Hernandez v. Wilkinson
Plaintiff: CASANDRA ANN HERNANDEZ
Defendant: ROBERT M WILKINSON and Robert M. Wilkinson
Case Number: 3:2021cv01091
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 7703
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Process re SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casandra Ann Hernandez upon Robert M. Wilkinson served on 3/19/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -vAttorney General of US, #2 Exhibit 2 - US Attorney-Puerto Rico) (Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily) Modified on 3/26/2021 add text (gav).
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Robert M. Wilkinson (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Summons to AG Wilkinson for Issuance by Casandra Ann Hernandez re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons USA Muldrow) (Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily) Modified on 3/3/2021 remove italics and caps (gav).
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (ad)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT M WILKINSON ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7202654.), filed by CASANDRA ANN HERNANDEZ. Service due by 5/27/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet by Bamily Lopez Ortiz, #3 Category Sheet by Lizabel Negron Vargas)(Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASANDRA ANN HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT M WILKINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?