Cobb et al v. La Rosa del Monte Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sofia Peirats-Moore, Mathew B. Cobb, Sofia G. Peirats-Moore and Conyugal Partnership Cobb-Peirats
Defendant: Bekins Moving Solutions, Compass International Forwarding, Inc. and La Rosa del Monte Express, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01138
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting #15 "'Defendant's Bekins Moving Solution's Informative Motion..." Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 5/28/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/18/2021. (LMR)
May 18, 2021 Filing 15 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Settlement Negotiations filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Bekins Moving Solutions Responses due by 6/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #13 "Defendant's Bekins Moving Solutions' consented to Motion Requesting 10 Additional Days to File Response to Remand in Order to Conduct Settlement Negotiations." The parties shall inform the Court of the status of settlement negotiations by May 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/13/2021. (ebb)
May 10, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Remand and for settlement negotiations as to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Compass International Forwarding, Inc., #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Bekins Moving Solutions, #12 MOTION to Stay re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Compass International Forwarding, Inc. filed by Compass International Forwarding, Inc. filed by Sofia G. Peirats-Moore, Conyugal Partnership Cobb-Peirats, Mathew B. Cobb, #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Sofia G. Peirats-Moore, Conyugal Partnership Cobb-Peirats, Mathew B. Cobb, 11 Order filed by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Bekins Moving Solutions Responses due by 5/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 , #3 , #12 , #10 , 11 ) (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Compass International Forwarding, Inc. filed by Compass International Forwarding, Inc. filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Peirats, Jorge)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: re: #10 "Motion to Remand." Defendants shall respond not later than 5/10/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/27/2021. (ebb)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Peirats, Jorge)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noting #8 "Notice of Appearance and Request to Receive Notices." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/19/2021. (ebb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Peirats, Jorge)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Compass International Forwarding, Inc. filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of Compass International Forwarding, Inc. Responses due by 4/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Compass International Forwarding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Summons)) (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting #2 "Motion for Leave to File Uncertified Translations of Exhibit 1." Certified translations due by 4/19/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/29/2021. (ebb)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance and Motion in relation to Notice of Removal by Nelson Robles-Diaz on behalf of Bekins Moving Solutions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Robles-Diaz, Nelson)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of Compass International Forwarding, Inc. Responses due by 4/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, Bayamon Part, case number BY2021CV00291. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7238254), filed by Compass International Forwarding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb et al v. La Rosa del Monte Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bekins Moving Solutions
Represented By: Nelson Robles-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass International Forwarding, Inc.
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Rosa del Monte Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Peirats-Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew B. Cobb
Represented By: Jorge I. Peirats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia G. Peirats-Moore
Represented By: Jorge I. Peirats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conyugal Partnership Cobb-Peirats
Represented By: Jorge I. Peirats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?