Gonzalez-Muniz et al v. Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: D. Y. R. G., Johan Torres-Fernandez, Maria Rosairi Gonzalez-Muniz and X. J. R. G.
Defendant: Insurance Companies A, B, C & D, PREPA, Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico, Reinsurance Companies E, F, G and H, Unknown Defendants 1, 2, 3 and 4 and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority
Case Number: 3:2021cv01157
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/4/2021. (EES)
June 3, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Defendant Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico.(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
June 1, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION Requesting Authorization for Expedited Discovery Pursuant to FRCP 26(d)(1) filed by Hatuey A. Infante-Castellanos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Letter to PREPA, #2 Exhibit Certified Return Receipt First Letter to PREPA, #3 Exhibit Second Letter to PREPA, #4 Exhibit Certified Return Receipt Second Letter to PREPA)(Infante-Castellanos, Hatuey)
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 14, 2021 to File Answer Or Otherwise Plead filed by Victoria D. Pierce-King on behalf of Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority Responses due by 5/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pierce-King, Victoria)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion For Entry of Default filed by Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority Re: #10 MOTION for Default Entry as to Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority filed by X. J. R. G., Johan Torres-Fernandez, D. Y. R. G., Maria Rosairi Gonzalez-Muniz filed by Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. (Pierce-King, Victoria)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Bimbela on behalf of Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (Bimbela, Charles)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance and Notifying Intent To File Opposition To Motion For Entry Of Default by Victoria D. Pierce-King on behalf of Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (Pierce-King, Victoria)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Entry as to Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority filed by Wilbert Mendez-Marrero on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Executed on PREPA, #2 Exhibit Statement under Penalty of Perjury)(Mendez-Marrero, Wilbert)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Additional Legal Cousel filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico Responses due by 5/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, NOTICE of Appearance by Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua on behalf of Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico. Responses due by 5/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marmol-Lantigua, Hector) Modified docket event, text and deadlines on 5/5/2021 (rim).
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Mendez-Marrero, Wilbert)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Mendez-Marrero, Wilbert)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Toby B. Fullmer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fullmer, Toby)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico, PREPA. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young. (vdm)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Hatuey A. Infante-Castellanos on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Infante-Castellanos, Hatuey)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7253427.), filed by D. Y. R. G., X. J. R. G., Maria Rosairi Gonzalez-Muniz, Johan Torres-Fernandez. Service due by 7/7/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit Apperance of Counsel)(Mendez-Marrero, Wilbert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Muniz et al v. Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies A, B, C & D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREPA
Represented By: Victoria D. Pierce-King
Represented By: Charles Bimbela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez
Represented By: Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reinsurance Companies E, F, G and H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants 1, 2, 3 and 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority
Represented By: Victoria D. Pierce-King
Represented By: Charles Bimbela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. Y. R. G.
Represented By: Wilbert Mendez-Marrero
Represented By: Hatuey A. Infante-Castellanos
Represented By: Toby B. Fullmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johan Torres-Fernandez
Represented By: Wilbert Mendez-Marrero
Represented By: Hatuey A. Infante-Castellanos
Represented By: Toby B. Fullmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rosairi Gonzalez-Muniz
Represented By: Wilbert Mendez-Marrero
Represented By: Hatuey A. Infante-Castellanos
Represented By: Toby B. Fullmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X. J. R. G.
Represented By: Wilbert Mendez-Marrero
Represented By: Hatuey A. Infante-Castellanos
Represented By: Toby B. Fullmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?