Morell-Colon v. Puerto Rico Telephone Company, et al
Plaintiff: Wanda I Morell Colon and Wanda I Morell-Colon
Defendant: Puerto Rico Telephone Company/dba Claro Puerto Rico, Aetna Life Insurance Co., John Doe, Richard Roe and Puerto Rico Telephone Company doing business as Claro Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2020cv01662
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aetna Life Insurance Co. (Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to allow Steven Silver to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7149933) filed by Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Co. Responses due by 1/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION Requesting Defendants' Motion To Dismiss to be Deemed Unopposed re #6 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to Wanda I Morell-Colon filed by Aetna Life Insurance Co., Puerto Rico Telephone Company filed by Maria Isabel Rey-Cancio on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Co., Puerto Rico Telephone Company Responses due by 1/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Rey-Cancio, Maria Isabel)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aetna Life Insurance Co. re #6 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to Wanda I Morell-Colon (Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to All Defendants filed by Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Co. and Puerto Rico Telephone Company. Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Policy)(Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique) Modified on 12/22/2020 to edit title and add filer (mcm).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #3 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 12/11/2020. (lir)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aetna Life Insurance Co. (Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time until 12/21/2020 filed by Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Co. Responses due by 12/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)
November 23, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (ad)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 21, 2020 to File Answer filed by Marcia C. Laurido-Soto on behalf of Puerto Rico Telephone Company/dba Claro Puerto Rico Responses due by 12/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laurido-Soto, Marcia)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, Superior Court of Ponce, case number JD2020CV00283. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-7093966), filed by Puerto Rico Telephone Company/dba Claro Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Sheet, #9 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Rey-Cancio, Maria Isabel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morell-Colon v. Puerto Rico Telephone Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Telephone Company/dba Claro Puerto Rico
Represented By: Marcia C. Laurido-Soto
Represented By: Maria Isabel Rey-Cancio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Telephone Company doing business as Claro Puerto Rico
Represented By: Marcia C. Laurido-Soto
Represented By: Maria Isabel Rey-Cancio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda I Morell Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda I Morell-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?