Velez-Amador v. Schultz et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Velez Amador and Ricardo Velez-Amador
Defendant: United States Coast Guard, United States of America, United States Coast Guard Hearing Office and Karl L. Schultz
Case Number: 3:2020cv01724
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw Legal Representation and Notice of Appearance Attorney as to Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa filed by Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa on behalf of Ricardo Velez-Amador Responses due by 1/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro) Modified caps on 12/28/2020 (idg).
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Karl L. Schultz, United States Coast Guard, United States Coast Guard Hearing Office, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Karl L. Schultz agent of in his official capacity as Commandant of the United States Coast Guard, #2 Summons United States of America, #3 Summons United States Coast Guard, #4 Summons United States Coast Guard Hearing Office) (Saez-Marrero, Andres)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vdm)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7122474.), filed by Ricardo Velez Amador. Service due by 3/16/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit letter dated November 16, 2020, #4 Exhibit Request to Reopen the case, #5 Summons)(Saez-Marrero, Andres)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velez-Amador v. Schultz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Coast Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Coast Guard Hearing Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl L. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Velez Amador
Represented By: Andres Saez-Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Velez-Amador
Represented By: Andres Saez-Marrero
Represented By: Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?