Pagan-Hermina et al v. Hospital Doctor Susoni, Incorporado et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Pagan Hermina, Daniel Pagan Hermina, Daniel Pagan-Hermina and Francisco Pagan-Hermina
Defendant: Dr. Christopher Vega Acevedo, JOHN DOE, EFG Insurance Companies, ABC Insurance Companies, DOES I-X, Dr. Cesar Rivera Reveron, Hospital Doctor Susoni, Incorporado d/b/a Hospital Metropolitano Dr. Susoni, JAMES ROE, Dr. Cesar R. Rivera-Reveron, Dr. Christopher Vega-Acevedo, Hospital Doctor Susoni, Incorporado doing business as Hospital Metropolitano Dr. Susoni and John Doe 1
Case Number: 3:2020cv01761
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Cesar R. Rivera-Reveron served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Hospital Doctor Susoni, Incorporado served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021; Christopher Vega-Acevedo served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: GRANTED. Answer due March 1, 2021. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/01/2021. (brc)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/01/21 to File Answer filed by Igor Dominguez-Perez on behalf of Christopher Vega-Acevedo Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dominguez-Perez, Igor)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Appearance is NOTED. Extension of time is GRANTED. Answer deadline is extended until March 1, 2021. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/28/2021. (brc)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Daniel Pagan-Hermina, Francisco Pagan-Hermina filed by Ramon L. Martinez-Vega on behalf of Hospital Doctor Susoni, Incorporado Responses due by 2/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Martinez-Vega, Ramon)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hospital Doctor Susoni, Incorporado, Cesar R. Rivera-Reveron, Christopher Vega-Acevedo (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7134634.), filed by Daniel Pagan Hermina, Francisco Pagan Hermina. Service due by 3/30/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Williams-English, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pagan-Hermina et al v. Hospital Doctor Susoni, Incorporado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Christopher Vega Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFG Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Cesar Rivera Reveron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Doctor Susoni, Incorporado d/b/a Hospital Metropolitano Dr. Susoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES ROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Cesar R. Rivera-Reveron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Christopher Vega-Acevedo
Represented By: Igor Dominguez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Doctor Susoni, Incorporado doing business as Hospital Metropolitano Dr. Susoni
Represented By: Ramon L. Martinez-Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Pagan Hermina
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Pagan Hermina
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Pagan-Hermina
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Pagan-Hermina
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?