PRCI Loan LLC v. Cofresi-Capestany et al
Plaintiff: PRCI Loan LLC
Defendant: MIRADOR DE LA GLORIA INC., Ivan Cofresi-Capestany, Legal Conjugal Partnership Arbaje/Lopez, MARDUK CONSTRUCTION, CORP., Juan Ramon Arbaje-Ramos, Ileana Lopez-Rivera, REDMAG, INC., Carmen L Torres-Lopez, MARDUK DEVELOPMENT, CORP., VILLAS DE SAN AGUSTN DEVELOPMENT, CORP., MIRADOR DEL RO, INC., ICFQ DESARROLLOS CARRAIZO, INC., Legal Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Arbaje-Lopez, Mirador del Rio, Inc., Villas de San Agustin Development, Corp., Marduk Construction Corp., Mirador de la Gloria, Inc. and Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres
Case Number: 3:2020cv01656
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 23 TRANSMITTAL Letter sent to the Court of First Instance of Caguas, forwarding certified copies of Order of Remand DE #17, AMENDED Judgment & Docket Sheet. (mg)
January 15, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #20 Transmittal Letter. ***FILED IN ERROR*** Amended Judgment to be included in Transmittal Letter. (mg)
January 14, 2021 Filing 22 AMENDED JUDGMENT is hereby entered REMANDING the instant case to the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Courts. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/14/2021. (CRH)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting #19 Motion to Alter Judgment; Granting #19 Motion to Amend/Correct Re: 18 Judgment. Judgment entered at Docket No. #18 is hereby VACATED. An amended judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/14/2021. (CRH)
January 14, 2021 Filing 20 ***FILED IN ERROR AMENDED JUDGMENT TO BE INCLUDED*** TRANSMITTAL Letter to the Court of First Instance of Caguas, forwarding certified copies of Order of Remand DE #17, Judgment & Docket Sheet. (mg) Modified on 1/15/2021 (mg).
January 14, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Alter Judgment , MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #18 Judgment filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of PRCI Loan LLC Responses due by 1/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 ***VACATED AS PER DOCKET 22*** JUDGMENT is hereby entered DISMISSING all claims against Defendants and remanding the case to the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Courts. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/14/2021. (CRH) Modified on 1/15/2021 (mg).
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Noted #16 Amended Motion In Compliance with Orders to Show Cause Dkt. 9 as to 9 Order; Granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendants, as the parties seeking removal, have failed to show that removal was proper and thus, did not established a basis for federal jurisdiction. See Fayard v. Northeast Vehicle Services, LLC, 533 F.3d 42, 48 (1st Cir. 2008); Danca v. Private Health Care Systems, 185 F.3d 1, 4 (1st Cir. 1999). Pursuant to the parties' submissions, removal in this case was untimely. See 28 U.S.C. 1441(e); Rios v. Lantz, 402 F. Supp. 3d 1, 2 (D.P.R. 2019). Furthermore, a federal court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction over claims "brought by state-court losers complaining of injuries caused by state-court judgments rendered before the district court proceedings commenced and inviting district court review and rejection of those judgments." Exxon Mobil Corp. v. Saudi Basic Indus. Corp., 544 U.S. 280, 284 (2005). See also Puerto Ricans for P.R. Party v. Dalmau, 544 F.3d 58, 68 (1st Cir. 2008). Accordingly, this case is remanded to the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Courts. As a result of this frivolous removal, the Court holds the imposition of $500 monetary sanctions against Defendants' counsel under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927. See also Reyes v. Prof. Hepa Certificate Corp., 86 F. Supp. 3d 79 (D.P.R. 2015), aff'd sub nom. Escribano-Reyes v. Prof. Hepa Certificate Corp., 817 F.3d 380 (1st Cir. 2016). Similarly, just costs and actual expenses will be awarded to Plaintiff under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Plaintiff shall file a motion, on or before February 1, 2021, to this effect and for the Court's approval. The monetary sanctions shall be deposited with the Clerk of Court on or before February 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/13/2021. (CRH)
December 30, 2020 Filing 16 Amended Motion In Compliance with Orders to Show Cause Dkt. 9 as to 9 Order,,, filed by Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte on behalf of Ivan Cofresi-Capestany, Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres, ICFQ Desarrollos Carraizo, Inc., Marduk Construction Corp., Marduk Development, Corp., Mirador de la Gloria, Inc., Mirador del Rio, Inc., Redmag, Inc., Carmen L Torres-Lopez, Villas de San Agustin Development, Corp. Responses due by 1/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 Mandate SCPR, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2 Mandate Appeals Court PR)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting as requested #14 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/30/20 to file Amended or Supplemental Motion in Relation to Docket #13; Noted #13 Motion in Compliance to DK 9 Order and Response in Opposition to Motion, re: DK 7 Motion to Remand Regarding Filed Notice of Removal; Granting as requested #11 First Motion for Extension of Time until 12/30/20 to File Response/Reply to Order to Show Cause and Opposition to Motion for Remand as to 9 Order. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/29/2020. (CRH)
December 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/30/20 to file Amended or Supplemental Motionin Relation to Docket #13 filed by Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte on behalf of Ivan Cofresi-Capestany, Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres, ICFQ Desarrollos Carraizo, Inc., Marduk Construction Corp., Marduk Development, Corp., Mirador de la Gloria, Inc., Mirador del Rio, Inc., Redmag, Inc., Carmen L Torres-Lopez, Villas de San Agustin Development, Corp. Responses due by 1/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION In Compliance to DK 9 ORDER and RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion, re: DK #7 Motion to Remand. Regarding Filed Notice of Removal filed by ICFQ Desarrollos Carraizo, Inc., Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres, Villas de San Agustin Development, Corp., Mirador de la Gloria, Inc., Carmen L Torres-Lopez, Redmag, Inc., Ivan Cofresi-Capestany, Marduk Development, Corp., Mirador del Rio, Inc., Marduk Construction Corp. Re: 9 Order,,, filed by ICFQ Desarrollos Carraizo, Inc., Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres, Villas de San Agustin Development, Corp., Mirador de la Gloria, Inc., Carmen L Torres-Lopez, Redmag, Inc., Ivan Cofresi-Capestany, Marduk Development, Corp., Mirador del Rio, Inc., Marduk Construction Corp.. (Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel) Modified on 12/29/2020 to correct event, edit docket title text and create relationship to dockets. (mg)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS: STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (mg)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/30/20 to File Response/Reply to Order to Show Cause and Opposition to Motion for Remand as to 9 Order,,, #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by PRCI Loan LLC filed by Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte on behalf of Ivan Cofresi-Capestany, Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres, ICFQ Desarrollos Carraizo, Inc., Marduk Construction Corp., Marduk Development, Corp., Mirador de la Gloria, Inc., Mirador del Rio, Inc., Redmag, Inc., Carmen L Torres-Lopez, Villas de San Agustin Development, Corp. Responses due by 1/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 9 , #7 ) (Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting #6 First Motion for extension of time; Granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Translation due in thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/23/2020. (CRH)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant shall SHOW CAUSE on or before December 28, 2020 as to why this removed case should not be immediately remanded to Commonwealth court. From Defendant's own pleadings and exhibits it is clear that when the purported federal issue arose, it did not remove the case within thirty days thereafter, but rather chose to continue via the Commonwealth appellate process. Moreover, a defense based on federal law does not convert an otherwise purely state law claim to a removable one. Finally, Defendant shall along-with SHOW CAUSE as to why it, as well as its counsel, should not be sanctioned under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and 28 U.S.C. sec. 1927, as well as imposed costs. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/22/2020. (CRH)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of PRCI Loan LLC Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of PRCI Loan LLC Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for extension of time until January 19, 2021 to File Certified Translation of Exhibits filed by Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte on behalf of Ivan Cofresi-Capestany, Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres, ICFQ Desarrollos Carraizo, Inc., Marduk Construction Corp., Marduk Development, Corp., Mirador de la Gloria, Inc., Mirador del Rio, Inc., Redmag, Inc., Carmen L Torres-Lopez, Villas de San Agustin Development, Corp. Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of PRCI Loan LLC (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. (vdm)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental Motion to Include Civil Cover and Category Sheets re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing, #1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte on behalf of Ivan Cofresi-Capestany, ICFQ DESARROLLOS CARRAIZO, INC., Legal Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres, MARDUK CONSTRUCTION, CORP., MARDUK DEVELOPMENT, CORP., MIRADOR DE LA GLORIA INC., MIRADOR DEL RO, INC., REDMAG, INC., Carmen L Torres-Lopez, VILLAS DE SAN AGUSTN DEVELOPMENT, CORP. Responses due by 12/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Related document(s) #2 , #1 ) (Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING: Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/24/2020. (ad)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Caguas Superior Court Part Caguas, case number E CD 2009-01991 (702). (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-7093091), filed by ICFQ DESARROLLOS CARRAIZO, INC., Legal Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres, VILLAS DE SAN AGUSTN DEVELOPMENT, CORP., MIRADOR DE LA GLORIA INC., Carmen L Torres-Lopez, REDMAG, INC., Ivan Cofresi-Capestany, MARDUK DEVELOPMENT, CORP., MIRADOR DEL RO, INC., MARDUK CONSTRUCTION, CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit)(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRCI Loan LLC v. Cofresi-Capestany et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIRADOR DE LA GLORIA INC.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Cofresi-Capestany
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Conjugal Partnership Arbaje/Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARDUK CONSTRUCTION, CORP.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Ramon Arbaje-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ileana Lopez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDMAG, INC.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen L Torres-Lopez
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARDUK DEVELOPMENT, CORP.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VILLAS DE SAN AGUSTN DEVELOPMENT, CORP.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIRADOR DEL RO, INC.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICFQ DESARROLLOS CARRAIZO, INC.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Arbaje-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirador del Rio, Inc.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villas de San Agustin Development, Corp.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marduk Construction Corp.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirador de la Gloria, Inc.
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Cofresi-Torres
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRCI Loan LLC
Represented By: Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?