Puma Energy Caribe, LLC v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Puma Energy Caribe, LLC
Defendant: Hon. Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Secretary Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez, Asst Attorney Genera Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Hon Ines Carrau-Martinez, Domingo Emanuelli, Edan Rivera Rodrguez, Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia, TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. and Pedro Pierluisi-Urrutia
Consolidated Plaintiff: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.
Consolidated Defendant: Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez
Intervenor Defendant: Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01591
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle on behalf of Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc. (Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #126 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Scheduling Order is hereby amended as follows. All deadlines as to discovery are hereby incorporated by reference. Discovery due by 2/21/2023. Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2023. Responses in Opposition due by 1/16/2024. Replies and Surreplies are authorized and must conform with PRD Local Rule 7. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/29/2024. A Pretrial/Settlement Conference is hereby SET for 3/15/2024 at 02:00 PM in Judge Dominguez's Chambers at the OLD SAN JUAN COURTHOUSE before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. Party representatives with decision-making authority are to be available to aid in the negotiations. Evidentiary Hearing is hereby SET to begin on 3/25/2024 ending on 3/29/2024 in OSJ Courtroom 4 - 3rd Floor before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. ALL DEADLINES ARE FINAL. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/12/2022. (EA)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Re: #87 Scheduling Order/Case Management Order, Set Hearings filed by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 10/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #87 ) (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #113 Motion to Compel. Third Party, Senator Eric Correa Rivera is hereby ordered to produce the documents requested in Plainitff's subpoena by 10/27/2022. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/27/2022. (MSO)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 REPLY to Motion In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #114 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, #122 MOTION for Leave to File Document A Reply In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Lozano, Armando)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff shall file Reply in a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/14/2022. (MSO)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to File Document A Reply In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order filed by Armando Lozano on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 9/27/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order)(Lozano, Armando)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order filed by Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc. Re: #114 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc.. (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Edan Rivera Rodrguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli, Pedro Pierluisi-Urrutia, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez Re: #114 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Edan Rivera Rodrguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli, Pedro Pierluisi-Urrutia, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez. (Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel A. Rodriguez-Rivera on behalf of Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc. (Rodriguez-Rivera, Miguel)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and granting #116 MOTION for Extension of Time. Responses due by 9/7/2022. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/29/2022. (MSO)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until September 7, 2022 as to #114 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Hector Benitez-Arraiza on behalf of Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc. Responses due by 9/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 7, 2022 to File Response/Reply filed by Pablo Tufino-Soto on behalf of Edan Rivera Rodrguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli, Pedro Pierluisi-Urrutia, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez Responses due by 9/9/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE Of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC re #113 MOTION to Compel Against Third Party Senator Correa (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt. #113 Motion to Compel) (Lozano, Armando) Modified on 8/25/2022 to remove italics (gav).
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Armando Lozano on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 8/26/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Email Thread, #3 Exhibit Defendants' Resp to Plaintiff's 1st Set of Request for Production of Documents)(Lozano, Armando)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION to Compel Against Third Party Senator Correa filed by Armando Lozano on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 8/15/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Vilella, #2 Exhibit Subpoena and Proof of Service for Sen. Eric Correa, #3 Exhibit Letter to Sen. Correa, #4 Exhibit Certified Translation, #5 Exhibit 2nd Letter to Sen. Correa)(Lozano, Armando) Modified on 8/2/2022 to remove italics (gav).
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying #100 Motion to Dismiss. At this time, the Court will not dismiss, the PRGRA's Intervenor Complaint (see Docket No. #94 ) nor the mirror counterclaims that the PRGRA raised in their answer to Puma's complaint. However, this does not mean that, at a later stage, the Court will not be compelled to dismiss said purported claims given that the PRGRA's allegations may only amount to defenses to the claims and allegations raised by Puma and Total in the instant litigation. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/8/2022. (DMA)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition to Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc.'s Counterclaim (Docket No. 105-1) filed by TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. Re: #105 MOTION for Leave to File Document Re, Amended Pleading filed by Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc. filed by TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp.. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee) Modified on 3/31/2022 to remove italics (gav).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #106 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/9/2022. (DMA)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/9/2022. (DMA)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ANSWER to #104 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, Puma Energy Caribe, LLC's Answer to Counterclaim filed by Armando Lozano on behalf of Plaintiff Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, Counter Defendant Puma Energy Caribe, LLC.(Lozano, Armando) Modified on 3/7/2022 to remove italics (gav).
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION requesting Order Motion Regarding the Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association's Request for Leave to File "Amended Pleading" (Docket No. 105) filed by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 3/17/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz) Modified on 3/4/2022 to remove italics (gav).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File Document Re, Amended Pleading filed by Hector Benitez-Arraiza on behalf of Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc. Responses due by 3/11/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Total's Complaint (Draft))(Benitez-Arraiza, Hector) Modified on 2/28/2022 to remove italics (gav).
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Hector Benitez-Arraiza on behalf of Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc. .(Benitez-Arraiza, Hector) Modified on 2/14/2022 to link docket #1, correct filer (gav).
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss filed by Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc. Re: #100 MOTION to dismiss Defendant-Intervenor Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc.s Intervenor Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) as to Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc.. (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector) Modified on 2/14/2022 to remove italics (gav).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/1/2022. (DMA)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION for extension of time until March 3, 2022 to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Intevenor Complaint filed by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 2/15/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION to dismiss Defendant-Intervenor Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc.s Intervenor Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) as to Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Armando Lozano on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 2/11/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lozano, Armando) Modified on 1/31/2022 to remove italics (gav).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #99 MOTION to dismiss Defendant-Intervenor Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc.'s Intervenor Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) as to Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. ***FILED IN ERROR - Document filed using another attorneys login/password. Counsel to re-file*** (gav)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ***FILED IN ERROR - Document filed using another attorneys login/password. Counsel to re-file*** MOTION to dismiss Defendant-Intervenor Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc.'s Intervenor Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) as to Puma Energy Caribe, LLC filed by Armando Lozano on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 2/10/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lozano, Armando) Modified on 1/28/2022 (gav).
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz terminated. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/24/2022. (DMA)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to filed by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. Responses due by 2/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo) Modified on 1/24/2022 to edit text (gav).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Armando Lozano on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC (Lozano, Armando)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Armando Lozano re: 93 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (gav)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc..(Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #89 Motion to Appear PHV. The Court hereby authorizes Atty. Armando Lozano's pro hac vice appearance on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/11/2022. (DMA)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #88 Motion to Intervene. Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc. must file the Intervenor Complaint in a separate docket entry forthwith. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/11/2022. (DMA)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Joint NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Motion to Intervene by Edan Rivera Rodrguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli, Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez (Tufino-Soto, Pablo) Modified on 1/12/2022 to remove italics (gav).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Joint NOTICE Puma Energy Caribe, LLC's and TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp's Joint Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Intervene by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC re #88 MOTION to Intervene (Shepard, Steven) Modified on 1/11/2022 to remove italics (gav).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Motion to allow Armando Lozano to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7591774) filed by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 1/24/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Intervene filed by Hector Benitez-Arraiza on behalf of Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc. Responses due by 1/10/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Intervenor Complaint)(Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/30/2021. (DMA)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER noted #84 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/30/2021. (DMA)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk of the Court is to update Defendant Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.'s corporate name to: TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp. Said update is to be made in both Civil Case No. 20-1591 and Civil Case No. 20-1725. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/30/2021. (DMA)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Joint Motion In Compliance with ECF No. 80, submitting Proposed Case Management Calendar filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 11/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose) Modified on 11/17/2021 to remove italics (gav).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 11/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee) Modified on 11/17/2021 to remove italics (gav).
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER finding as moot #78 Motion to Amend/Correct. See Docket No. 80 . Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/21/2021. (DMA)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER noted #79 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/12/2021. (DMA)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/12/2021. On behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, Attys. Alberto Estrella, Joseph Grinstein and Gerardo Cruz-Ortiz were present; on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp., Atty. Lee Sepulvado-Ramos was present; and on behalf of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Attys. Joel Torres-Ortiz and Pablo Tufino were present. During the Conference, the parties discussed proposed changes to the preliminary case calendar at Docket No. 76 and further provided proposed dates for various procedural events that were not outlined during the last Scheduling Conference. Finally, the Court ordered the parties to file a Joint Motion with the proposed case calendar, taking into account the discussions held during today's Scheduling Conference. Said Joint Motion must be filed on or before November 19, 2021. Afterwards, the Court will enter the corresponding Scheduling Order. (DMA)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Scheduling Order at DN 76 and Motion to Amend at DN 78 filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 11/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order Re: 76 Minute,,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,,, Scheduling Conference,,,,,, filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 11/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 76 ) (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/05/2021. On behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, Attys. Alberto Estrella, Steven Shepard and Joseph Grinstein were present; on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp., Atty. Albeniz Couret-Fuentes was present; and on behalf of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Attys. Joel Torres-Ortiz and Pablo Tufio were present. During the Conference, the parties informed the Court of their agreements as to the various case calendar deadline and argued their positions as to the order of certain procedural events. Taking said positions into account, the Court sets the following deadlines: deadline to cure jurisdictional deficiencies is set for November 19, 2021; deadline to join other parties is set for December 19, 2021; deadline to amend the pleadings is set for April 28, 2022; deadline to conclude fact discovery is set for October 20, 2022; deadline to conclude expert discovery is set for March 31, 2023; deadline to file a pre-hearing memorandum as to contested and uncontested facts is set for May 31, 2023; and an evidentiary hearing to discuss contested and uncontested facts is set for June 26-30, 2023. Further, the Court will hold an additional Scheduling Conference on November 12, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. to discuss the pending deadline to file dispositive motions; however, if the parties reach a mutual agreement as to said date, a joint motion informing said agreement may be submitted to the Court before said date. (DMA) Modified on 11/8/2021 to add text(ab).
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp., Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. (Estrella, Alberto)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. See attached Order for further details. The Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby set for 11/5/2021 02:00 PM in VTC Bridge DRD before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. The Parties are to JOINTLY submit their Scheduling Conference Memorandum on or before November 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/18/2021. (DMA)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint as to Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Defendants Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli.(Torres-Ortiz, Joel) Modified on 10/13/2021 to remove italics (gav).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Pablo Tufino-Soto on behalf of Defendants Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli, Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez.(Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION AND ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting in part and denying in part #31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Further, the Court hereby DENIES the Motion to Dismiss filed at Docket No. 13 of Civil Case No. 20-1725 (consolidated with the instant case). See attached Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/22/2021. (DMA) Modified on 9/23/2021 add text (gav).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to #31 Motion to Dismiss filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz) Modified on 5/7/2021 link docket 31 (gav).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Sur-Reply filed by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 5/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz) Modified on 5/7/2021 to remove italics (gav).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #65 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/23/2021. (DMA)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER noted #64 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/23/2021. (DMA)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/23/2021. (DMA)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for extension of time until 05/06/2021 to Motion for Leave and for Extension of Time to File Surreply Filed with Consent of Defendants filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 5/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION Submitting Reply re: #58 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli Responses due by 5/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #58 ) (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli Responses due by 5/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to File; granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 4/28/2021. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/14/2021. (DMA)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/14/2021. (DMA)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Document , MOTION for Extension of Time until April 20, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #58 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli Responses due by 4/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #58 ) (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition Plaintiff's Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (corrected version) filed by Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Ines Carrau-Martinez, Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Wanda Vazquez-Garced filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Shepard, Steven) Modified on 4/12/2021 remove italics (gav).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) (related to Docket #13 of Case No. 20-01725-DRD) filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Re: #57 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz) Modified on 4/7/2021 remove italics (gav).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 4/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz) Modified on 4/7/2021 remove italics (gav).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to File; granting #55 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/31/2021. (DMA)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Document Surreply, MOTION for extension of time until April 9, 2021 to file surreply filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 4/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/26/2021. (DMA)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/26/2021. (DMA)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Second MOTION for extension of time until April 6, 2021 to to File Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure (12)(B)(6) filed by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 4/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Edan Rivera Rodrguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli, Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez Re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (corrected version) filed by Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Ines Carrau-Martinez, Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Wanda Vazquez-Garced filed by Edan Rivera Rodrguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli, Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez. (Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (less than two (2) pages) filed by Pablo Tufino-Soto on behalf of Edan Rivera Rodrguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli, Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez Responses due by 4/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Pablo Tufino-Soto on behalf of Edan Rivera Rodrguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia (Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Domingo Emanuelli, Edan Rivera Rodrguez (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File. The Reply must comply with PRD Local Rule 7 (c). Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/9/2021. (DMA)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/9/2021. (DMA)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting #43 Motion requesting Order. After conferring with Hon. Judge William G. Young, the Court hereby GRANTS Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.'s petition for consolidation. To that end, the instant case is hereby consolidated with Civil Case No. 20-1725 (WGY). Pursuant to Local Rule 42, the Clerk of the Court shall designate the instant case as the lead case. See PRD Local Rule 42. Furthermore, "[a]ll documents or pleadings filed or tendered after the consolidation shall (1) include the caption of all consolidated cases, and (2) be served on all parties within such cases, and (3) be filed only in the lead case." Id. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/9/2021. (DMA)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION requesting Order to Deem Unopposed Motion for Consolidation of Civil Case filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 3/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee) Modified on 3/3/2021 remove italics (gav).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply Brief, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 24, 2020 to File Response/Reply filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan) Modified on 3/1/2021 remove italics (gav).
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (corrected version) filed by Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Ines Carrau-Martinez, Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Wanda Vazquez-Garced filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. (Shepard, Steven) Modified on 2/26/2021 remove italics (gav).
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess of Pages Allowed filed by Steven M. Shepard on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 3/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Shepard, Steven) Modified on 2/26/2021 remove italics (gav).
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez terminated. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/29/2021. (DMA)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER noted #35 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/29/2021. (DMA)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER noted #32 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/29/2021. (DMA)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 2/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal) Modified on 1/28/2021 edit text (gav).
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Consent to Consultation of Cases filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 2/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 2/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - TPPRC Complaint)(Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translation of Exhibit 1 of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (corrected version) filed by Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Ines Carrau-Martinez, Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Wanda Vazquez-Garced filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 2/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified English Translation of Commonwealth's Senate Bank, Commerce and Cooperative Committee Positive Report on Senate Bill No. 1146 (Act No. 60-2020))(Related document(s) #31 ) (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (corrected version) filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Commonwealth's Senate Bank, Commerce and Cooperative Committee Positive Report on Senate Bill No. 1146 (Act No. 60-2020))(Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan) Modified on 1/19/2021 remove italics (gav).
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff is to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before February 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/15/2021. (DMA)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants are to file the corrected Motion to Dismiss -and corresponding exhibits- through a separate docket entry. The Clerk of the Court is to strike from the record the incorrect version of the Motion to Dismiss filed at Docket No. #24 . Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/15/2021. (DMA)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/15/2021. (DMA)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/15/2021. (DMA)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION for Leave to File Document Corrected Version of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Tendering the Same filed by Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Ines Carrau-Martinez, Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Wanda Vazquez-Garced, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Ines Carrau-Martinez, Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Wanda Vazquez-Garced filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 1/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #25 , #24 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . ***STRICKEN AS PER ORDER AT D.E. #29*** (gav)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Document Corrected Version of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Tendering the Same filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Defendants' Corrected Motion to Dismiss)(Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan) Modified on 1/13/2021 remove italics (gav).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Commonwealth's Senate Bank, Commerce and Cooperative Committee Positive Report on Senate Bill No. 1146 (Act No. 60-2020))(Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and request for a brief extension of time until January 26, 2021 to file the certified English translation of Exhibit 1 of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan) Modified on 1/12/2021 remove italics (gav).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Document Motion to Dismiss in excess of pages filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of Ines Carrau-Martinez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez, Wanda Vazquez-Garced Responses due by 1/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan) Modified on 1/12/2021 remove italics (gav).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER noted #20 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/17/2020. (DMA)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Plaintiff's Consent to Defendants Request for Extension of Time filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 12/1/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time until January 11, 2021 to file Answer to Complaint or otherwise plead by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan) Modified on 11/16/2020 change italics (gav).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC upon Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Estrella, Alberto)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC upon Ines Carrau-Martinez served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Estrella, Alberto)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC upon Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Estrella, Alberto)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC upon Wanda Vazquez-Garced served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Estrella, Alberto)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC upon Commonwealth of Puerto Rico served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Estrella, Alberto)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear PHV. The Court hereby authorizes Atty. Joseph S. Grinstein's pro hac vice appearance on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/2/2020. (DMA)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear PHV. The Court hereby authorizes Atty. Neal Manne's pro hac vice appearance on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/2/2020. (DMA)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear PHV. The Court hereby authorizes Atty. Steven M. Shepard's pro hac vice appearance on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/2/2020. (DMA)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion to allow Joseph Grinstein to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7071000) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 11/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion to allow Neal Manne to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7070992) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 11/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion to allow Steven Shepard to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7069619) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits - Summons - as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico)(Estrella, Alberto) Modified on 10/30/2020 change event (gav).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/17/2017.(gav)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ines Carrau-Martinez, Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez, Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez, Wanda Vazquez-Garced (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. (arg)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7067662.), filed by Puma Energy Caribe, LLC. Service due by 1/26/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Law 60 of 2020, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Feb 11 2020 Noti Uno Sin Medio Radio Program Transcript, #3 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Summons - Governor Wanda Vazquez Garced, #6 Summons Summons - Hon. Carmen Salgado Rodriguez, #7 Summons Summons - Hon. Ines Del C. Carrau Martinez, #8 Summons Hon. Johan M. Rosa Rodriguez)(Estrella, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puma Energy Caribe, LLC v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Carmen Salgado-Rodriguez
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst Attorney Genera Johan M Rosa-Rodriguez
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Ines Carrau-Martinez
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo Emanuelli
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edan Rivera Rodrguez
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TotalEnergies Marketing Puerto Rico Corp.
Represented By: Anibal Jose Nunez Gonzalez
Represented By: Lee Sepulvado-Ramos
Represented By: Albeniz Couret-Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Pierluisi-Urrutia
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puma Energy Caribe, LLC
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Represented By: Joseph PHV S. Grinstein
Represented By: Neal S. Manne
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Represented By: Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz
Represented By: Armando Lozano
Represented By: Gerardo Jose Cruz
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.
Represented By: Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Lee Sepulvado-Ramos
Represented By: Anibal Jose Nunez Gonzalez
Represented By: Albeniz Couret-Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Puerto Rico Gasoline Retailers Association, Inc.
Represented By: Hector Benitez-Arraiza
Represented By: Miguel A. Rodriguez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?