Rivera Molina et al v. Casa La Roca, LLC et al
Plaintiff: International Business Solutions, LLC, William Rivera Molina, DC Project Management Corp., Ebano 155, Inc., Poppy 47, Inc. and William Rivera-Molina
Defendant: Juanita Kay Vogel, Charles Henry Eugene Vogel and Casa La Roca, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01004
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Referring Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The order referring motions at Docket No. 17 is hereby vacated. The undersigned will handle all pending matters. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/12/2021.(MET)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Third MOTION Urgent Renewed Request of Plaintiffs for the Scheduling of a Possessory Injunction Hearing Emergency Hearing re #9 Amended Complaint, filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, #31 Emergency MOTION for Hearing Second Urgent Renewed Request of Plaintiffs for the Scheduling of A Possessory Injunction Hearing re #9 Amended Complaint, filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, #11 Emergency MOTION for Hearing Urgent Motion of Plaintiffs Requesting the Scheduling of a Possessory Injunction Hearing re #9 Amended Complaint, filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC filed by Jose L. Nieto-Mingo on behalf of Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, William Rivera-Molina Responses due by 3/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #9 , #31 , #11 ) (Nieto-Mingo, Jose)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Plaintiffs' Answer to Verified Counterclaim ANSWER to #14 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Jose L. Nieto-Mingo on behalf of Plaintiffs Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, William Rivera-Molina.(Nieto-Mingo, Jose)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Emergency MOTION for Hearing Second Urgent Renewed Request of Plaintiffs for the Scheduling of A Possessory Injunction Hearing re #9 Amended Complaint, filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, #29 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC, #22 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, #21 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, 26 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Jose L. Nieto-Mingo on behalf of Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, William Rivera-Molina Responses due by 3/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #9 , #29 , #22 , #21 , 26 ) (Nieto-Mingo, Jose)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Casa La Roca, LLC, Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel Re: #15 MOTION for Provisional Remedy Prohibiting Alienation of Property filed by Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC filed by Casa La Roca, LLC, Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Catastro Digital screenshots, #2 Exhibit Electrician bills, #3 Exhibit Pool expenses, #4 Exhibit Roof repairs, #5 Exhibit Railing repairs, #6 Exhibit Broken window repair, #7 Exhibit TV replacement, #8 Exhibit Generator maintenance, #9 Exhibit Bedding replacement, #10 Exhibit Furniture replacement, #11 Exhibit Defendants' listed properties)(Indiano-Vicic, David)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Casa La Roca, LLC, Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel Re: #16 MOTION To Consolidate Hearings Regarding Possessory Injunction, Pendent Eviction Claims, and Prohibition of Alienation of Funds filed by Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC filed by Casa La Roca, LLC, Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Police Report)(Indiano-Vicic, David)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. DENIED #27 MOTION for Reconsideration of Plaintiff of Order (Docket No 26) Granting Defendants Leave to File Replies. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 02/02/2021. (cvr)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Reconsideration of Plaintiff of Order (Docket No 26) Granting Defendants Leave to File Replies re 26 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Jose L. Nieto-Mingo on behalf of Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, William Rivera-Molina Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 26 ) (Nieto-Mingo, Jose)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File. Reply briefs to both Docket Nos. 21 and 22 due on February 12, 2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 02/01/2021. (cvr)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER NOTED #23 MOTION REQUESTING NO SETTING OF HEARING IN THIS CASE DURING THE WEEK OF FEBRUARY 8 THROUGH FEBRUARY 12, 2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 02/01/2021. (cvr)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Document to file Replies to Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Consolidate Hearings and Urgent Renewed request for scheduling of a Possessory Injunction Hearing filed at dk no. 21 and to Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for provisional remedy prohibiting alienation of property filed at dk no. 22 filed by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of Casa La Roca, LLC, Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicens, Vanesa) Modified on 2/2/2021 to replace all caps text and remove italics. (mg)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION Requesting no setting of Hearing in the case during the weeks of February 8 through February 12, 2021, re #18 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, 17 Order Referring Motion, filed by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of Casa La Roca, LLC, Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #18 , 17 ) (Vicens, Vanesa) Modified on 2/2/2021 to replace all caps text. (mg)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion of Defendants for Provisional Remedy (Docket No. 15) filed by Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, William Rivera-Molina Re: #15 MOTION for Provisional Remedy Prohibiting Alienation of Property filed by Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC filed by Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, William Rivera-Molina. (Nieto-Mingo, Jose)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion of Defendants to Consolidate Hearings (Docket No. 16) filed by Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, William Rivera-Molina Re: #16 MOTION To Consolidate Hearings Regarding Possessory Injunction, Pendent Eviction Claims, and Prohibition of Alienation of Funds filed by Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC, #13 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC filed by Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, William Rivera-Molina. (Nieto-Mingo, Jose)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket Nos. 17 and 18) this case is directly referred to Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive to conduct an Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference during the month of February 2021. The following motions are referred for Report and Recommendation and/or disposition: #11 Emergency MOTION for Hearing; #15 MOTION for Provisional Remedy Prohibiting Alienation of Property; and, #16 MOTION To Consolidate Hearings. Signed by Clerk on 01/29/2021. (gr)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By #18 Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi this case is randomly referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin to conduct an Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference during the month of February 2021. Signed by Clerk on 01/29/2021. (gr) Modified on 1/29/2021 to add filed in error (gr).
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference. Failure to comply in a timely manner with the deadlines and directives detailed in this referral order may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/29/2021. (mg)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #11 Urgent Motion re: Scheduling of Hearing, #15 Motion for Provisional Remedy Prohibiting Alienation of Property, and #16 Motion to Consolidate Hearings re: Possessory Injunction, Pendent Eviction Claims, and Prohibition of Alienation of Funds is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive for Report & Recommendation and/or disposition. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/29/2021. (MES)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION To Consolidate Hearings Regarding Possessory Injunction, Pendent Eviction Claims, and Prohibition of Alienation of Funds filed by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of Casa La Roca, LLC, Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel Responses due by 2/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Provisional Remedy Prohibiting Alienation of Property filed by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of Casa La Roca, LLC, Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel Responses due by 2/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of Plaintiffs DC Project Management Corp., Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, Poppy 47, Inc., William Rivera-Molina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #11 Emergency MOTION for Hearing Urgent Motion of Plaintiffs Requesting the Scheduling of a Possessory Injunction Hearing re #9 Amended Complaint, filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Noting #11 Plaintiff's Urgent Motion Requesting the Scheduling of a Possessory Injunction Hearing. Removing Defendants shall respond on or before 1/28/2021. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/15/2021. (MES)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Emergency MOTION for Hearing Urgent Motion of Plaintiffs Requesting the Scheduling of a Possessory Injunction Hearing re #9 Amended Complaint, filed by William Rivera-Molina, Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC filed by Jose L. Nieto-Mingo on behalf of Ebano 155, Inc., International Business Solutions, LLC, William Rivera-Molina Responses due by 1/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Nieto-Mingo, Jose)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear as Attorney for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/14/2021. (MES)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Sworn Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by International Business Solutions, LLC, Ebano 155, Inc., William Rivera-Molina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Sworn Statement of William Rivera Molina in Support of First Sworn Amended Complaint)(Nieto-Mingo, Jose)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Plaintiff Co-Counsel filed by Herman Hiraldo-Sanchez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hiraldo-Sanchez, Herman)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of Plaintiffs by Jose L. Nieto-Mingo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nieto-Mingo, Jose)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (mg)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Defendants (Vicens, Vanesa)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Williams-English on behalf of All Defendants (Williams-English, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of All Defendants (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, case number SJ2020CV07196. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7137208), filed by Casa La Roca, LLC, Charles Henry Eugene Vogel, Juanita Kay Vogel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Translated Complaint, #4 Exhibit Translated Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Termination Agreement)(Indiano-Vicic, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera Molina et al v. Casa La Roca, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Business Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jose L. Nieto-Mingo
Represented By: Herman Hiraldo-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rivera Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DC Project Management Corp.
Represented By: Jose L. Nieto-Mingo
Represented By: Herman Hiraldo-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebano 155, Inc.
Represented By: Jose L. Nieto-Mingo
Represented By: Herman Hiraldo-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poppy 47, Inc.
Represented By: Jose L. Nieto-Mingo
Represented By: Herman Hiraldo-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rivera-Molina
Represented By: Jose L. Nieto-Mingo
Represented By: Herman Hiraldo-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Kay Vogel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Henry Eugene Vogel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa La Roca, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?