E.P. v. Luis Santiago Productions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paged E.P.
Defendant: Luis Santiago Productions, Inc., Emmanuel J Cruz-Camunas and Arte Fusion, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01549
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Evelyn Aimee De Jesus-Rodriguez is hereby terminated. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to retain legal counsel on or before December 2, 2020. The Clerk of the Court is to notify the Motion at Docket No. #4 and the instant Order directly to Plaintiff through the mail and email addressed provided by Atty. De Jesus-Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/17/2020. (DMA)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Evelyn Aimee De Jesus-Rodriguez filed by Evelyn Aimee De Jesus-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/1/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (De Jesus-Rodriguez, Evelyn)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
October 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Change of Address Form, #4 Errata Page 10 Complaint) (De Jesus-Rodriguez, Evelyn)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7054617.), filed by Paged E.P.. Service due by 1/14/2021,(De Jesus-Rodriguez, Evelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.P. v. Luis Santiago Productions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Santiago Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel J Cruz-Camunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arte Fusion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paged E.P.
Represented By: Evelyn Aimee De Jesus-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?