Rosado Pagan v. Consejo de Uniones de Trabajadores de Muelles y Ramas Anexas de Puerto Rico UTM-ILA-AFL-CIO (UTM) Local ILA 1740
Plaintiff: Randall Rosado Pagan
3Rd Party Defendant: SSA San Juan Inc. and Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Consejo de Uniones de Trabajadores de Muelles y Ramas Anexas de Puerto Rico UTM-ILA-AFL-CIO (UTM) Local ILA 1740
Case Number: 3:2020cv01654
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss is due by January 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 1/8/2021. (mrr)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time; noted #13 Motion Submitting English Translations. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 1/8/2021.(mrr)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION Submitting English Translations filed by Antonio M. Cuevas-Delgado on behalf of Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc. Responses due by 1/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Answer, #3 Exhibit 3- Third Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4- Summons, #5 Exhibit 6- Informative Motion)(Cuevas-Delgado, Antonio)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 25, 2021 to File Response/Reply filed by Nora Vargas-Acosta on behalf of Randall Rosado Pagan Responses due by 1/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vargas-Acosta, Nora)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Remand filed by Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc. Re: #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Randall Rosado Pagan filed by Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc.. (Cuevas-Delgado, Antonio)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 5, 2020 to file Certified English Translation filed by Antonio M. Cuevas-Delgado on behalf of Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc. Responses due by 1/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cuevas-Delgado, Antonio)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Antonio M. Cuevas-Delgado on behalf of Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc. Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cuevas-Delgado, Antonio)
December 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand filed by Nora Vargas-Acosta on behalf of Randall Rosado Pagan Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Partial Judgment, #2 Exhibit Resolution PR Court of Appeals, #3 Exhibit Resolution and Order Trial Crt., #4 Exhibit Resolution Trial Crt March 12 2020, #5 Exhibit Motion in Compliance with Order)(Vargas-Acosta, Nora)
December 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Plaintiff Randall Rosado Pagan by Nora Vargas-Acosta on behalf of Randall Rosado Pagan (Vargas-Acosta, Nora)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE as Counsel filed by William Marrero-Quinones on behalf of Consejo de Uniones de Trabajadores de Muelles y Ramas Anexas de Puerto Rico UTM-ILA-AFL-CIO (UTM) Local ILA 1740 Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Quinones, William) Modified on 12/18/2020 to edit event and title (mcm).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Document and for Extension of Time. Defendant Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs., Inc. shall file the pending certified translations by December 30, 2020. Finding as moot #3 Motion for Leave to File, in light of the Court's ruling on the Motion at Docket #2 . Granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs., Inc. shall plead or otherwise defend by December 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/24/2020. (mrr)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (ad)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Antonio M. Cuevas-Delgado on behalf of Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc. Responses due by 12/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cuevas-Delgado, Antonio)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20, 2020 to file English Translations filed by Antonio M. Cuevas-Delgado on behalf of Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc. Responses due by 12/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cuevas-Delgado, Antonio)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Document and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certified Trans filed by Antonio M. Cuevas-Delgado on behalf of Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc. Responses due by 12/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cuevas-Delgado, Antonio). Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 11/23/2020 (mcm). Modified to add motion and edit title (mcm).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance of Puerto Rico, Superior Division, San Juan Ward, case number SJ2019CV04409. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-7092514), filed by Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Answer, #5 Exhibit 3 - Third Party Complaint, #6 Exhibit 4 - Summons, #7 Exhibit 5 - Consent Email, #8 Exhibit 6 - Informative Motion)(Cuevas-Delgado, Antonio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosado Pagan v. Consejo de Uniones de Trabajadores de Muelles y Ramas Anexas de Puerto Rico UTM-ILA-AFL-CIO (UTM) Local ILA 1740
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SSA San Juan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Luis Ayala Colon & Sucrs, Inc.
Represented By: Antonio M. Cuevas-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Rosado Pagan
Represented By: Nora Vargas-Acosta
Represented By: Charles Zeno-Santiago
Represented By: Victor M. Bermudez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Consejo de Uniones de Trabajadores de Muelles y Ramas Anexas de Puerto Rico UTM-ILA-AFL-CIO (UTM) Local ILA 1740
Represented By: William Marrero-Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?