DTV Investment Corp. v. DDR Norte, LLC , LLC et al
Plaintiff: DTV INVESTMENT CORP.
Defendant: SITE CENTERS, CORP., DDR NORTE, LLC and RVI Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01557
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 24 JUDGMENT dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/25/2020. (brc)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal: GRANTED. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/25/2020. (brc)
November 24, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DTV Investment Corp. (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #20 Motion Submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/23/2020. (brc)
November 23, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: 15 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #13 MOTION to Remand filed by DTV Investment Corp. filed by Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez on behalf of DTV Investment Corp. Responses due by 12/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 15 , #13 ) (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Notice of Settlement. The settlement "in principle" is NOTED. The request to continue future deadlines is DENIED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/20/2020. (brc)
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Continue by DTV Investment Corp. (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED as to all three requests. Answer to complaint due November 30, 2020. Response to motion due November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/10/2020. (brc)
November 10, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/2020 to File Answer to the complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/2020 to File Response/Reply to motion for jury trial, motion to remand, to submit translations filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of DDR Norte, LLC, Site Centers, Corp. Responses due by 11/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Motion for extension of time: GRANTED, but the time to file certified English translations is extended only until November 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/09/2020. (brc)
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for extension of time until December 7, 2020 to filed certified English translations filed by Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand filed by Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DTV Investment Corp.. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Juan C. Nieves-Gonzalez on behalf of DTV Investment Corp. (Nieves-Gonzalez, Juan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez on behalf of DTV Investment Corp. (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Lead Counsel by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of DTV Investment Corp. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline is extended until November 20, 2020. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/21/2020. (brc)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents: GRANTED. Certified English translations shall be filed no later than November 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/21/2020. (brc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa.(Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number PRX100073573) (arg)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the complaint filed by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by SITE CENTERS, CORP., DDR NORTE, LLC (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia on behalf of All Defendants (Gonzalez-Garcia, Yasthel)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of DDR NORTE, LLC, SITE CENTERS, CORP. Responses due by 11/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tribunal de Primera Instancia - Sala Superior de Hatillo, case number HA2020CV00191. (), filed by SITE CENTERS, CORP., DDR NORTE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exbibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exbibit 2 - Summons, #4 Exhibit Exbibit 3 - Informative Motion, #5 Exhibit Exbibit 4 - Order)(Estrella, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DTV Investment Corp. v. DDR Norte, LLC , LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DTV INVESTMENT CORP.
Represented By: Ericka Celeste Montull-Novoa
Represented By: Juan C. Nieves-Gonzalez
Represented By: Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SITE CENTERS, CORP.
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR NORTE, LLC
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Yasthel Gonzalez-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RVI Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?