Cosme-Nieves v. Echevarria-Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: Francisco R Cosme-Nieves
Defendant: Tnte. Jose Echevarria-Rodriguez, Ana Lopez and Santiago Amaro-Amaro
Case Number: 3:2021cv01036
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER.Plaintiff Francisco R. Cosme-Nieves (Cosme-Nieves) shall by July 9, 2021: (1) file a copy of the Complaint (ECF No. 3) in the English language, (2) file an opposition to the motion to dismiss (ECF No. #16 ), also in the English language. See 48 U.S.C. 864 (All pleadings and proceedings in the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico shall be conducted in the English language) and Local Rule 5(c) (All documents not in the English language which are presented or filed, whether as evidence or otherwise, must be accompanied by a certified translation into English). Defendants are reminded of their concurrent obligation to file English translations of all documents relied upon with respect to their pending motion to dismiss. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of the Complaint (ECF No. #3 ) and motion to dismiss (ECF No. 16) to Cosme-Nieves. Failure to comply with this Order will likely result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/9/2021.(EES)
April 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Josue N. Torres-Crespo on behalf of Santiago Amaro-Amaro, Tnte. Jose Echevarria-Rodriguez, Ana Lopez Responses due by 4/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Crespo, Josue)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/2/2022.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/8/2021. 1.The case will be trial ready by late 2022 2.A joint final pre-trial memorandum will be filed by April 1, 20223.Discovery will be completed by March 31, 20224.Dispositive motions will be filed by Jan. 2, 20225.Preserving all parties rights, they shall, within thirty days of the date of this order, file a joint proposed case management scheduling order consistent with the above dates. The parties may agree to advance these dates but may not agree to delay them.6.No motion for a continuance will be entertained that does not recite the above dates and explain how and why any such continuance will affect them.SO ORDERED.(EES)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 4/15/2021. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/8/2021. (EES)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2021 to File Answer and special notice of appearance filed by Josue N. Torres-Crespo on behalf of Santiago Amaro-Amaro, Tnte. Jose Echevarria-Rodriguez, Ana Lopez Responses due by 3/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Crespo, Josue)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Ana Lopez served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021. (rim)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 USM Return of Summon Executed as to Ana Lopez, Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation on 03/03/2021. (rim)
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Santiago Amaro-Amaro served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (rim)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 USM Return of Summon Executed as to Santiago Amaro-Amaro on 02/19/2021. (rim)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Tnte. Jose Echevarria-Rodriguez served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (rim)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 USM Return of Summon Executed as to Tnte. Jose Echevarria-Rodiguez on 02/19/2021. (rim)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Santiago Amaro-Amaro, Tnte. Jose Echevarria-Rodriguez, Ana Lopez through the US Marshals with copy of Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285 (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/3/2021. (EES)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Francisco R Cosme-Nieves. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/28/2021.(EES)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Santiago Amaro-Amaro, Tnte. Jose Echevarria-Rodriguez, Ana Lopez, filed by Francisco R Cosme-Nieves, Pro Se. Service due by 4/22/2021, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ad)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Francisco R Cosme-Nieves, Pro Se. (ad)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Francisco R Cosme-Nieves, Pro Se. Responses due by 2/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad) Modified docket entry attachment's security personal identifiers on 1/25/2021 (rim).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cosme-Nieves v. Echevarria-Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tnte. Jose Echevarria-Rodriguez
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Lopez
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago Amaro-Amaro
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco R Cosme-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?