Canales-Cancel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jose L. Canales-Cancel
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv01469
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Referring Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (Docket No. 20), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment, as per 28 USC sec 636(c). All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 20-1469 (BJM). Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 11/06/2020. (ft)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Given plaintiff's consent (Docket No. #19 ), the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/6/2020.(mrr)
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 Motion In Compliance as to 18 Order,,,,, filed by Valery Alicea-Caceres on behalf of Jose L. Canales-Cancel Responses due by 11/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Alicea-Caceres, Valery)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court reminds the parties that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. 28 U.S.C.A. 636(c). The Social Security Administration has consented to have all social security cases brought before a Magistrate Judge. This procedure could prove to be more expeditious, and therefore, less expensive, than a trial before a District Judge. The Plaintiff is, of course, also free "to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences." Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2). The Plaintiff is advised, however, that the increase in the Court's criminal docket may impede a reasonably timely disposition of this case. Hence, The Court hereby orders the Plaintiff to affirmatively state whether or not he consents to having the instant matter be entertained before a U.S. Magistrate Judge through the entry of judgment and his rationale underlying his decision on or before 11/5/2020. Failure to respond to this Order will be treated as an implied consent by the Plaintiff. The Court notes that the Magistrate Judges in the District of Puerto Rico are first-rate jurists with impeccable legal minds, integrity and judicial temperament. The Plaintiff should thus carefully consider the merits of consenting to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/22/2020. (mrr)
October 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Valery Alicea-Caceres on behalf of Jose L. Canales-Cancel (Alicea-Caceres, Valery)
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appointment of Counsel re 13 Order. Attorney Valery Alicea-Caceres appointed for Jose L. Canales-Cancel. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2020. (mcm)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM upon United States Attorney's Office served on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (mcm) Modified on 10/16/2020 to edit docket text (mcm). Modified on 10/19/2020 to correct deadline (mcm).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER noted and moot #12 INFORMATIVE motion. The previously appointed pro-bono counsel has withdrawn from the case and the Clerk of the Court will appoint a new pro-bono counsel. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/14/2020. (Arias-Marxuach, Raul)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Linetsi D. Cardona-Muniz terminated. The Clerk of the Court shall appoint new pro-bono counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/14/2020. (mrr)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 INFORMATIVE Motion/Letter regarding Appointment of Counsel filed by Jose L. Canales-Cancel, pro se. Responses due by 10/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mcm)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 "Urgent Motion for Relief from Appointment" filed by Linetsi D. Cardona-Munizas to Jose L. Canales-Cancel. Responses due by 10/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gr)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Jose L. Canales-Cancel, Pro se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Envelope) (gav)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appointment of Counsel re 6 Order. Attorney Linetsi D. Cardona-Muniz appointed for Jose L. Canales-Cancel. Signed by Clerk on 9/16/2020. (mcm)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security through the US Marshals with copy of Order, Copy of Complaint and USM 285 (ad)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Plaintiff did not submit Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet. Notice sent to Plaintiff with Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet forms. (mcm)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-L, the Clerk of the Court shall name pro-bono counsel to represent plaintiff at no cost to him. The U.S. Marshals shall serve process upon defendant accordingly. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 9/15/2020. (mrr)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Jose L. Canales-Cancel, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mcm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Requesting Appointment of Counsel filed by Jose L. Canales-Cancel, pro se. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mcm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jose L. Canales-Cancel, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (mcm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Jose L. Canales-Cancel, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mcm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jose L. Canales-Cancel, pro se. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canales-Cancel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Canales-Cancel
Represented By: Linetsi D. Cardona-Muniz
Represented By: Valery Alicea-Caceres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?