Luzardo-Arevalo v. Rinegart et al
Plaintiff: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, LUIS JOSE LUZARDO and Luis Jose Luzardo-Arevalo
Defendant: Brett Rinegart, Secretary Chad F. Wolf, Attorney General William P. Barr, US Attorney for PR Stephen Muldrow, Director CHRISTOPHER WRAY, Acting Secretary Ken Cuccinelli and Deliana Gonzalez
Case Number: 3:2020cv01734
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER noted #6 Informative motion. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 2/4/2021. (mrr)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance as co-counsel for Plaintiff by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of Luis Jose Luzardo-Arevalo (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel) Modified to correct docket event on 2/4/2021 (rim).
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 First INFORMATIVE Motion All Defendants have been Summoned filed by Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Garcia-Miranda, Maria) Modified docket text title on 2/4/2021 (rim).
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Deliana Gonzalez, Stephen Muldrow, Brett Rinegart, Chad F. Wolf, Christopher Wray (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) Modified to add applicable parties on 2/10/2021 (rim).
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons as to All Defendants filed by Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda on behalf of Luis Jose Luzardo-Arevalo. Responses due by 1/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons DHS, #2 Summons FBI, #3 Summons US Atty for the District of PE\R, #4 Summons Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons USCIS San Juan PR Field Office, #6 Summons USCIS Southeast Region, #7 Summons USCIS)(Garcia-Miranda, Maria) Modified on 12/23/2020 to correct event, replace capital letters and edit docket text (mcm). Modified applicable parties on 2/10/2021 (rim).
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (vdm)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT LUIS JOSE LUZARDO against All Defendants, filed by LUIS JOSE LUZARDO. Service due by 3/22/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 A, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 6, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7 A, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT 8, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT 9, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT 10, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT 11, #14 Exhibit EXHIBIT 12, #15 Exhibit EXHIBIT 13, #16 Exhibit EXHIBIT 14, #17 Exhibit EXHIBIT 15, #18 Exhibit EXHIBIT 16, #19 Exhibit EXHIBIT 17, #20 Supplement CATEGORY SHEET)(Garcia-Miranda, Maria)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT LUIS JOSE LUZARDO against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7127349.), filed by LUIS JOSE LUZARDO. Service due by 3/22/2021,(Garcia-Miranda, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luzardo-Arevalo v. Rinegart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Rinegart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney for PR Stephen Muldrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director CHRISTOPHER WRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deliana Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS JOSE LUZARDO
Represented By: Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Jose Luzardo-Arevalo
Represented By: Maria Del Rosario Garcia-Miranda
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?