DO NO DOCKET IN THIS MEMBER CASE - LEAD CASE IS NOW 20-1591 DRD
Plaintiff: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez
Case Number: 3:2020cv01725
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 COPY OF OPINION AND ORDER (Lead - Civil case number: 3:20-cv-01591-DRD) granting 69 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Further, the Court hereby DENIES the Motion to Dismiss filed at Docket No. #13 of Civil Case No. 20-1725 (consolidated with the instant case). See attached Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/22/2021. (rim)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 COPY OF ORDER (Lead case 20-1591) granting 33 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting 43 Motion requesting Order. After conferring with Hon. Judge William G. Young, the Court hereby GRANTS Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.'s petition for consolidation. To that end, the instant case is hereby consolidated with Civil Case No. 20-1725 (WGY). Pursuant to Local Rule 42, the Clerk of the Court shall designate the instant case as the lead case. See PRD Local Rule 42. Furthermore, "[a]ll documents or pleadings filed or tendered after the consolidation shall (1) include the caption of all consolidated cases, and (2) be served on all parties within such cases, and (3) be filed only in the lead case." Id. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/9/2021. (DMA)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order entered on Docket No. 17 and the Order entered in Civil Case 20-1591 (DRD) (see, Docket No.449), this case has been consolidated with Civil Case 20-1591 (DRD) and thus transferred to the docket of Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. Signed by Clerk on 03/09/2021. (ft)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for extension of time. The opposition is to be filed at Civil Case No. 20-1591. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/9/2021. (DMA)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER noted #9 INFORMATIVE motion. Pursuant to the Court Order entered at Docket No. 44 of Civil Case No. 20-1591, the instant case is consolidated with Civil Case No. 20-1591 which is now the lead case. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/9/2021. (DMA)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time until March 25, 2021 to File Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure (12)(B)(6) filed by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 3/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER:CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER1.The case will be trial ready by February 20222.A joint final pre-trial memorandum will be filed by February 20223.Discovery will be completed by November 1, 20214.Dispositive motions will be filed by November 1, 20215.Preserving all parties rights, they shall, within thirty days of the date of this order, file a joint proposed case management scheduling order consistent with the above dates. The parties may agree to advance these dates but may not agree to delay them.6.No motion for a continuance will be entertained that does not recite the above dates and explain how and why any such continuance will affect them.SO ORDERED. Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2021.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/12/2021.(EES)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion for extension of time Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/12/2021. (EES)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 2/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez terminated Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/11/2021. (EES)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding filing of Motion for Consolidation of Civil Cases filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 2/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Motion for Consolidation)(Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time until February 11, 2021 to Answer Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Responses due by 1/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. upon Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Commonwealth of Puerto Rico served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young. (vdm)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7122547.), filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. Service due by 3/16/2021, (Attachments: #1 Summons Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, #2 Summons Secretary of Justice for the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DO NO DOCKET IN THIS MEMBER CASE - LEAD CASE IS NOW 20-1591 DRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.
Represented By: Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Albeniz Couret-Fuentes
Represented By: Lee Sepulvado-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?