P.R. Dept. of Treasury Administrative Ruling No. DA-20-07, #18 Ex. 16- Kress' PPP loan, #19 Ex. 17- Almacenes Kress' PPP loan, #20 Ex. 18- Costco's deposition excerpts, #21 Ex. 19- Walmart's deposition excerpts, #22 Ex. 20- MAX FITNESS MOROVIS v. Wanda Vazquez-Garced)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting #290 Motion submitting Related document: #290 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #285 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Pue filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc.. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/12/2022. (EES)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE Please mail courtesy Copies #284 , #285 , #287 to Judge Young Chambers 1 Courthouse Way Suite 5710, Boston, MA 02210 (EES)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Re: #285 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Opposing Statement of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit Opp. Exhibit A)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER re #292 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File the Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Extension allowed only for ten days after ruling on summary judgment motions, not twenty-one (21) days as requested. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/2/2022. (jg)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 USCA JUDGMENT as to #225 Notice of Appeal, #260 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc.; Plaintiff-Petitioners seek leave from this court to appeal the district court's denial of class certification in the underlying action (21-8033). Plaintiff-Petitioners also seek leave to appeal the district court's denial of a renewed motion to remand filed after the district court had denied class certification (22-8001). The court has considered all papers on file, and, to the extent leave to file is needed as to any of those papers, leave is granted. Having reviewed the parties' papers and relevant portions of the record, we conclude that the requirements for interlocutory review of the denial of class certification and/or of the denial of remand have not been met here. Accordingly, the petitions for permission to appeal are DENIED. In light of the denial of the two petitions for permission to appeal, Appeal Nos. 21-1954 and 22-1058 are DISMISSED. (mcm)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file the Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Responses due by 5/10/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting #289 Motion for extension of time Motion allowed. No further continuances. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/21/2022. (EES)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #285 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., #286 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Responses due by 4/28/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 43 Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Ex. 46 PR Dept of Treasury)(Related document(s) #285 , #286 ) (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Joint MOTION for extension of time to File Responses and Replies to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Laura Elena Diaz-Gonzalez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Responses due by 4/28/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Gonzalez, Laura)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 4/27/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Laura Elena Diaz-Gonzalez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 4/25/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Statements of Uncontested Material Facts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q)(Diaz-Gonzalez, Laura) Modified to correct docket security as per counsel's request on 4/13/2022 (rim).
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Responses due by 4/25/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Valija Gitana, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp. Responses due by 4/25/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Uncontested Material Facts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7- Baez' deposition, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8- Kress' deposition, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9- J.M.J's deposition, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11- Humberto Vidal's, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15-Costco's deposition, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16- Walmart's deposition, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17- Valija Gitana's deposition, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 31- Bergeron's deposition, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit Exhibit 62)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 4/25/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Uncontested Material Facts, #2 Index to Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting #279 INFORMATIVE motion Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/24/2022. (EES)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER denying #280 Motion for Reconsideration re #280 MOTION for Reconsideration re 276 Order on Motion to Strike, filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/24/2022. (EES)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #279 Motion to Amend/Correct Allowed. No further continuances. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/24/2022. (EES)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MOTION for Reconsideration re 276 Order on Motion to Strike, filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 4/6/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 276 ) (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Scheduling Order Re: 254 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of Deposition Transcripts filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc., Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. and Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC. Responses due by 4/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 254 ) (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen) Modified on 3/22/2022 to add filers. (mg).
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ***FILED IN ERROR as per Counsel's request. Wrong pdf. Document will be re-filed***MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Scheduling Order Re: 254 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of Deposition Transcripts filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Responses due by 4/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 254 ) (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen) Modified on 3/21/2022 (ab).
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #278 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Scheduling Order Re: 254 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectJoint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of Deposition Transcripts. ***FILED IN ERROR as per Counsel's request. Wrong pdf. Document will be re-filed*** (ab)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 PARTIAL JUDGMENT: In light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in ECF No. 274, Judgment is entered dismissing plaintiffs Antonio Bayon and Elba Casiano d/b/a Tienda Junelba from this case. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/15/2022.(mg)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER denying #270 Motion to Strike #270 MOTION to Strike Newly Announced Witnesses Re: #269 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/15/2022. (EES)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Joint NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Antonio Bayon and Elba Casiano d/b/a Tienda Junelba by Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Re: #270 MOTION to Strike Newly Announced Witnesses Re: #269 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER denying #269 Motion to Restrict Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/8/2022. (EES)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #266 INFORMATIVE motion; granting #266 Motion for extension of time Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/24/2022. (EES)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION to Strike Newly Announced Witnesses Re: #269 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/9/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vidal Transcript Pages, #2 Exhibit B - Emails)(Related document(s) #269 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/9/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. and Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen) Modified on 2/15/2022 to add filers (mg).
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by Ubaldo M. Fernandez-Barrera on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Fernandez-Barrera, Ubaldo)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion, MOTION for extension of time filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Responses due by 2/10/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiffs and Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Elena Diaz-Gonzalez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Diaz-Gonzalez, Laura)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by Bayoan Muniz-Calderon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Muniz-Calderon, Bayoan)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz filed by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 2/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 22-1058 for #260 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. (mcm)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #260 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal [Docket Entries 255 & 260] (mcm)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ***SEE IMAGE ON DKT #260 *** NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 255 Order on Motion to Remand by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 505 - receipt no. APRDC-7600681.) (mcm)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ***MODIFIED TO CORRECT EVENT*** NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 255 Order on Motion to Remand by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. Filing fee $505, receipt number APRDC-7600681.NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen) Modified on 1/19/2022 (mcm).
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting #241 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/12/2022. (EES)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting #228 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Min Ji Kim terminated Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/12/2022. (EES)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting #228 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/12/2022. (EES)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER denying #229 Motion to Remand Motion denied as the Court retains supplementary jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/10/2022. (EES)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting #242 Motion to Amend/Correct Allowed save that the time for filing a joint pre-trial memorandum is not extended. It remains April 1, 2022. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/10/2022. (EES)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting #248 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/10/2022. (EES)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting #247 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo terminated Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/10/2022. (EES)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER denying #243 Motion requesting Order Denied without prejudice to its renewal should issues of joint liability warrant such disclosure. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/10/2022. (EES)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #245 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/10/2022. (EES)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 REPLY to Response to Motion ("Joint Opposition to Costco, Wal-Mart, and Walgreens' Request for Disclosure of Confidential Settlement Agreement between Plaintiffs and CVS" (Dkt. 246)) filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Re: #248 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Reply to "Joint Opposition to Costco, Wal-Mart, and Walgreens' Request for Disclosure of Confidential Settlement Agreement between Plaintiffs and CVS" (Dkt. 246)) filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Reply to "Joint Opposition to Costco, Wal-Mart, and Walgreens' Request for Disclosure of Confidential Settlement Agreement between Plaintiffs and CVS" (Dkt. 246)) filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 1/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo filed by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Responses due by 1/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Request for Disclosure of Confidential Settlement Agreement between Plaintiffs and CVS filed by All Plaintiffs and Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC; re: #243 Motion requesting Order for Disclosure of Confidential Settlement Agreement between Plaintiffs and CVS filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen) Modified to add docket relationship and add filer on 12/27/2021 (rim).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply in Support of Remand filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Remand)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for Restated Remand filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Re: #229 MOTION to Remand filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MOTION requesting Order for Disclosure of Confidential Settlement Agreement between Plaintiffs and CVS filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 12/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Scheduling Order Re: 133 Order on Motion Submitting filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 12/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 133 ) (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION to Amend/Correct Transcript of Proceedings held on Thursday, November 4, 2021 Re: #230 Transcript,, filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 12/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #230 ) (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION for extension of time until December 10, 2021 to to oppose Motion for Restated Remand filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 12/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION Signed by Judge William G. Young on 12/1/2021.(EES)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 COPY of Petition filed by All Plaintiffs in the Appellate Court re: 21-1954 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mcm)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 COPY of Motion for Extension of Time filed by All Plaintiffs in the Appellate Court re: 21-1954 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mcm)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Motion denied as moot in view of Walmart's response. re #208 MOTION to Compel CVS and Walmart's Deficient Responses to Written Discovery Served Upon Them filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., #231 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/23/2021.(EES)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 USCA Case Number 21-1954 for #225 Notice of Appeal, filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. (mcm)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #225 Notice of Appeal [Docket Entries 224 & 225] (mcm)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #226 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/23/2021. (EES)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiffs and Co-Defendant Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy LLC by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion as Moot filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Re: #208 MOTION to Compel CVS and Walmart's Deficient Responses to Written Discovery Served Upon Them filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Transcript of Proceedings held on Thursday, November 4, 2021, before Judge William G. Young. Court Reporter/Transcriber Richard Romanow (bulldog@richromanow.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 12/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2022. (jg)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION to Remand filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MOTION to Substitute M. Ashley Miller Attorney David B. Carpenter, MOTION to Withdraw Min Ji Kim Attorney as to David B. Carpenter filed by David B. Carpenter on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 12/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carpenter, David)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #227 MOTION to Withdraw /Atty. Min Ji Kim/ Attorney as to Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** (rim)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** MOTION to Withdraw /Atty. Min Ji Kim/ Attorney as to Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 11/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) Modified on 11/16/2021 (rim).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Motion to allow M ASHLEY MILLER to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7530349) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 11/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix PROPOSED ORDER)(Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 224 Order on Motion to Certify Class,,,, Motion Hearing,,, by Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0104-7527888.NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER denying as moot #208 Motion to Compel Motion denied as moot as to CVS in view of its response. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/9/2021. (EES)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #219 Motion for extension of time Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/9/2021. (EES)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #215 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/9/2021. (EES)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Re: #208 MOTION to Compel CVS and Walmart's Deficient Responses to Written Discovery Served Upon Them filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Carpenter, David)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MOTION for extension of time until 11/12/2021 to produce additional documents and Respond to Motion to Compel at Dkt. 208 filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. for proceedings held on November 4, 2021 before Judge William G. Young.. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2021 by video re #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. The Court hears arguments of counsel and enters an order denying #153 Motion to Certify Class for the reasons stated on the record. The case is to proceed on the current case management schedule and is not stayed. Plaintiff makes oral motion for reconsideration, oral motion is denied. (Court Reporter Richard Romanow (bulldog@richromanow.com).)Hearing set for 10:00.Hearing held at 10:00.Hearing ended at 10:35. (jg)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Memorandum in Response to the Supplemental Exhibits Submitted by Plaintiffs at Docket 216 filed by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Costco's communications, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Costco's communications, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Costco's communications, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Costco's communications, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5- ACDET's communications)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Supplemental Exhibits Submitted by Plaintiffs in Support of their Petition for Class Certification filed by All Defendants filed by All Defendants. (Carpenter, David)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #213 Memorandum in Opposition. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed Opposition before the filing of the Memorandum. Document to be re-filed.*** (mcm)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ***FILED IN ERROR - Document to be re-filed.*** MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Memorandum in Response to the Supplemental Exhibits Submitted by Plaintiffs at Docket 211 filed by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Costco's communications, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Costco's communications, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Costco's communications, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Costco's communications, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5- ACDET's communications)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen) Modified on 11/3/2021 (mcm).
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #211 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/2/2021. (EES)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MOTION for Leave to File Document Memorandum in Response to Supplemental Exhibits Submitted by Plaintiffs in Support of their Petition for Class Certification filed by David B. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Response to Supplemental Exhibits Submitted by Plaintiffs in Support of their Petition for Class Certification)(Carpenter, David)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER resetting hearing as to #153 MOTION to Certify Class : Motion Hearing reset for 11/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge William G. Young.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/25/2021.(jg)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #153 MOTION to Certify Class : Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be held by video. Zoom meeting invite to be sent to counsel of record by email prior to the hearing.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/25/2021.(jg)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MOTION to Compel CVS and Walmart's Deficient Responses to Written Discovery Served Upon Them filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Walmart and CVS' responses, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' objections, #3 Exhibit Communications with Walmart, #4 Exhibit Walmart's letter, #5 Exhibit Further communications with Walmart, #6 Exhibit Meet and confer between Walmart and Plaintiffs, #7 Exhibit Walmart's POD, #8 Exhibit Communications with CVS, #9 Exhibit Communicaiton scheduling meet and confer, #10 Exhibit Meet and confer with CVS, #11 Exhibit Further communications with CVS)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #200 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/21/2021. (EES)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 REPLY to Response to Motion in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification at Docket 157 filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Potential class members' list, #2 Exhibit Walgreens' POD)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #198 Supplemental Motion Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/21/2021. (EES)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER finding as moot #185 Motion for extension of time until October 1st, 2021 to respond to discovery requests filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/21/2021. (jg)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #170 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/21/2021. (jg)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER finding as moot #132 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/21/2021. (jg)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER noted #132 Motion submitting Walgreens' Answer to Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/21/2021. (jg)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION Submitting Additional Document re: #198 Supplemental Motion for Class Certification Based on Recently Acquired Evidence filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to the Economic Task Force)(Related document(s) #198 ) (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #192 ALLOWED re Motion for Leave to File DENIED re Motion for Extension of Time to Product Expert Report Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/15/2021. (EES)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Supplemental Motion for Class Certification Based on Recently Acquired Evidence filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to former Governor, #2 Exhibit Walgreens' POD, #3 Exhibit Letter to the Department of Economic Development and Commerce, #4 Exhibit Walmarts' response to Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents, #5 Exhibit Walmarts' response to Humberto Vidal's Interrogatories)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER finding as moot #90 Motion to Stay Memorandum of Decision entered on 7/9/2021. See docket entry #161 . Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/30/2021. (jg)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER denying #184 Motion for extension of time Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/30/2021. (EES)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #182 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/30/2021. (EES)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 PARTIAL JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against plaintiff J. Pica y Cia, Inc. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/28/2021.(jg)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by J. Pica y Cia, Inc. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Extension of Time to Produce Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants Re: #184 MOTION for extension of time until October 29, 2021 to Produce Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2)(B) Disclosures filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Carpenter, David)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #180 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/13/2021. (EES)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #179 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/13/2021. (EES)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Based on Newly Discovered Evidence re #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by All Plaintiffs; filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Carpenter, David) Modified to add docket relationship on 9/13/2021 (rim).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying #172 Motion to Strike Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/8/2021. (EES)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #176 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/8/2021. (EES)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION for extension of time until October 1st, 2021 to respond to discovery requests filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION for extension of time until October 29, 2021 to Produce Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2)(B) Disclosures filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION Submitting Leave to File Surreply filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Surreply in Support of Opposition to Supplemental Brief)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply in Support of Motion to File Supplemental Brief filed by David B. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Brief)(Carpenter, David)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: #176 MOTION for Leave to File Document Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Based on Newly Discovered Evidence filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by David B. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translations)(Related document(s) #176 ) (Carpenter, David)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION Submitting Tienda Junelba's Unsworn Statement re: #178 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tienda Junelba's Unsworn Statement)(Related document(s) #178 ) (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION Submitting Motion for Leave to File Reply re: #177 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/31/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Expert Report)(Related document(s) #177 ) (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #176 MOTION for Leave to File Document Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Based on Newly Discovered Evidence filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Potential class members' list, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' unsworn statements, #3 Exhibit Subpoena)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #172 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Untimely Expert's Declaration filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carpenter, David)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for Leave to File Document Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Based on Newly Discovered Evidence filed by David B. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Carpenter, David)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER denying #159 Motion to Strike Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/30/2021. (EES)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #165 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/30/2021. (EES)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying #164 Motion for Leave to File; denying #164 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/30/2021. (EES)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Untimely Expert's Declaration filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Report filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #159 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness' Report on Class Certification Re: #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Pu filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lara's Rebuttal opinions)(Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION Submitting Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification re: #164 MOTION for Leave to File Document MOTION for Extension of Time until July 30, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #157 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CV filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., #157 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Potential Class Members' List, #3 Exhibit Walgreens' POD)(Related document(s) #164 , #153 , #157 ) (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Joint MOTION Submitting Certified English Translation (Exhibit A) re: #157 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #157 ) (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: #166 Joint MOTION Submitting /Supplementing Exhibits re: #159 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness' Report on Class Certification Re: #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC, #159 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness' Report on Class Certification Re: #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Pu filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translations)(Related document(s) #166 , #159 ) (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Leave and Extension of Time filed by All Defendants Re: #164 MOTION for Leave to File Document MOTION for Extension of Time until July 30, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #157 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CV filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Carpenter, David)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Joint MOTION Submitting /Supplementing Exhibits re: #159 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness' Report on Class Certification Re: #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Pu filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DACO Order 2020-005, #2 Exhibit DACO Order 2020-006)(Related document(s) #159 ) (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation- Extracted pages- Sales and Use Tax Monthly Return and Tax on Imports Monthly Return, #2 Exhibit Certification of Accuracy, #3 Exhibit Certification, #4 Exhibit Diploma)(Related document(s) #153 ) (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Leave to File Document , MOTION for Extension of Time until July 30, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #157 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC, #159 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness' Report on Class Certification Re: #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Pu filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #157 , #159 ) (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying #152 Motion to Compel "Motion denied without prejudice as premature." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/14/2021. (EES)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Alvarado-Gonzalez, Gretchen)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION"For the foregoing reasons, this Court DENIED the Local Merchants' motion to remand, ECF No. #107 , and DENIED in part and ALLOWED in part the Megastores' motion to dismiss, ECF No. #45 , denying it as to count I and allowing it as to counts II and III." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/9/2021.(EES)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #152 MOTION to Compel filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Estrella, Alberto)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Joint MOTION to Strike or Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness' Report on Class Certification Re: #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Expert's Report)(Related document(s) #153 ) (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by David B. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carpenter, David)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Certify Class filed by All Defendants Re: #153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carpenter, David)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #155 INFORMATIVE motion Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/1/2021. (EES)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Intent to Oppose Dockets No. 152 and 153 filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1- List and Definitions of retail items, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2- Regulation VII, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3- Expert report, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4- CUD Certification, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5- Active Members CUD as of 12-31-2020, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6- OE-2020-041, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7- Subpoenas, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8- Departament of Treasury, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9- Adminsitrative Decision 20-07, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10- Adminsitrative Decision 20-12, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11- Clippings and press release CUD, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12- Unsworn statement Arguelles, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13- List Class Actions SCVR, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14- Proposed Order for Class Certification.)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION to Compel filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. Responses due by 7/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Written Discovery, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Responses, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Objections, #4 Exhibit Communications, #5 Exhibit Communications)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER "Nothing may be filed under seal pursuant to this order and it may not be cited as a ground for sealing. So ordered as modified." re #149 Joint MOTION Submitting Proposed Confidentiality Order filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Humberto Vidal, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc., Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc.. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/21/2021.(EES)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER noted #115 INFORMATIVE motion regarding Final Remarks on Available Actions Under the Civil Code of Puerto Rico filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. . Signed by Judge William G. Young (jg)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Joint MOTION Submitting Proposed Confidentiality Order filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) Modified to add filers on 6/22/2021 (rim).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #144 Motion for Joinder Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/21/2021. (EES)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER withdrawing #138 Motion for Contempt; withdrawing #138 Motion to Compel Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/21/2021. (EES)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #142 Motion to Withdraw Document Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/21/2021. (EES)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Alejandro Garcia-Carballo on behalf of Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Garcia-Carballo, Alejandro)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION for Joinder filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. Responses due by 6/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Walgreens' ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Class Action Complaint) filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Defendant Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc..(Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION to Withdraw Document re: #138 Motion for Contempt MOTION to Compel filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #138 ) (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #139 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/11/2021. (EES)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #139 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/11/2021. (EES)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21st, 2021 to file Certified Translation of Spanish Language Document filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Motion for Contempt , MOTION to Compel filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ANSWER to Complaint re. Amended Complaint filed by David B. Carpenter on behalf of Defendant Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(Carpenter, David)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Strike "Motion allowed. The second amended complaint was filed without leave of court and asserts causes of action that the Court has already dismissed." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/4/2021. (EES)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying #131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply "Motion denied as moot, the Court having ruled on the motion to strike." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/4/2021. (EES)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying #127 Motion for Entry of Default Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/2/2021. (EES)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #122 Motion submitting "The plaintiffs version is allowed and adopted as the case management scheduling order." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/2/2021. (EES)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION Submitting Walgreens' Answer to Amended Class Action Complaint, MOTION Requesting Order filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 6/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Amended Class Action Complaint)(Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda). Modified docket text, Added Motion on 6/3/2021 (rim).
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 8, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #120 Joint MOTION to Strike , or in the alternative, Motion for Partial Dismissal Re: #119 Amended Complaint, filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valij filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #120 ) (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ANSWER to #119 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc..(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Sever. "Motion DENIED without prejudice." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/1/2021. (EES)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Re: #127 MOTION for Default Entry as to All Defendants filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Carpenter, David)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION for Default Entry as to All Defendants filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #122 Emergency MOTION Submitting Proposed Case Management Order filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #124 Case Management Memorandum filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT MEMORANDUM by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email 2/10/2021, #2 Exhibit Proposed CMO with Pltfs' Revisions, #3 Exhibit Proposed CMO Dfts' Version) (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Emergency MOTION Submitting Proposed Case Management Order filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Order)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Amended Class Action Complaint) by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Joint MOTION to Strike , or in the alternative, Motion for Partial Dismissal Re: #119 Amended Complaint, filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc. filed by David B. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 6/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #119 ) (Carpenter, David)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Valija Gitana, Inc., Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., Antonio Bayon, J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc..(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #117 MOTION to Compel Filing of Answers to Amended Complaint MOTION requesting Order to Shorten Term to File Answers to Amended Complaint filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION to Compel Filing of Answers to Amended Complaint, MOTION requesting Order to Shorten Term to File Answers to Amended Complaint filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #45 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/3/2021. (EES)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Final Remarks on Available Actions Under the Civil Code of Puerto Rico filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 BRIEF - Defendants Post-Argument Brief in Support of Dismissal of First Cause of Action of the Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cemex v. Terrassa translated case) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc. for proceedings held on April 22, 2021 before Judge William G. Young.. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 BRIEF Post Hearing Brief on the Availability of an Action Pursuant to Article 1802 of the Puerto Rico Civil Code by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation Opinion SCPR, #2 Exhibit Certified Translation Opinion Court of Appeals) (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #45 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint as to All Plaintiffs, #107 MOTION to Remand Renewed : Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2021 at 12:00 PM by video before Judge William G. Young. Zoom meeting invite to be sent to counsel of record by email.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/8/2021.(jg)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #90 MOTION to Stay All Discovery Pending Resolution of the Motion to Dismiss and to Remand filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by All Defendants. (Carpenter, David) Modified italic letters on 3/25/2021 (rim).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying #103 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/23/2021. (EES)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/23/2021. (EES)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Remand Renewed filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Leave to File to Submit Renewed Motion to Remand within Page Limit. Counsel shall file their Renewed Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/18/2021. (jg)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion, MOTION to Strike tendered Reply Re: #102 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC; filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) Modified to change docket text title and add motion on 3/16/2021 (rim).
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Restrict Signed by Judge William G. Young on 3/12/2021. (EES)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Order Finding "Moot" Walgreens' Supplemental Motion to Dismiss re 77 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents, Order on Supplemental Motion, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 3/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 77 ) (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply filed by David B. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Stay)(Carpenter, David)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #101 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply. ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (rim)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/)*** MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply filed by David B. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Stay)(Carpenter, David) Modified on 3/11/2021 (rim).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement byCostco Wholesale Corporation. (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement byWalgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement byWal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPuerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Carpenter, David)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Stay All Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #90 MOTION to Stay All Discovery Pending Resolution of the Motion to Dismiss and to Remand filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statements filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to File Document Motion to Remand Within Page Limit re: 82 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., #22 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Remand filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc. filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Remand)(Related document(s) 82 , #20 , #22 ) (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) Modified docket event and text on 3/3/2021 (rim).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Exhibit D) re: #90 Motion to Stay (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda) Modified on 2/26/2021 to edit docket text and add docket relationship (mcm).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Restrict Document Attachment of Exhibit D of Motion to Stay filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #91 MOTION to Restrict Document Attachment of Exhibit D of Motion to Stay. ***FILED IN ERROR - Document will be re-filed.*** (mcm)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ***FILED IN ERROR - Document will be re-filed.*** MOTION to Restrict Document Attachment of Exhibit D of Motion to Stay filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A of Exhibit D of Motion to Stay)(Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda) Modified on 2/26/2021 (mcm).
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Stay All Discovery Pending Resolution of the Motion to Dismiss and to Remand filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' RPDs to Walgreen, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' RFAs to Walgreen, #3 Exhibit ROGs to Walgreen, #4 Exhibit Kress Second ROGs to Walgreen, #5 Exhibit Certified English Translation...)(Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER noted #39 Motion to clarify and submitting certified English translation. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER noted #71 INFORMATIVE motion regarding Conversion of Name filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of J. Pica y Cia, Inc. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER noted and moot #58 INFORMATIVE Motion Regarding Joint Discovery Schedule. Case Management Order entered on 2/11/2021. See docket entry #75 . Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER noted #57 Motion submitting Certified English Translation Walgreens' Motion Submitting Certified English Translation re: 48 MOTION for extension of time filed by Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., 47 Supplemental Motion filed by Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER noted #56 Motion submitting Certified English Translations re: 46 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Extension of Time to Submit Certified English Translations Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of All Defendants. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER noted #43 Motion submitting Reply Within Page Limit re: 42 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 35 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs, 37 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess of Page Limit filed by All Plaintiffs; filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #25 Motion submitting Certified Translations re: 21 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Extension of Time to Submit Certified Translations filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc. filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying #22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Remand filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Extension of Time to Submit Certified Translations filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint or otherwise Plead by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time until October 8, 2020 to file certified translations filed by Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/221. (jg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/19/2021. (jg)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents; finding as moot #47 Supplemental Motion; granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/12/2021. (EES)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER finding as moot #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; finding as moot #48 Motion for extension of time; finding as moot #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File; finding as moot #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/12/2021. (EES)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: So ordered as the case management scheduling order. re #65 Discovery due by 9/30/2021. Motions due by 10/1/2021.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/11/2021.(EES)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to File; granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 2/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.) Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/3/2021. (EES)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to re #45 Motion Dismiss, filed by All Plaintiffs; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) Modified to add docket relationship on 2/3/2021 (rim).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement byJ. Pica y Cia, Inc.. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Conversion of Name filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of J. Pica y Cia, Inc. Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Conversion)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement byValija Gitana, Inc.. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement byKress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement byJ.M.J. Appliances Corp.. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement byHumberto Vidal, Inc.. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Document Surreply, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 3rd, 2021 to File Response/Reply Surreply filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by All Parties. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) Modified to add filers on 1/22/2021 (rim).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #45 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint as to All Plaintiffs filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by All Defendants. (Carpenter, David)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Antonio Bayon, Elba Casiano, Humberto Vidal, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Valija Gitana, Inc.. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/8/2021. (EES)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document - Reply to Opposition (Docket No. 59) to Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 45) - filed by Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Antonetti-Stutts, Salvador) Modified on 1/7/2021 remove italics (gav).
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #47 Supplemental Motion filed by Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #45 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint as to All Plaintiffs filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Joint Discovery Schedule filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 1/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translation Walgreens' Motion Submitting Certified English Translation re: #48 MOTION for extension of time filed by Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., #47 Supplemental Motion filed by Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 1/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translation ELA v. Walgreen PR DECISION)(Related document(s) #48 , #47 ) (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda) Modified on 12/28/2020 remove italics (gav).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: #46 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Extension of Time to Submit Certified English Translations Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC filed by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #46 ) (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula) Modified on 12/21/2020 remove italics (gav).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Re: #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc. filed by Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula) Modified on 12/21/2020 remove italics (gav).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #8 Motion for extension of time Signed by Judge William G. Young on 12/14/2020. (EES)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 31, 2020 to file Oppositions to Motion to Dismiss and Motion Supplementing filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Arlyn Gonzalez-Diaz on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Gonzalez-Diaz, Arlyn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 12/7/2020. (EES)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to File; granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 12/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.) Signed by Judge William G. Young on 12/7/2020. (EES)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying #32 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge William G. Young on 12/7/2020. (EES)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for extension of time filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 12/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Supplemental Motion filed by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 12/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Extension of Time to Submit Certified English Translations filed by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 12/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint as to All Plaintiffs filed by Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 12/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (OE-2020-20), #2 Exhibit B (OE-2020-23), #3 Exhibit C (OE-2020-29), #4 Exhibit D (OE-2020-33), #5 Exhibit E (OE-2020-38), #6 Exhibit F (OE-2020-57), #7 Exhibit G (State-court judgment), #8 Exhibit H (Amended state-court judgment))(Antonetti-Stutts, Salvador)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until December 3, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: 40 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 12/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 40 ) (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION Submitting Reply Within Page Limit re: 42 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #35 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs, #37 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess of Page Limit filed by All Plaintiffs; filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Reply within Page Limit)(Related document(s) 42 , #35 , #37 ) (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) Modified docket text on 11/23/2020 (rim).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying #37 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/20/2020. (EES)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re #38 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc., Antonio Bayon, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Humberto Vidal, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc.. "The parties proposal is rejected final pre-trial memorandum due December 1, 2021, summary judgment motions due October 1, 2021, discovery due September 30, 2021."Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/20/2020.(EES)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #29 Motion to Stay Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/20/2020. (EES)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Clarification and Submitting Certified English Translation filed by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Responses due by 11/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula) Modified docket text title on 11/16/2020 (rim).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Joint Proposed Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by All Parties re: #27 Order (Carpenter, David) Modified docket text title, add filers and add docket reference on 11/9/2020 (rim).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess of Page Limit filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #3 MOTION to Sever filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply Memorandum and Sur-reply, MOTION for Extension of Time until November 6, 2020 to File Response/Reply filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY to Response in Opposition to Motion Re: #3 MOTION to Sever filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc.; filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula) Modified docket text title on 10/26/2020 (rim).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 11/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Re: #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc. filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Gonzalez-Montalvo, Paula)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/27/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Antonetti-Stutts, Salvador)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to Motion to Sever, and Extension of Time, filed by Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 10/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Antonetti-Stutts, Salvador)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/9/2020.(EES)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #15 Motion submitting ; granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear ( Answer deadline due by 10/16/2020.); granting #18 INFORMATIVE motion Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/9/2020. (EES)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #21 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Extension of Time to Submit Certified Translations filed by Antonio Bayon, J.M.J. Appliances Corp., Humberto Vidal, Inc., Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc., Elba Casiano, Valija Gitana, Inc., J. Pica y Cia, Inc. filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis N. Saldana-Roman on behalf of All Parties. (Saldana-Roman, Luis) Modified to edit docket text filer on 10/5/2020 (rim).
October 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance and Joinder as Counsel by Angel E. Rotger-Sabat on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rotger-Sabat, Angel)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Remand filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Extension of Time to Submit Certified Translations filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #3 MOTION to Sever filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Wal-Mart's Request for Extension of Time to Plead in Re: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear and for Extension of Time filed by: Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.; filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 10/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto) Modified to add docket relationship on 10/1/2020 (rim).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. (Estrella, Alberto)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear and for Extension of Time to Answer until October 15, 2020 filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) Modified on 9/15/2020 change italics (gav).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION Submitting certified translations re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents MOTION for Extension of Time until October 8, 2020 to file certified translations filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation filed by Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Responses due by 9/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (certified translations))(Related document(s) #1 , #2 ) (Antonetti-Stutts, Salvador)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #11 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #12 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #13 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/14/2020. (EES)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion to allow MIKE H. SHANLEVER to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7015404) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to allow MIN JI KIM to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7015374) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to allow ANDREW M. BROWN to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7015363) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to allow David B. Carpenter to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7015345) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint or otherwise Plead by Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez on behalf of Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Sanchez, Yolanda) Modified to change event type and edit docket text title adding event on 9/14/2020 (rim).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time until October 15, 2020 filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 9/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 15, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Responses due by 9/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Antonetti-Stutts, Salvador)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Sever filed by Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Responses due by 9/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Antonetti-Stutts, Salvador)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until October 8, 2020 to file certified translations filed by Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Responses due by 9/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Antonetti-Stutts, Salvador)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance, San Juan Superior Court, case number SJ2020CV04100. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-7011243), filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Class Action Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Summons served), #3 Exhibit C (Amended Class Action Complaint), #4 Exhibit Certified translations, #5 Exhibit Spanish language documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Antonetti-Stutts, Salvador)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc. et al v. Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Pica y Cia, Inc. D/B/A Capri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Bayon D/B/A Tienda Junelba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valija Gitana, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando Sabater-Clavell
Represented By: Luis N. Saldana-Roman
Represented By: Angel E. Rotger-Sabat
Represented By: Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez
Represented By: Bayoan Muniz-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humberto Vidal, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando Sabater-Clavell
Represented By: Luis N. Saldana-Roman
Represented By: Angel E. Rotger-Sabat
Represented By: Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez
Represented By: Bayoan Muniz-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.J. Appliances Corp.
Represented By: Fernando Sabater-Clavell
Represented By: Luis N. Saldana-Roman
Represented By: Angel E. Rotger-Sabat
Represented By: Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez
Represented By: Bayoan Muniz-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elba Casiano D/B/A Tienda Junelba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kress Stores of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando Sabater-Clavell
Represented By: Luis N. Saldana-Roman
Represented By: Angel E. Rotger-Sabat
Represented By: Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez
Represented By: Bayoan Muniz-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Pica y Cia, Inc. doing business as Capri
Represented By: Fernando Sabater-Clavell
Represented By: Luis N. Saldana-Roman
Represented By: Angel E. Rotger-Sabat
Represented By: Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez
Represented By: Bayoan Muniz-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elba Casiano doing business as Tienda Junelba
Represented By: Fernando Sabater-Clavell
Represented By: Luis N. Saldana-Roman
Represented By: Angel E. Rotger-Sabat
Represented By: Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez
Represented By: Bayoan Muniz-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Bayon doing business as Tienda Junelba
Represented By: Fernando Sabater-Clavell
Represented By: Luis N. Saldana-Roman
Represented By: Angel E. Rotger-Sabat
Represented By: Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez
Represented By: Bayoan Muniz-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almacenes Kress de Cayey, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando Sabater-Clavell
Represented By: Gretchen L. Alvarado-Gonzalez
Represented By: Bayoan Muniz-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez
Represented By: David B. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Min Ji Kim
Represented By: David B. Carpenter
Represented By: Michael H. Shanlever
Represented By: Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina
Represented By: Andrew M. Brown
Represented By: Arlyn Gonzalez-Diaz
Represented By: Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez
Represented By: M. Ashley Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts
Represented By: Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre
Represented By: Paula A. Gonzalez-Montalvo
Represented By: David B. Carpenter
Represented By: Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez
Represented By: Alejandro Garcia-Carballo
Represented By: Laura Elena Diaz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez-Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Represented By: David B. Carpenter
Represented By: Yolanda Benitez-Sanchez
Represented By: Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso
Represented By: Gerardo Jose Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?