Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc.
Plaintiff: Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc.
Defendant: Jaime A. Lafuente and Esq. Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez
Intervenor: Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01156
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Michel Mir-Martinez on behalf of Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez, Jaime A. Lafuente Responses due by 6/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Reply)(Mir-Martinez, Michel)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/2/2021. (mrr)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition filed by All Defendants Re: #21 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Declaratory Relief filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Document in excess of pages filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 6/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. Re: #29 MOTION to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1) and (6) as to Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez, Jaime A. Lafuente filed by Jaime A. Lafuente, Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2021 Fiscal Plan Section, #2 Exhibit 2020 Fiscal Plan Section)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY to Response in Opposition to Motion to Intervene, Ecf. No. 25 filed by Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc. Re: #25 Motion to Intervene Urgent Motion to Intervene Under Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez on behalf of Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc.(Emmanuelli-Jimenez, Rolando) Modified docket text, event and relationship on 6/1/2021 (rim).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Certified English translations due by 6/7/2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/25/2021. (nat)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/25/2021. (nat)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Hearing Consolidation filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. Responses due by 6/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. Responses due by 6/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion in Opposition to motion for preliminay injunction filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. Re: #21 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Declaratory Relief filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NTSP Reg. 7037, #2 Exhibit Letter dated April 5, 2021)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified docket relationship on 5/25/2021 (rim).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Document with excess pages filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. Responses due by 6/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. #39 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Intervene. Putative intervenor Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc.'s reply (if any) to this motion is due by 5/28/2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/24/2021. (nat) Modified docket reference as per cdc's request on 5/24/2021 (rim).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER noted #40 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/24/2021. (nat)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Motion In Compliance as to 27 Order on Motion to Intervene,, filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 6/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 27 ) (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Intervene filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. Re: #25 MOTION to Intervene Urgent Motion to Intervene Under Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc. filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc.. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER noted #36 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/21/2021. (nat)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion for extension of time. Sur-reply due by June 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/20/2021. (nat)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translation re: 33 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 6/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 33 ) (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for extension of time until June 1, 2021 to File Sur-Reply to Amended Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Rule 6 (a)(1)(C) filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 6/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/18/2021 via VTC. Present on behalf of the plaintiff was Luis Sanchez-Betances, on behalf of defendants were Joel Torres-Ortiz and Michel Mir-Martinez, and as observers, Wendolyn Torres-Rivera on behalf of the intervenor. The parties informed the Court as to the status of the case before the Courts of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico regarding the Circular Letter 35. The Court set the following schedule as to the pending motions: Motion to Amend Preliminary Injunction (dkt. #21 ) - Reply due by 5/24/2021, Sur-Reply due by 5/31/2021; Motion to Intervene (dkt. #25 ) - Response due by 5/21/2021; and Motion to Dismiss (dkt. #29 ) - Response due by 5/28/2021, Reply due by 6/4/2021 and Sur-Reply due by 6/11/201. (Court Reporter Robin Dispenzieri.) (nat)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents. Certified English translations due by 5/28/2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/17/2021. (mrr)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E. Mendez-Colberg on behalf of Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc. (Mendez-Colberg, Jessica)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendolyn Torres-Rivera on behalf of Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc. (Torres-Rivera, Wendolyn)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #21 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Declaratory Relief filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1) and (6) as to Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez, Jaime A. Lafuente filed by Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez, Jaime A. Lafuente Responses due by 5/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FOMB Public Statement, #2 Exhibit FOMB Policy Rules)(Mir-Martinez, Michel)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #25 Held in abeyance. The Court sua sponte shortens the time to respond to this motion. Any party currently before the Court wishing to respond to Urgent Motion to Intervene under Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure shall do so by May 21, 2021. In the meantime, putative intervenor Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc.'s counsel may, of course, attend to the Scheduling Conference as observers. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/14/2021. (mrr)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc. re #25 MOTION to Intervene Urgent Motion to Intervene Under Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Emmanuelli-Jimenez, Rolando)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Intervene Urgent Motion to Intervene Under Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez on behalf of Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc. Responses due by 5/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Emmanuelli-Jimenez, Rolando) Modified capital/italic letters on 5/13/2021 (rim).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2021 will be held at 10:00 AM in VTC Bridge RAM before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/12/2021. (nat)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/5/2021. (mrr)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part #19 Motion for extension of time. Defendants shall plead or otherwise defend regarding the Amended Verified Complaint and Respond to the Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 5/14/2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 5/5/2021. (mrr)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Declaratory Relief filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. Responses due by 5/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter dated December 24, 2020, #2 Exhibit Letter dated March 31, 2021, #3 Exhibit Letter dated March 15, 2021, #4 Exhibit Letter dated March 26, 2021)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Requesting Extension to Oppose Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. Re: #19 MOTION for extension of time until May 17, 2021 to File Opposition to Preliminary Injunction in Lieu of Plaintiff's Filing of an Amended Complaint filed by Jaime A. Lafuente, Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc.. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for extension of time until May 17, 2021 to File Opposition to Preliminary Injunction in Lieu of Plaintiff's Filing of an Amended Complaint filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. of the Amended Complaint (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
May 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification under penalty of perjury, #2 Exhibit Letter dated December 24, 2020, #3 Exhibit Letter dated March 31, 2021, #4 Exhibit Letter dated March 15, 2021, #5 Exhibit Letter dated March 26, 2021)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER noted and granted #15 Informative motion. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 4/27/2021. (mrr)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Compliance with DE No. 13 Order, filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. Responses due by 5/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified on 4/26/2021 to add docket relationship (mg).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: By May 7, 2021 Defendants shall plead or otherwise defend regarding the Verified Complaint and respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Mandatory Initial Disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) due by May 14, 2021. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2021 10:30 AM in VTC Bridge RAM before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Plaintiff shall serve this order upon Defendants personally and by electronic mail no later than April 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 4/20/2021. (mrr)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed JAIME A. LAFUENTE GONZALEZ by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. upon Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed DOMINGO EMANUELLI HERNANDEZ by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. upon Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Letter dated December 24, 2020, #2 Letter dated March 31, 2021, #3 Letter dated March 15, 2021, #4 Letter dated March 26, 2021) (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez, Jaime A. Lafuente. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (vdm)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document will be re-filed*** NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet (Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified on 4/9/2021 (ab).
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet(JS44) is incomplete. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 4/12/2021. (arg)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Received $ 402.00, receipt number 0104-7252203 (arg) Modified on 5/7/2021 to correct filing date (dv).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. Responses due by 4/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document re-filed d.e. #7 *** NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet (Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified on 4/12/2021 (rim).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Summons Jaime A. Lafuente, #3 Summons Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez) (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez, Jaime A. Lafuente, filed by Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc.. Service due by 7/7/2021, (Attachments: #1 Letter dated December 24, 2020, #2 Letter dated March 31, 2021, #3 Letter dated March 15,2021, #4 Letter dated March 26, 2021)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camara de Mercadeo, Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos, Inc.
Represented By: Luis Sanchez-Betances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime A. Lafuente
Represented By: Michel Mir-Martinez
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez
Represented By: Michel Mir-Martinez
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Frente Amplio de Camioneros, Inc.
Represented By: Wendolyn Torres-Rivera
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Represented By: Jessica E. Mendez-Colberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?