Colon et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Autocentro Toyota, Mrs. Francisco R Gonzalez Colon, Francisco R Gonzalez Colon, Mr. Rafael Hernandez Mercado, Rafael Hernandez-Mercado, Migdalia Colon-Ortiz and Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Colon
Defendant: Toyota Motor Manufacturing Inc., Toyota de Puerto Rico Corp and Toyota Motor Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv01677
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Autocentro Toyota, Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Manufacturing Inc., Toyota de Puerto Rico Corp (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 First NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet (Gonzalez-Colon, Francisco)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 First NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheets (Gonzalez-Colon, Francisco)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Category Sheet(JS44) is incomplete. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 12/1/2020. (arg)
November 27, 2020 Filing Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt number 0104-7099723 (arg)
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rafael Hernandez Mercado, filed by Rafael Hernandez Mercado. Service due by 2/25/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Auto Expert Report, #4 Exhibit Expert Resume - Curriculum Vitae, #5 Exhibit Toyota Air Bag Recall, #6 Summons Toyota Motor Corporation, #7 Summons Toyota Manufacturing - Canada, #8 Summons Toyota of Puerto Rico Corp., #9 Summons Autocentro Toyota)(Gonzalez-Colon, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Manufacturing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota de Puerto Rico Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autocentro Toyota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Francisco R Gonzalez Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco R Gonzalez Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Rafael Hernandez Mercado
Represented By: Francisco R. Gonzalez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Hernandez-Mercado
Represented By: Francisco R. Gonzalez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdalia Colon-Ortiz
Represented By: Francisco R. Gonzalez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Colon
Represented By: Francisco R. Gonzalez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?