Sanchez-Rodriguez et al v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Omayra Sanchez-Rodriguez, Julio Ayala-Bousson and Conjugal Partnership Ayala-Sanchez
Defendant: Does 1-10, Insurance Companies A-K and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: American Airlines, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Aerostar Airport Holding LLC, Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc., XYZ Corporations, ABC Insurance Companies, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company and Does 1-5
Case Number: 3:2021cv01021
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: Noting #67 "Motion in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 66." The motion at Docket No. 64 remains under advisement. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/11/2022. (LM)
January 10, 2022 Filing 67 RESPONSE to MOTION in Compliance to 66 Order, re: #65 Informative Motion filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 1/24/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 66 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) Modified on 1/11/2022 to correct event title and add docket relationship (mcm).
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re: #65 "Informative Motion Regarding American Airlines' Motion to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Certain Evidence at Trial." Defendant American Airlines, Inc., shall respond no later than January 10, 2022. Plaintiffs may reply to Defendant American Airlines' response no later than 10 days following American Airlines' filing. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/27/2021. (LM)
December 27, 2021 Filing 65 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding American Airlines Motion to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Certain Evidence at Trial filed by Rafael J. Velazquez-Villares on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/10/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Velazquez-Villares, Rafael) Modified on 12/28/2021 to replace capital letters (mcm).
December 27, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION for Sanctions (Preclusive Sanctions) as to All Plaintiffs filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 1/10/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email of 5-19-21, #2 Exhibit B - Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re: #62 "Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Respond to Interrogatories and Discovery Requests." Plaintiffs shall respond no later than November 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/8/2021. (LM)
November 8, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Respond to American Airlines, Inc.'s Discovery Requests filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
October 6, 2021 Filing 61 ANSWER to #18 Third Party Complaint,, filed by Raphael Pena-Ramon on behalf of Third Party Defendant Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc..(Pena-Ramon, Raphael)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Denying #59 "Motion to Strike Aerostar's Reply at Docket No. 58, Alternatively, Limit Consideration of Arguments Only." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/3/2021. (MPL)
September 3, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION to Strike or Limit Aerostar's Reply Re: #58 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Aerostar Airport Holding LLC filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 9/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #58 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
August 27, 2021 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss the Third Party Complaint filed by Aerostar Airport Holding LLC Re: #44 Motion to Dismiss, 57 Order Granting #56 Motion for Leave to File filed by Aerostar Airport Holding LLC filed by Aerostar Airport Holding LLC. (Torrens-Davila, Jaime) Modified docket relationship on 8/30/2021 (mcm).
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Granting #56 "Motion for Leave to Reply to American's Opposition (Docket No. 51) and for Extension of Time to do so." Reply due August 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/17/2021. (MPL)
August 17, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to American's Opposition (Docket No. 51), MOTION for extension of time until August 27, 2021 to do so filed by Jaime A. Torrens-Davila on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holding LLC Responses due by 8/31/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torrens-Davila, Jaime)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: Granting #53 "Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Third-Party Complaint or Otherwise Plead." Third party defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than September 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/13/2021. (MPL)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Noting #52 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/13/2021. (ebb)
August 13, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 11, 2021 to File Answer to the Third-party Complaint or, otherwise, Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Conjugal Partnership Ayala-Sanchez, Omayra Sanchez-Rodriguez, Julio Ayala-Bousson filed by Raphael Pena-Ramon on behalf of Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc. Responses due by 8/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Pena-Ramon, Raphael)
August 13, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Raphael Pena-Ramon on behalf of Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc. (Pena-Ramon, Raphael)
August 10, 2021 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Compel filed by American Airlines, Inc. Re: 50 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #44 MOTION to dismiss the Third Party Complaint (Docket no. 18) as to American Airlines, Inc. MOTION to Compel the 3-Step Alternative Dispute Resolution Process of Negotiation, Mediation, and Arbitration filed by Aerostar Airport Holding LLC filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Granting #49 "American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Opposition to Third Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss." Response to defendants' motion to dismiss due August 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/27/2021. (ebb)
July 26, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 10, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to 48 Order, #44 MOTION to dismiss the Third Party Complaint (Docket no. 18) as to American Airlines, Inc. MOTION to Compel the 3-Step Alternative Dispute Resolution Process of Negotiation, Mediation, and Arbitration filed by Aerostar Airport Holding LLC filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 8/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 48 , #44 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re: #44 "Motion to Dismiss the Third Party Complaint..." American Airlines shall respond not later than July 28, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/14/2021.(MPL)
July 14, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime A. Torrens-Davila on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holding LLC (Torrens-Davila, Jaime)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Granting #45 "Motion to Restrict Filing of Exhibit in Support of Motion to Dismiss The Third Party Complaint (Docket No. 18) and to Compel The 3-Step Alternative Dispute Resolution Process of Negotiation, Mediation, and Arbitration (Docket No. 44). Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/14/2021. (ebb)
July 14, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION to Restrict Document Exhibit in Support of Motion to Dismiss The Third Party Complaint (Docket No. 18) and to Compel the 3-Step Alternative Dispute Resolution Process of Negotiation, Mediation, and Arbitration (Docket No. 44) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holding LLC Responses due by 7/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
July 14, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to dismiss the Third Party Complaint (Docket no. 18) as to American Airlines, Inc., MOTION to Compel the 3-Step Alternative Dispute Resolution Process of Negotiation, Mediation, and Arbitration filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holding LLC Responses due by 7/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 *Restricted* Exhibit 1 - Airport Use Agreement)(Camara-Fuertes, Roberto) Modified on 7/14/2021 to add restriction to Exhibit 1 as per Counsel's request (ab).
June 30, 2021 Filing 43 Third Party Summons by Publication as to Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Third Party Summons By Publication) (ad)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Noting #40 "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Third-Party Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company." Third party plaintiff American Airlines' claims against Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/30/2021. (MPL)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Noting #39 "Motion Submitting Third-Party Summons to be Issued by the Clerk of the Court." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/30/2021. (MPL)
June 23, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company by American Airlines, Inc. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
June 23, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION Submitting Third-party Summons for Service by Publication re: 36 Order on Motion for Service by Publication filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 7/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Third-party Summons by Publication)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
June 22, 2021 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company re #31 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
June 22, 2021 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aerostar Airport Holding LLC re #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel to Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC and MOTION for extension of time until July 14, 2021 to plead or otherwise defend (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Granting #30 "Motion for Leave to Serve Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc. via Publication." The Clerk shall issue the corresponding summons. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/22/2021. (MPL)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Finding as moot #32 "Motion to Withdraw Docket No. 29." See Order at Docket No. 33. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/21/2021.(MPL)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Granting #31 "Opposition to "Motion for Entry of Default on Starr Indemnity and Liability Insurance Company" and Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead." Appearing third-party defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than July 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/21/2021. (MPL)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Denying #29 "Motion for Entry of Default on Starr Indemnity and Liability Insurance Company." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/21/2021. (MPL)
June 21, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw Document re: #29 MOTION for Default Entry as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company filed by American Airlines, Inc. filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #29 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
June 21, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Entry of Default as to Starr and Requesting Extension of Time to Plead or Otherwise Defend filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company Re: #29 MOTION for Default Entry as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company filed by American Airlines, Inc. filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
June 20, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Service by Publication as to Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc. filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Manuel A. Repollet Melendez)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
June 20, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Default Entry as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
June 19, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Airlines, Inc. upon Starr Indemnity & Liability Company served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
June 19, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Airlines, Inc. upon Aerostar Airport Holding LLC served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Noting and Granting #25 "Notice of Appearance and Motion for Extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead." Appearing third-party defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than July 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/15/2021. (ebb)
June 14, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel to Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC and, MOTION for extension of time until July 14, 2021 to plead or otherwise defend filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holding LLC Responses due by 6/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
May 19, 2021 Filing 24 American Airlines, Inc.'s ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint, filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Defendant American Airlines, Inc..(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
May 10, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #21 Amended Complaint, (Velazquez-Villares, Rafael)
May 10, 2021 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
May 10, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa., filed by Conjugal Partnership Ayala-Sanchez, Julio Ayala-Bousson, Omayra Sanchez-Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Summons NUFIC summons)(Velazquez-Villares, Rafael)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Noting and Granting #17 "Motion Complying with Deadline to Amend the Pleadings and Add Parties." The amended complaint shall be filed forthwith. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/10/2021. (ebb)
May 10, 2021 Filing 19 Third Party Summons Issued as to Aerostar Airport Holding LLC, Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc., Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Attachments: #1 Third Party Summons) (ad)
May 7, 2021 Filing 18 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Aerostar Airport Holding LLC, Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc., Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, ABC Insurance Companies, XYZ Corporations, Does 1-5, filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit Case Management Order Docket No. 14, #3 Summons Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC, #4 Summons Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc., #5 Summons Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
May 7, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Complaint filed by Rafael J. Velazquez-Villares on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Summons Summons)(Velazquez-Villares, Rafael)
April 29, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Status Conference held via teleconference on 4/29/2021. Present: Attorneys Rafael Velazquez and Jose L. Ubarri on behalf of plaintiffs; and attorney Kenneth C. Suria on behalf of defendant. Case status discussed. Details as to the inclusion of additional parties within the deadline set by the court were provided and touched on. As to defendant's reluctance to produce the insurance policy, the court mentioned that Rule 26 imposes the duty to make available for inspection and copying any insurance agreement under which an insurance business may be liable to satisfy all or part of a possible judgment in the action or to indemnify or reimburse for payments made to satisfy the judgment. See, Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1)(A)(iv). Attorney Suria said he informed plaintiffs' counsel of the name of the insurer and the policy limits, but will provide the Declaration Sheet to plaintiffs' attorneys today and request from his client a copy of the relevant policy for production. The parties anticipate that the Complaint will be amended and a Third Party Complaint filed within the deadline set by the court (May 7, 2021). With respect to the potential new parties, attorney Suria informed that a copy of the CMO currently in effect will be included when they are served with process in the case. A follow up conference will be set, as appropriate, in due course. Hearing set for 9:45 a.m.Hearing held at 10:37 a.m.Hearing ended at 10:53 a.m. (LMR) Modified on 4/30/2021 to correct date hearing was held (mcm).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: A Status Conference is set for April 29, 2021 at 9:45 a.m. via teleconference before Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Dial-in information and instructions will be sent by email to record counsel in due course.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/22/2021.(LMR)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: See attached. Deadline for Rule 26 disclosures: April 27, 2021. Deadline to amend the pleadings and to add parties: May 7, 2021. Motion(s) to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings: May 14, 2021. Conclusion of all discovery (including third party, factual and expert): October 13, 2021. Every 60 days, beginning on May 28, 2021, the parties shall file a Joint Motion informing the court of the status of discovery. Deadline to file motion(s) for summary judgment: November 15, 2021. Opposition(s) thereto: December 15, 2021. Replies and sur-replies will be allowed. They should be submitted without further court authorization not later than five (5) days after filing of the motion they are responding to (i.e. opposition or reply). See Instructions pertaining to documents not in the English Language and courtesy copies. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/13/2021. (ebb)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Noting #12 "Joint Motion in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 11." Case Management Order will follow. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/13/2021. (ebb)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 Joint Motion In Compliance as to #11 Order filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc., Omayra Sanchez-Rodriguez, Julio Ayala-Bousson and Conjugal Partnership Ayala-Sanchez. Responses due by 4/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) Modified on 4/12/2021 to add filers (mcm).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: See attached. Joint Proposed Schedule due by 4/12/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/31/2021. (ebb)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noting #9 "American Airlines, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/31/2021. (ebb)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement byAmerican Airlines, Inc.. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Defendant American Airlines, Inc..(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 "American Airlines, Inc.'s Request For Extension of Time to Plead, Answer or Otherwise Move." The appearing party shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 3/31/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/18/2021. (ebb)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until March 31, 2021 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 3/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noting #4 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/8/2021. (ebb)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance as counsel for plaintiffs by Jose Luis Ubarri-Garcia on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ubarri-Garcia, Jose)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7145129.), filed by Omayra Sanchez-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Ayala-Sanchez, Julio Ayala-Bousson. Service due by 4/12/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Velazquez-Villares, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez-Rodriguez et al v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies A-K
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omayra Sanchez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Rafael J. Velazquez-Villares
Represented By: Jose Luis Ubarri-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Ayala-Bousson
Represented By: Rafael J. Velazquez-Villares
Represented By: Jose Luis Ubarri-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Ayala-Sanchez
Represented By: Rafael J. Velazquez-Villares
Represented By: Jose Luis Ubarri-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Aerostar Airport Holding LLC
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Represented By: Jaime A. Torrens-Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Perfect Cleaning Services, Inc.
Represented By: Raphael Pena-Ramon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: XYZ Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?