Santiago-Colon v. Sunnova Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: EDGARDO SANTIAGO-COLON
Defendant: Jane Doe, Unknown John Doe, Sunnova Energy Corporation, Richard Roe and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv01044
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 17 JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/15/2021. (ebb)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting #15 "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal." Plaintiff's claims are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/15/2021. (ebb)
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice IAW Rule 41(a)(1)(I) by Edgardo Santiago-Colon (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #13 "Motion Requesting Extension of Time to File Response/Reply." Response due by June 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/18/2021. (ebb)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/17/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to dismiss or to Compel Arbitration as to All Plaintiffs filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss or to Compel Arbitration as to All Plaintiffs filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 5/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PPA)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noting and Granting #10 "Appearance and Motion for Extension of Time." The appearing defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 5/28/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/22/2021. (ebb)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or otherwise Plead until May 28, 2021 filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 5/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) Modified on 4/23/2021 to edit docket text (mcm). Modified on 5/13/2021 to correct filer (mcm).
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by All Plaintiffs upon Sunnova Energy Corporation served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting #7 "Motion Requesting Extension of Time to Service Summons." Service of Process due by 6/28/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/8/2021. (ebb)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for extension of time until 6/28/2021 to serve summons filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
April 8, 2021 Motions terminated: #6 Motion for extension of time until 6/28/2021 to serve summons filed by Edgardo Santiago-Colon. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/8/2021. (ebb)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until 6/28/2021 to serve summons filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sunnova Energy Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits cover sheet, category sheet, summons re #1 Complaint filed by Edgardo Santiago-Colon (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet category sheet, #2 Summons summons to be issued) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 1/28/2021. (arg)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7162053.), filed by EDGARDO SANTIAGO-COLON. Service due by 4/26/2021,(Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago-Colon v. Sunnova Energy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnova Energy Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDGARDO SANTIAGO-COLON
Represented By: Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?